California River Watch v. Moore et al

Plaintiff: California River Watch
Defendant: Kenneth Moore, Estate of Rose Mary Moore, Deceased, Estate of Charles N. Moore, Deceased, Estate of Charles N. Moore and Estate of Rose Mary Moore
Case Number: 3:2019cv01156
Filed: March 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Sallie Kim
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33:1319
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting #12 Stipulation for Relief From Scheduling Order. Case Management Statement due by 7/22/2019. Initial Case Management Conference reset for 7/29/2019 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2019)
April 15, 2019 Filing 12 JOINT STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER for Relief From Scheduling Order filed by California River Watch. (Silver, Jack) (Filed on 4/15/2019)
April 12, 2019 Filing 11 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Kenneth Moore.. (Moore, Kenneth) (Filed on 4/12/2019)
April 2, 2019 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendant Kenneth Moore shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 4/16/2019. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2019)
April 1, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Kenneth Moore. (Moore, Kenneth) (Filed on 4/1/2019)
March 8, 2019 Filing 8 Plaintiff's Certificate of Interested Entities or Persons [L.R. 3-15] filed by California River Watch - CORRECTION OF DOCKET #6 (Silver, Jack) (Filed on 3/8/2019)
March 8, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge filed by California River Watch. (Silver, Jack) (Filed on 3/8/2019)
March 8, 2019 Filing 6 Certification of Interested Entities or Persons [L.R. 3-15] filed by California River Watch - [Pls. Refer to Docket No. 8] (Silver, Jack) (Filed on 3/8/2019) Modified on 3/8/2019 (tnS, COURT STAFF).
March 5, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Defendants Kenneth Moore, Estate of Charles N. Moore, Deceased & Estate of Rose Mary Moore, Deceased. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2019)
March 5, 2019 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Joint Case Management Statement due by 5/27/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/3/2019 at 1:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2019)
March 1, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 3/15/2019. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2019)
March 1, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Silver, Jack) (Filed on 3/1/2019)
March 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Injunctive Relief, Civil Penalties, and Declaratory Relief against All Defendants, (Filing Fee: $400.00, receipt number 0971-13135027). Filed by California River Watch. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit A, #(2) Civil Cover Sheet)(Silver, Jack) (Filed on 3/1/2019) Modified on 3/5/2019 (tnS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: California River Watch v. Moore et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Moore
Represented By: Kenneth Charles Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estate of Rose Mary Moore, Deceased
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estate of Charles N. Moore, Deceased
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estate of Charles N. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estate of Rose Mary Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: California River Watch
Represented By: Jack Silver
Represented By: Joseph Jerry Bernhaut
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?