Advanced Silicon Technologies, LLC v. Sigma Designs, Inc.

Plaintiff: Advanced Silicon Technologies, LLC
Defendant: Sigma Designs, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv01168
Filed: March 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: James Donato
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:145
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/6/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 5/30/2019. Signed by Judge James Donato on 3/20/19. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2019)
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge James Donato for all further proceedings. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/camera. Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen no longer assigned to the case. Reassignment Order signed Clerk on 3/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2019)
March 19, 2019 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (djmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2019)
March 18, 2019 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Advanced Silicon Technologies, LLC.. (Akerley, Stephen) (Filed on 3/18/2019)
March 4, 2019 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/28/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/4/2019 09:30 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2019)
March 4, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 3/18/2019. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2019)
March 1, 2019 Filing 3 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a Patent or Trademark (cc: form mailed to register). (Akerley, Stephen) (Filed on 3/1/2019)
March 1, 2019 Filing 2 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Advanced Silicon Technologies, LLC re #1 Complaint, - Plaintiff's Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 and Certification of Interested Parties Pursuant to Local Rule 3-15 (Akerley, Stephen) (Filed on 3/1/2019)
March 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Sigma Designs, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13136949.). Filed byAdvanced Silicon Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Civil Cover Sheet)(Akerley, Stephen) (Filed on 3/1/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Advanced Silicon Technologies, LLC v. Sigma Designs, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sigma Designs, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Advanced Silicon Technologies, LLC
Represented By: Stephen James Akerley
Represented By: Philip C. Ducker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?