State of California v. Azar et al Featured Case

California's Attorney General Xavier Becerra filed a lawsuit against the Trump administration over significant changes to Title X, a grant program administered by the Department of Health and Human Services that provides individuals with comprehensive family planning and related preventive health services. Among the changes are removal of "the requirement that Title X funded entities refer for abortion," and a prohibition on Title X projects "from performing, promoting, referring for, or supporting abortion as a method of family planning."

Plaintiff: State of California Attorney General's Office and State of California
Defendant: Alex Azar, Health and Human Services, Secretary and U.S. Department of Health & Human Services
Petitioner: Essential Access Health, Inc., Chris Sevier and Dr. Melissa Marshall, M.D.
Amicus Curiae: American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists, American College of Physicians, Society for Maternal-Fetal Medicine, Texas, Amici Curiae, Institute for Policy Integrity, Society for Adolescent Health Medicine, Arkansas, American Academy of Pediatrics, California, Louisiana, Ohio, American Center for Law and Justice, Susan B. Anthony List, South Carolina, Alabama, South Dakota, Indiana, Kentucky and Oklahoma
Case Number: 3:2019cv01184
Filed: March 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Edward M Chen
Referring Judge: Elizabeth D Laporte
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:551
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Denying #117 Defendants' Motions for Stay Pending Appeal. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2019)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER of USCA as to (#82 in 3:19-cv-01195-EMC) Notice of Appeal filed by Alex M. Azar, II, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, and (#108 in 3:19-cv-01184-EMC) Notice of Appeal filed by Alex Azar, U.S. Department of Health & Human Services (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2019)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER of USCA granting stay pending appeal as to (108 in 3:19-cv-01184-EMC) Notice of Appeal filed by Alex Azar, U.S. Department of Health & Human Services; (82 in 3:19-cv-01195-EMC) Notice of Appeal filed by Alex M. Azar, II, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services; (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2019)
June 24, 2019 Filing 129 NOTICE by Alex Azar, U.S. Department of Health & Human Services re Administrative Record (Humphreys, Bradley) (Filed on 6/24/2019)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER AS MODIFIED by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #125 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, or Other Responsive Pleading. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2019)
June 17, 2019 Filing 127 CLERK'S NOTICE: Motion hearing re: #117 (3:19-cv-01184-EMC) Motion to Stay; #91 (3:19-cv-01195-EMC) MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Appeal set for 7/11/2019 RESCHEDULED as special setting for 7/16/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. All briefing remain unchanged. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2019)
June 13, 2019 Filing 126 NOTICE by Alex Azar, U.S. Department of Health & Human Services (Humphreys, Bradley) (Filed on 6/13/2019)
June 11, 2019 Filing 125 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, or Other Responsive Pleading filed by Alex Azar, U.S. Department of Health & Human Services. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order)(Humphreys, Bradley) (Filed on 6/11/2019)
June 7, 2019 Filing 124 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #117 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Appeal ) filed byState of California. (Rich, Anna) (Filed on 6/7/2019)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 123 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen denying #46 Motion to Intervene.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2019)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 122 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen denying #118 Administrative Motion to Relate Cases.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2019)
May 28, 2019 Filing 121 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #118 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER CASES SHOULD BE RELATED ) filed byAlex Azar, U.S. Department of Health & Human Services. (Humphreys, Bradley) (Filed on 5/28/2019)
May 24, 2019 Filing 120 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by State of California re #118 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER CASES SHOULD BE RELATED (Rich, Anna) (Filed on 5/24/2019)
May 24, 2019 Filing 119 Declaration of Anna Rich in Support of #118 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER CASES SHOULD BE RELATED filed byState of California. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Related document(s) #118 ) (Rich, Anna) (Filed on 5/24/2019)
May 24, 2019 Filing 118 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER CASES SHOULD BE RELATED filed by State of California. Responses due by 5/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Rich, Anna) (Filed on 5/24/2019)
May 24, 2019 Filing 117 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Appeal filed by Alex Azar, U.S. Department of Health & Human Services. Motion Hearing set for 7/11/2019 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 6/7/2019. Replies due by 6/14/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Merritt, R.) (Filed on 5/24/2019)
May 22, 2019 Filing 116 USCA Case Number 19-15974 for #108 Notice of Appeal filed by Alex Azar, U.S. Department of Health & Human Services. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2019)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Denying #109 Defendants' Motion to Stay Injunction Pending Appeal. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2019)
May 8, 2019 Filing 114 Proposed Order re #112 Opposition/Response to Motion, by State of California. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE)(Rich, Anna) (Filed on 5/8/2019)
May 8, 2019 Filing 113 Declaration of Anna Rich in Support of #112 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed by State of California. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Related document(s) #112 ) (Rich, Anna) (Filed on 5/8/2019)
May 8, 2019 Filing 112 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #109 MOTION to Stay re #103 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction , #110 MOTION to Shorten Time to Hear Defendants' Motion to Stay Injunction Pending Appeal ) filed byState of California. (Rich, Anna) (Filed on 5/8/2019)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER for Briefing Re #109 Defendants' Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/7/2019. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2019)
May 6, 2019 Filing 110 MOTION to Shorten Time to Hear Defendants' Motion to Stay Injunction Pending Appeal filed by Alex Azar, U.S. Department of Health & Human Services. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Merritt, R.) (Filed on 5/6/2019)
May 6, 2019 Filing 109 MOTION to Stay re #103 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Alex Azar, U.S. Department of Health & Human Services. Motion Hearing set for 6/13/2019 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 5/20/2019. Replies due by 5/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order)(Humphreys, Bradley) (Filed on 5/6/2019)
May 6, 2019 Filing 108 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Alex Azar, U.S. Department of Health & Human Services. Appeal of Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction #103 (Appeal fee FEE WAIVED.) (Humphreys, Bradley) (Filed on 5/6/2019)(USCA Case No. 19-15974)
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 107 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #106 Stipulation to Extend Date for Responding to Plaintiffs' Complaints. Response due 6/21/2019.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2019)
May 3, 2019 Filing 106 STIPULATION to Extend Date for Responding to Plaintiffs' Complaints filed by Alex Azar, U.S. Department of Health & Human Services. (Merritt, R.) (Filed on 5/3/2019) Modified on 5/5/2019 (afmS, COURT STAFF).
May 2, 2019 Filing 105 Transcript of Proceedings held on 4-18-2019, before Judge Edward M. Chen. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra L. Pas, CRR, telephone number (415) 431-1477/Email: Debra_Pas@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (101 in 3:19-cv-01184-EMC) Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/31/2019. (pasdl50S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2019)
May 2, 2019 Filing 104 NOTICE by Alex Azar, U.S. Department of Health & Human Services (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Riess, Daniel) (Filed on 5/2/2019)
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting in Part and Denying in Part #26 Plaintiffs' Motions for Preliminary Injunction. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2019)
April 26, 2019 Filing 102 NOTICE by Alex Azar, U.S. Department of Health & Human Services (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Riess, Daniel) (Filed on 4/26/2019)
April 19, 2019 Filing 101 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 4/18/2019 before Judge Edward M. Chen by State of California, for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Rich, Anna) (Filed on 4/19/2019)
April 18, 2019 Filing 100 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Edward M. Chen: Motion Hearing held on 4/18/2019 in case 3:19-cv-01184-EMC; Motion Hearing held on 4/18/2019 in case 3:19-cv-01195-EMC. Matters taken under submission.Total Time in Court: 2 Hours; 14 Minutes. Court Reporter: Debra Pas. Plaintiff Attorneys: Anna Rich, Michelle Ybarra, Justina Sessions, Sophie Hood, Divya Musinipally, Kathryn Bowen, Philip Tassin. Defendant Attorneys: James Burnham, R. Charlie Merritt. Attachment: Minute Order. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/18/2019)
April 17, 2019 Filing 99 Declaration of Anna Rich in Support of #97 Supplemental Brief filed by State of California. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service )(Related document(s) #97 ) (Rich, Anna) (Filed on 4/17/2019)
April 17, 2019 Filing 98 Declaration of Melanie Fontes Rainer in Support of #97 Supplemental Brief filed byState of California. (Related document(s) #97 ) (Rich, Anna) (Filed on 4/17/2019)
April 17, 2019 Filing 97 Supplemental Brief in Support re MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re #88 Order (CORRECTION OF DOCKET #96 ) filed byState of California. (Related document(s) #88 ) (Rich, Anna) (Filed on 4/17/2019) Modified on 4/18/2019 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
April 17, 2019 Filing 96 *Erroneous Entry - Please See Document #97 * MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by State of California. Motion Hearing set for 4/18/2019 12:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 5/1/2019. Replies due by 5/8/2019. (Rich, Anna) (Filed on 4/17/2019) Modified on 4/18/2019 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
April 17, 2019 Filing 95 Defendant's Response to #88 Order re Supplemental Submissions filed by Alex Azar, U.S. Department of Health & Human Services. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Related document(s) #88 ) (Humphreys, Bradley) (Filed on 4/17/2019) Modified on 4/18/2019 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
April 17, 2019 Filing 94 NOTICE of Appearance by Ketakee Rajiv Kane (Kane, Ketakee) (Filed on 4/17/2019)
April 17, 2019 Filing 93 NOTICE of Appearance by R. Charlie Merritt (Merritt, R.) (Filed on 4/17/2019)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #87 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2019)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER granting #86 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice . Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/15/2019. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2019)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 90 (ERRONEOUS ENTRY, DISREGARD - PLEASE REFER TO #91 ) ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #86 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2019) Modified on 4/15/2019 (afmS, COURT STAFF).
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #85 Motion to File Amicus Curiae Brief. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2019)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER Re Supplemental Submissions. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/15/2019. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2019)
April 15, 2019 Filing 87 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13259647.) filed by Susan B. Anthony List. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing from MO Bar)(Pitlyk, Sarah) (Filed on 4/15/2019)
April 12, 2019 Filing 86 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13256109.) filed by Susan B. Anthony List. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Hochschild, Adam) (Filed on 4/12/2019)
April 12, 2019 Filing 85 MOTION to File Amicus Curiae Brief filed by American Center for Law and Justice. Responses due by 4/26/2019. Replies due by 5/3/2019. (Attachments: #1 amended amicus brief, #2 amended proposed order)(Sekulow, Jay) (Filed on 4/12/2019)
April 11, 2019 Filing 84 REPLY in Support (re #26 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction) filed by State of California. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Rich, Anna) (Filed on 4/11/2019)
April 11, 2019 Filing 83 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by State of California re #81 Opposition/Response to Motion, #82 Proposed Order PROOF OF SERVICE (Ayon Verduzco, Brenda) (Filed on 4/11/2019)
April 11, 2019 Filing 82 Proposed Order re #81 Opposition/Response to Motion [PROPOSED] ORDER DENYING MOTION TO INTERVENE by State of California. (Ayon Verduzco, Brenda) (Filed on 4/11/2019)
April 11, 2019 Filing 81 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #46 MOTION to Intervene ) PLAINTIFF'S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO INTERVENE filed byState of California. (Ayon Verduzco, Brenda) (Filed on 4/11/2019)
April 11, 2019 Filing 80 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #46 MOTION to Intervene ) filed byAlex Azar, U.S. Department of Health & Human Services. (Riess, Daniel) (Filed on 4/11/2019)
April 10, 2019 Filing 79 MOTION to File Amicus Curiae Brief filed by American Center for Law and Justice. Responses due by 4/24/2019. Replies due by 5/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed amicus brief, #2 Proposed order)(Sekulow, Jay) (Filed on 4/10/2019)
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 78 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #75 Motion to File Amicus Curiae Brief.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2019)
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 77 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #68 Motion to File Amicus Curiae Brief.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2019)
April 9, 2019 Filing 76 Brief re #75 MOTION to File Amicus Curiae Brief in Support of Defendants filed bySusan B. Anthony List. (Related document(s) #75 ) (Treppa, Michael) (Filed on 4/9/2019)
April 9, 2019 Filing 75 MOTION to File Amicus Curiae Brief in Support of Defendants filed by Susan B. Anthony List. Motion Hearing set for 4/18/2019 12:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 4/23/2019. Replies due by 4/30/2019. (Treppa, Michael) (Filed on 4/9/2019)
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 74 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #67 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2019)
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 73 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #66 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2019)
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 72 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #65 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2019)
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 71 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #64 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2019)
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 70 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #63 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2019)
April 9, 2019 Filing 69 NOTICE of Appearance by James Mahoney Burnham (Burnham, James) (Filed on 4/9/2019)
April 8, 2019 Filing 68 Consent MOTION to File Amicus Curiae Brief filed by American Academy of Pediatrics, California, American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists, American College of Physicians, Society for Adolescent Health Medicine, Society for Maternal-Fetal Medicine. Motion Hearing set for 4/18/2019 12:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 4/22/2019. Replies due by 4/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Richards, Daniel) (Filed on 4/8/2019)
April 8, 2019 Filing 67 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Douglas H. Hallward-Driemeier ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13242571.) filed by Society for Adolescent Health Medicine, Society for Maternal-Fetal Medicine. (Richards, Daniel) (Filed on 4/8/2019)
April 8, 2019 Filing 66 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Haley Eagon ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13242570.) filed by American Academy of Pediatrics, California, American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists, American College of Physicians, Society for Adolescent Health Medicine, Society for Maternal-Fetal Medicine. (Richards, Daniel) (Filed on 4/8/2019)
April 8, 2019 Filing 65 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Catherine J. Djang ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13242568.) filed by American Academy of Pediatrics, California, American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists, American College of Physicians, Society for Adolescent Health Medicine, Society for Maternal-Fetal Medicine. (Richards, Daniel) (Filed on 4/8/2019)
April 8, 2019 Filing 64 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Thomas N. Bulleit ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13242566.) filed by American Academy of Pediatrics, California, American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists, American College of Physicians, Society for Adolescent Health Medicine, Society for Maternal-Fetal Medicine. (Richards, Daniel) (Filed on 4/8/2019)
April 8, 2019 Filing 63 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Lisa H. Bebchick ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13242565.) filed by American Academy of Pediatrics, California, American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists, American College of Physicians, Society for Adolescent Health Medicine, Society for Maternal-Fetal Medicine. (Richards, Daniel) (Filed on 4/8/2019)
April 8, 2019 Filing 62 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Willis Richards (Richards, Daniel) (Filed on 4/8/2019)
April 8, 2019 Filing 61 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #26 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ) filed byAlex Azar, U.S. Department of Health & Human Services. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Humphreys, Bradley) (Filed on 4/8/2019)
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 60 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #59 Motion to File Amicus Curiae Brief. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2019)
April 8, 2019 Filing 59 MOTION to File Amicus Curiae Brief filed by Alabama, Arkansas, Indiana, Kentucky, Louisiana, Ohio, Oklahoma, South Carolina, South Dakota, Texas. Motion Hearing set for 4/18/2019 12:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 4/22/2019. Replies due by 4/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Brief of Amici Curiae, #2 Proposed Order)(Hacker, David) (Filed on 4/8/2019)
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 58 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #55 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2019)
April 8, 2019 Filing 57 NOTICE of Appearance by David Jonathan Hacker on behalf of Ohio, Alabama, Arkansas, Indiana, Kentucky (by and through its Governor), Louisiana, Oklahoma, South Carolina, South Dakota, and Texas (CORRECTION OF DOCKET #56 ) (Hacker, David) (Filed on 4/8/2019)
April 8, 2019 Filing 56 NOTICE of Appearance by David Jonathan Hacker on behalf of proposed amici curiae Ohio, Alabama, Arkansas, Indiana, Kentucky (by and through its Governor), Louisiana, Oklahoma, South Carolina, and Texas (Hacker, David) (Filed on 4/8/2019)
April 8, 2019 Filing 55 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13239363.) filed by Amici Curiae. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Flowers, Benjamin) (Filed on 4/8/2019)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #48 Motion to File Amicus Curiae Brief. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2019)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 53 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #51 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2019)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 52 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #50 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2019)
April 5, 2019 Filing 51 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13235823.) filed by Institute for Policy Integrity. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Bar Admin. Cert. (b/c court doesn't issue bar numbers))(Schwartz, Jason) (Filed on 4/5/2019)
April 5, 2019 Filing 50 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13235874.) filed by Institute for Policy Integrity. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Condon, Madison) (Filed on 4/5/2019)
April 5, 2019 Filing 49 NOTICE of Appearance by Denise Antonia Grab (Grab, Denise) (Filed on 4/5/2019)
April 5, 2019 Filing 48 MOTION to File Amicus Curiae Brief filed by Institute for Policy Integrity. Motion Hearing set for 4/18/2019 12:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 4/8/2019. Replies due by 4/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amicus Brief, #2 Proposed Order)(Grab, Denise) (Filed on 4/5/2019)
March 28, 2019 Filing 47 MEMORANDUM in Support re #46 MOTION to Intervene filed by Chris Sevier. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Exhibits)(Related document(s) #46 ) (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2019)
March 28, 2019 Filing 46 MOTION to Intervene as Plaintiff filed by Chris Sevier. Responses due by 4/11/2019. Replies due by 4/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2019)
March 25, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #26 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Motion Hearing set for 4/18/2019 12:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2019)
March 22, 2019 #Electronic filing error Re: #45 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Certificate of Service filed by State of California. Incorrect event used. [err101]Corrected by Clerk 's Office. No further action is necessary. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2019)
March 21, 2019 Filing 45 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by State of California re #26 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, #27 Declaration in Support, #28 Declaration in Support, #29 Declaration in Support, #30 Declaration in Support, #31 Declaration in Support, #32 Declaration in Support, #33 Declaration in Support, #34 Declaration in Support, #35 Declaration in Support, #36 Declaration in Support, #37 Declaration in Support, #38 Declaration in Support, #39 Declaration in Support, #40 Declaration in Support, #41 Declaration in Support, #42 Declaration in Support, #43 Declaration in Support, #44 Declaration in Support (Rich, Anna) (Filed on 3/21/2019) Modified on 3/22/2019 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
March 21, 2019 Filing 44 Declaration of Kayla Wilburn in Support of #26 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed byState of California. (Related document(s) #26 ) (Rich, Anna) (Filed on 3/21/2019)
March 21, 2019 Filing 43 Declaration of Henry Tuttle in Support of #26 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed byState of California. (Related document(s) #26 ) (Rich, Anna) (Filed on 3/21/2019)
March 21, 2019 Filing 42 Declaration of Jenna Tosh in Support of #26 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed byState of California. (Related document(s) #26 ) (Rich, Anna) (Filed on 3/21/2019)
March 21, 2019 Filing 41 Declaration of Jane Thomas in Support of #26 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed byState of California. (Related document(s) #26 ) (Rich, Anna) (Filed on 3/21/2019)
March 21, 2019 Filing 40 Declaration of Tatiana Spirtos in Support of #26 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed byState of California. (Related document(s) #26 ) (Rich, Anna) (Filed on 3/21/2019)
March 21, 2019 Filing 39 Declaration of Anna Rich in Support of #26 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed byState of California. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit OPA Program Requirements, #2 Exhibit California Medical Association, #3 Exhibit Center for Reproductive Rights, #4 Exhibit American Academy of Nursing, #5 Exhibit Guttmacher Institute, #6 Exhibit California Association for Nurse Practitioners, #7 Exhibit American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists, #8 Exhibit Multistate Comment Letter, #9 Exhibit American Medical Association, #10 Exhibit American College of Nurse-Midwives, #11 Exhibit American Public Health Association, #12 Exhibit National Family Planning & Reproductive Health Association, #13 Exhibit Planned Parenthood Federation of America, #14 Exhibit American Academy of Pediatrics and the Society for Adolescent Health and Medicine, #15 Exhibit Northeast Valley Health Corporation, #16 Exhibit American College of Physicians, #17 Exhibit American Academy of Family Physicians)(Related document(s) #26 ) (Rich, Anna) (Filed on 3/21/2019)
March 21, 2019 Filing 38 Declaration of Julie Rabinovitz in Support of #26 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed byState of California. (Related document(s) #26 ) (Rich, Anna) (Filed on 3/21/2019)
March 21, 2019 Filing 37 Declaration of Shivaun M. Nestor in Support of #26 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed byState of California. (Related document(s) #26 ) (Rich, Anna) (Filed on 3/21/2019)
March 21, 2019 Filing 36 Declaration of Joseph Morris in Support of #26 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed byState of California. (Related document(s) #26 ) (Rich, Anna) (Filed on 3/21/2019)
March 21, 2019 Filing 35 Declaration of Marie McKinney in Support of #26 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed byState of California. (Related document(s) #26 ) (Rich, Anna) (Filed on 3/21/2019)
March 21, 2019 Filing 34 Declaration of Louise McCarthy in Support of #26 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed byState of California. (Related document(s) #26 ) (Rich, Anna) (Filed on 3/21/2019)
March 21, 2019 Filing 33 Declaration of Melissa Marshall in Support of #26 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed byState of California. (Related document(s) #26 ) (Rich, Anna) (Filed on 3/21/2019)
March 21, 2019 Filing 32 Declaration of Kathryn Kost in Support of #26 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed byState of California. (Related document(s) #26 ) (Rich, Anna) (Filed on 3/21/2019)
March 21, 2019 Filing 31 Declaration of Elizabeth Forer in Support of #26 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed byState of California. (Related document(s) #26 ) (Rich, Anna) (Filed on 3/21/2019)
March 21, 2019 Filing 30 Declaration of Barbara Ferrer in Support of #26 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed byState of California. (Related document(s) #26 ) (Rich, Anna) (Filed on 3/21/2019)
March 21, 2019 Filing 29 Declaration of Carmela Castellano-Garcia in Support of #26 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed byState of California. (Related document(s) #26 ) (Rich, Anna) (Filed on 3/21/2019)
March 21, 2019 Filing 28 Declaration of Mari Cantwell in Support of #26 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed byState of California. (Related document(s) #26 ) (Rich, Anna) (Filed on 3/21/2019)
March 21, 2019 Filing 27 Declaration of Claire Brindis in Support of #26 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed byState of California. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Brindis CV, #2 Exhibit Brindis Comment Letter, #3 Exhibit QFP Recommendations)(Related document(s) #26 ) (Rich, Anna) (Filed on 3/21/2019)
March 21, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by State of California. Motion Hearing set for 4/18/2019 12:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 4/8/2019. Replies due by 4/11/2019. (Rich, Anna) (Filed on 3/21/2019)
March 20, 2019 Filing 25 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Edward M. Chen: Initial Case Management Conference held on 3/20/2019. Plaintiffs to file motion for preliminary injunction by 3/21/2019. Opposition due by 4/8/2019. Reply due by 4/11/2019. Motion Hearing set for 4/18/2019 12:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. See pdf image for further details.Total Time in Court: 25 Minutes. Court Reporter: Katherine Sullivan. Plaintiff Attorneys: Anna Rich, Michelle Ybarra, Justina Sessions. Defendant Attorney: Bradley Humphries. Attachment: Minute Order. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/20/2019)
March 18, 2019 Filing 24 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by State of California. (Rich, Anna) (Filed on 3/18/2019)
March 14, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Change of Address by Anna Margaret Rich (Rich, Anna) (Filed on 3/14/2019)
March 14, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley Philip Humphreys (Humphreys, Bradley) (Filed on 3/14/2019)
March 14, 2019 Filing 21 CLERK'S NOTICE: Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/20/2019 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor. Joint Case Management Statement due by 3/18/2019. The parties are to be present for this first appearance and should be prepared to discuss how they intend to proceed in this litigation before the challenged Rule takes effect. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2019)
March 14, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Kathleen M Boergers (Boergers, Kathleen) (Filed on 3/14/2019)
March 14, 2019 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by State of California re #1 Complaint, for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief (Rich, Anna) (Filed on 3/14/2019)
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #12 Administrative Motion to Relate Case. Case 19-cv-1195-YGR related.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2019)
March 13, 2019 Filing 17 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #12 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION To Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related ) filed byAlex Azar, U.S. Department of Health & Human Services. (Riess, Daniel) (Filed on 3/13/2019)
March 13, 2019 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by State of California re #1 Complaint, for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief (Rich, Anna) (Filed on 3/13/2019)
March 13, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Martin Riess (Riess, Daniel) (Filed on 3/13/2019)
March 12, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Essential Access Health, Inc., Melissa Marshall, M.D. re #13 Order (Tassin, Philip) (Filed on 3/12/2019)
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Re #12 Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/12/2019. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2019)
March 11, 2019 Filing 12 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION To Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related filed by Essential Access Health, Inc., Melissa Marshall, M.D.. Responses due by 3/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Ybarra, Michelle) (Filed on 3/11/2019)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Edward M. Chen for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras Signed by the Clerk on 3/8/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2019)
March 8, 2019 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2019)
March 8, 2019 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by State of California.. (Rich, Anna) (Filed on 3/8/2019)
March 7, 2019 Filing 8 Refund Status re #5 Application for Refund APPROVED. (rghS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2019)
March 6, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Alex Azar, U.S. Department of Health & Human Services. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2019)
March 5, 2019 Filing 6 Proposed Summons. (Rich, Anna) (Filed on 3/5/2019)
March 5, 2019 Filing 5 Application for Refund, Receipt Number 0971-13140269 by State of California. (Rich, Anna) (Filed on 3/5/2019)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/28/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/4/2019 10:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 3/4/19. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2019)
March 4, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #1 Complaint, filed by State of California Attorney General's Office Parties Entered Incorrectly. Corrected Case Title (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2019) Modified on 3/5/2019 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
March 4, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Brenda Ayon Verduzco (Ayon Verduzco, Brenda) (Filed on 3/4/2019)
March 4, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 3/18/2019. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2019)
March 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF; ADMINISTRATIVE PROCEDURE ACT CASE; (NO PROCESS); against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13140312.). Filed by State of California. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rich, Anna) (Filed on 3/4/2019) Modified on 3/5/2019 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
March 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF; ADMINISTRATIVE PROCEDURE ACT CASE; (NO PROCESS); against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13140312.). Filed by State of California. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rich, Anna) (Filed on 3/4/2019) Modified on 3/5/2019 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State of California v. Azar et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex Azar
Represented By: Bradley Philip Humphreys
Represented By: Daniel Martin Riess
Represented By: R. Charlie Merritt
Represented By: James Mahoney Burnham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Health and Human Services, Secretary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Health & Human Services
Represented By: Bradley Philip Humphreys
Represented By: Daniel Martin Riess
Represented By: R. Charlie Merritt
Represented By: James Mahoney Burnham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of California Attorney General's Office
Represented By: Brenda Ayon Verduzco
Represented By: Anna Margaret Rich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of California
Represented By: Brenda Ayon Verduzco
Represented By: Kathleen M Boergers
Represented By: Ketakee Rajiv Kane
Represented By: Anna Margaret Rich
Represented By: Kathleen Boergers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Essential Access Health, Inc.
Represented By: Michelle Sabrina Ybarra
Represented By: Philip James Tassin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Chris Sevier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Dr. Melissa Marshall, M.D.
Represented By: Michelle Sabrina Ybarra
Represented By: Philip James Tassin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists
Represented By: Catherine J. Djang
Represented By: Douglas Hallward-Driemeier
Represented By: Lisa H Bebchick
Represented By: Daniel Willis Richards
Represented By: Thomas N. Bulleit
Represented By: Haley Eagon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: American College of Physicians
Represented By: Catherine J. Djang
Represented By: Douglas Hallward-Driemeier
Represented By: Lisa H Bebchick
Represented By: Daniel Willis Richards
Represented By: Thomas N. Bulleit
Represented By: Haley Eagon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Society for Maternal-Fetal Medicine
Represented By: Catherine J. Djang
Represented By: Douglas Hallward-Driemeier
Represented By: Lisa H Bebchick
Represented By: Daniel Willis Richards
Represented By: Thomas N. Bulleit
Represented By: Haley Eagon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Texas
Represented By: David Jonathan Hacker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Amici Curiae
Represented By: Benjamin Michael Flowers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Institute for Policy Integrity
Represented By: Jason Abraham Schwartz
Represented By: Denise Antonia Grab
Represented By: Madison Condon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Society for Adolescent Health Medicine
Represented By: Catherine J. Djang
Represented By: Douglas Hallward-Driemeier
Represented By: Lisa H Bebchick
Represented By: Daniel Willis Richards
Represented By: Thomas N. Bulleit
Represented By: Haley Eagon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Arkansas
Represented By: David Jonathan Hacker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: American Academy of Pediatrics, California
Represented By: Catherine J. Djang
Represented By: Douglas Hallward-Driemeier
Represented By: Lisa H Bebchick
Represented By: Daniel Willis Richards
Represented By: Thomas N. Bulleit
Represented By: Haley Eagon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Louisiana
Represented By: David Jonathan Hacker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Ohio
Represented By: David Jonathan Hacker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: American Center for Law and Justice
Represented By: Jay Alan Sekulow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Susan B. Anthony List
Represented By: Michael Scott Treppa
Represented By: Adam Hochschild
Represented By: Sarah E Pitlyk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: South Carolina
Represented By: David Jonathan Hacker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Alabama
Represented By: David Jonathan Hacker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: South Dakota
Represented By: David Jonathan Hacker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Indiana
Represented By: David Jonathan Hacker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Kentucky
Represented By: David Jonathan Hacker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Oklahoma
Represented By: David Jonathan Hacker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?