Asbestos Disease Awareness Organization et al v. Wheeler et al

Plaintiff: Environmental Health Strategy Center, Environmental Working Group, American Public Health Association, Asbestos Disease Awareness Organization, Center for Environmental Health and Safer Chemicals Healthy Families
Defendant: Andrew Wheeler, Environmental Protection Agency and United States Environmental Protection Agency
Case Number: 3:2019cv00871
Filed: February 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Edward M Chen
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 42:4321
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by American Public Health Association, Asbestos Disease Awareness Organization, Center for Environmental Health, Environmental Health Strategy Center, Environmental Working Group, Safer Chemicals Healthy Families (Connett, Michael) (Filed on 3/26/2019)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER IN REASSIGNED CASE: Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/20/2019 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor. Joint Case Management Statement due by 6/13/2019. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/5/2019. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2019)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Edward M. Chen for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Executive Committee on 2/26/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2019)
February 25, 2019 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2019)
February 25, 2019 Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by American Public Health Association, Asbestos Disease Awareness Organization, Center for Environmental Health, Environmental Health Strategy Center, Environmental Working Group, Safer Chemicals Healthy Families.. (Connett, Michael) (Filed on 2/25/2019)
February 20, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Defendants United States Environmental Protection Agency & Andrew Wheeler. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2019)
February 20, 2019 Filing 8 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Joint Case Management Statement due by 5/13/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/20/2019 at 1:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2019)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting #2 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Robert Sussman. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2019)
February 19, 2019 Filing 6 Proposed Summons. (Connett, Michael) (Filed on 2/19/2019)
February 19, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF - - (CORRECTION OF DOCKET #4 ) against United States Environmental Protection Agency & Andrew Wheeler. Filed by Environmental Working Group, Asbestos Disease Awareness Organization, Center for Environmental Health, American Public Health Association, Environmental Health Strategy Center, Safer Chemicals Healthy Families. (Connett, Michael) (Filed on 2/19/2019)
February 19, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against United States Environmental Protection Agency & Andrew Wheeler. Filed by Environmental Working Group, Asbestos Disease Awareness Organization, Center for Environmental Health, American Public Health Association, Environmental Health Strategy Center, Safer Chemicals Healthier Families. (Connett, Michael) (Filed on 2/19/2019)
February 19, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 3/5/2019. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2019)
February 18, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice, (Filing Fee: $310.00, receipt number 0971-13100653) filed by American Public Health Association, Asbestos Disease Awareness Organization, Center for Environmental Health, Environmental Health Strategy Center, Environmental Working Group. (Attachments: #(1) Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Good Standing)(Connett, Michael) (Filed on 2/18/2019)
February 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against Andrew Wheeler & United States Environmental Protection Agency, (Filing Fee: $400.00, receipt number 0971-13100633). Filed by Environmental Working Group, Asbestos Disease Awareness Organization, Center for Environmental Health, American Public Health Association, Environmental Health Strategy Center. (Attachments: #(1) Civil Cover Sheet)(Connett, Michael) (Filed on 2/18/2019) Modified on 2/20/2019 (tnS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Asbestos Disease Awareness Organization et al v. Wheeler et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Environmental Health Strategy Center
Represented By: Michael P Connett
Represented By: Robert M. Sussman
Represented By: Michael P. Connett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Environmental Working Group
Represented By: Michael P Connett
Represented By: Robert M. Sussman
Represented By: Michael P. Connett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Public Health Association
Represented By: Michael P Connett
Represented By: Robert M. Sussman
Represented By: Michael P. Connett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Asbestos Disease Awareness Organization
Represented By: Michael P Connett
Represented By: Robert M. Sussman
Represented By: Michael P. Connett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Center for Environmental Health
Represented By: Michael P Connett
Represented By: Robert M. Sussman
Represented By: Michael P. Connett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Safer Chemicals Healthy Families
Represented By: Robert M. Sussman
Represented By: Michael P. Connett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Wheeler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Environmental Protection Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Environmental Protection Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?