Baum et al v. Monsanto Company et al
Plaintiff: John Kalfayan, Terrence M. O'Neill, Lawrence Krupinski, Jeffrey D. Baum, Lee Alan Rosichan, Jose Ochoa, Steven Oliveira, Joseph Calhoun, Kenneth Grisler, Kathryn Dufore, Norman J. Flinn, Bruce Lowe, Brynda Dunbar, Charles Crouse, Anita Richardson, Emilio Cavazos, Michael D. Winch, Jr., James Eric Nelson, Keith Davie and Robert Geoffrey Smith
Defendant: Monsanto Company, Wilbur-Ellis Feed, LLC and Wilbur-Ellis Company LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv01018
Filed: February 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 25, 2019 Filing 20 CLERK'S NOTICE vacating the Initial Case Management Conference scheduled for 5/28/2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2019)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 142: SCHEDULING FOR PENDING MOTIONS TO REMAND. Motion Hearing set for 5/22/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor before Judge Vince Chhabria.. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 4/24/2019. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2019)
April 23, 2019 Filing 18 Brief re #17 MOTION to Remand the Case to the Superior Court of the State of California, County of Alameda, Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1447(c) filed byJeffrey D. Baum, Joseph Calhoun, Emilio Cavazos, Charles Crouse, Keith Davie, Kathryn Dufore, Brynda Dunbar, Norman J. Flinn, Kenneth Grisler, John Kalfayan, Lawrence Krupinski, Bruce Lowe, James Eric Nelson, Terrence M. O'Neill, Jose Ochoa, Steven Oliveira, Anita Richardson, Lee Alan Rosichan, Robert Geoffrey Smith, Michael D. Winch, Jr.. (Related document(s) #17 ) (Greenwald, Robin) (Filed on 4/23/2019)
April 23, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Remand the Case to the Superior Court of the State of California, County of Alameda, Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1447(c) filed by Jeffrey D. Baum, Joseph Calhoun, Emilio Cavazos, Charles Crouse, Keith Davie, Kathryn Dufore, Brynda Dunbar, Norman J. Flinn, Kenneth Grisler, John Kalfayan, Lawrence Krupinski, Bruce Lowe, James Eric Nelson, Terrence M. O'Neill, Jose Ochoa, Steven Oliveira, Anita Richardson, Lee Alan Rosichan, Robert Geoffrey Smith, Michael D. Winch, Jr.. Motion Hearing set for 5/30/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor before Judge Vince Chhabria. Responses due by 5/7/2019. Replies due by 5/14/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Robin Greenwald in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand, #2 Exhibit 1 Baum Complaint Filed, #3 Exhibit 2 Proposed Case Management Order Addition of Baum to JCCP and Transfer to Alameda County, #4 Exhibit 3 Plaintiffs' Motion for Bellwether Selection Process, #5 Exhibit 4 JCCP Case Management Order 1-25-2019 Redacted, #6 Exhibit 5 JCCP Master Long Form Complaint Draft)(Greenwald, Robin) (Filed on 4/23/2019)
March 18, 2019 Filing 16 Refund Status re #15 Application for Refund APPROVED. (rghS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2019)
March 15, 2019 Filing 15 Application for Refund, Receipt Number 0971-13117481 by Monsanto Company. (Fayne, Samuel) (Filed on 3/15/2019)
March 4, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byWilbur-Ellis Company LLC, Wilbur-Ellis Feed, LLC. (Hollingsworth, Joe) (Filed on 3/4/2019)
March 4, 2019 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wilbur-Ellis Company LLC, Wilbur-Ellis Feed, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Wilbur-Ellis Holdings II, Inc, Corporate Parent Wilbur-Ellis Holdings, Inc for Wilbur-Ellis Company LLC, Wilbur-Ellis Feed, LLC. (Hollingsworth, Joe) (Filed on 3/4/2019)
March 4, 2019 Filing 12 Certificate of Interested Entities by Wilbur-Ellis Company LLC, Wilbur-Ellis Feed, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Wilbur-Ellis Holdings II, Inc, Corporate Parent Wilbur-Ellis Holdings, Inc for Wilbur-Ellis Company LLC, Wilbur-Ellis Feed, LLC. (Hollingsworth, Joe) (Filed on 3/4/2019)
February 28, 2019 Filing 11 Refund Status re #10 Application for Refund DECLINED. (rghS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2019)
February 26, 2019 Filing 10 Application for Refund, Receipt Number 0971-13117481 by Monsanto Company. (Fayne, Samuel) (Filed on 2/26/2019)
February 26, 2019 Filing 9 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras Case Management Statement due by 5/21/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/28/2019 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2019)
February 25, 2019 Filing 8 Monsanto Company's ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) to Plaintiff's Complaint byMonsanto Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Fayne, Samuel) (Filed on 2/25/2019)
February 25, 2019 Filing 7 Civil Cover Sheet by Monsanto Company (Amended). (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Fayne, Samuel) (Filed on 2/25/2019)
February 25, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Monsanto Company re #5 Certificate of Interested Entities, #1 Notice of Removal, #3 Certificate of Interested Entities (Fayne, Samuel) (Filed on 2/25/2019)
February 25, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Monsanto Company identifying Corporate Parent Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. (Fayne, Samuel) (Filed on 2/25/2019)
February 25, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Judge Vince Chhabria. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2019)
February 25, 2019 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Monsanto Company identifying Corporate Parent Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. (Fayne, Samuel) (Filed on 2/25/2019)
February 25, 2019 Filing 2 CLERICAL ERROR: ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Vince Chhabria for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D Laporte no longer assigned to case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Executive Committee on 2/25/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2019) Modified on 2/25/2019 (as, COURT STAFF).
February 25, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of the State of California for San Francisco County. Their case number is CGC-18-570508. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-13117538). Filed byMonsanto Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fayne, Samuel) (Filed on 2/25/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baum et al v. Monsanto Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Kalfayan
Represented By: Devin Lynn Bolton
Represented By: Robin Lynn Greenwald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrence M. O'Neill
Represented By: Devin Lynn Bolton
Represented By: Robin Lynn Greenwald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence Krupinski
Represented By: Devin Lynn Bolton
Represented By: Robin Lynn Greenwald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey D. Baum
Represented By: Devin Lynn Bolton
Represented By: Robin Lynn Greenwald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lee Alan Rosichan
Represented By: Devin Lynn Bolton
Represented By: Robin Lynn Greenwald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Ochoa
Represented By: Devin Lynn Bolton
Represented By: Robin Lynn Greenwald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Oliveira
Represented By: Devin Lynn Bolton
Represented By: Robin Lynn Greenwald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Calhoun
Represented By: Devin Lynn Bolton
Represented By: Robin Lynn Greenwald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Grisler
Represented By: Devin Lynn Bolton
Represented By: Robin Lynn Greenwald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathryn Dufore
Represented By: Devin Lynn Bolton
Represented By: Robin Lynn Greenwald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norman J. Flinn
Represented By: Devin Lynn Bolton
Represented By: Robin Lynn Greenwald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce Lowe
Represented By: Devin Lynn Bolton
Represented By: Robin Lynn Greenwald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brynda Dunbar
Represented By: Devin Lynn Bolton
Represented By: Robin Lynn Greenwald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Crouse
Represented By: Devin Lynn Bolton
Represented By: Robin Lynn Greenwald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anita Richardson
Represented By: Devin Lynn Bolton
Represented By: Robin Lynn Greenwald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emilio Cavazos
Represented By: Devin Lynn Bolton
Represented By: Robin Lynn Greenwald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael D. Winch, Jr.
Represented By: Devin Lynn Bolton
Represented By: Robin Lynn Greenwald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Eric Nelson
Represented By: Devin Lynn Bolton
Represented By: Robin Lynn Greenwald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Davie
Represented By: Devin Lynn Bolton
Represented By: Robin Lynn Greenwald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Geoffrey Smith
Represented By: Devin Lynn Bolton
Represented By: Robin Lynn Greenwald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Represented By: Samuel Zachary Fayne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilbur-Ellis Feed, LLC
Represented By: Joe G. Hollingsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilbur-Ellis Company LLC
Represented By: Joe G. Hollingsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?