Essential Access Health, Inc. et al v. Azar II et al
Plaintiff: Essential Access Health, Inc. and Melissa Marshall, M.D.
Defendant: U.S. Department of Health and Human Services and Alex M. Azar II
Amicus Curiae: American College of Physicians, Society for Maternal-Fetal Medicine, American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists, American Academy of Pediatrics, California, City and County of San Francisco, Susan B. Anthony List and Society for Adolescent Health Medicine
Case Number: 3:2019cv01195
Filed: March 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edward M Chen
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 2, 2019 Filing 79 Transcript of Proceedings held on 4-18-2019, before Judge Edward M. Chen. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra L. Pas, CRR, telephone number (415) 431-1477/Email: Debra_Pas@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (101 in 3:19-cv-01184-EMC) Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/31/2019. (pasdl50S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2019)
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting in Part and Denying in Part #25 Plaintiffs' Motions for Preliminary Injunction. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2019)
April 26, 2019 Filing 77 NOTICE by Alex M. Azar II, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Riess, Daniel) (Filed on 4/26/2019)
April 18, 2019 Filing 76 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Edward M. Chen: Motion Hearing held on 4/18/2019 in case 3:19-cv-01184-EMC; Motion Hearing held on 4/18/2019 in case 3:19-cv-01195-EMC. Matters taken under submission.Total Time in Court: 2 Hours; 14 Minutes. Court Reporter: Debra Pas. Plaintiff Attorneys: Anna Rich, Michelle Ybarra, Justina Sessions, Sophie Hood, Divya Musinipally, Kathryn Bowen, Philip Tassin. Defendant Attorneys: James Burnham, R. Charlie Merritt. Attachment: Minute Order. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/18/2019)
April 17, 2019 Filing 75 Declaration of Melanie Fontes Rainer in Support of #73 Supplemental Brief filed byEssential Access Health, Inc., Melissa Marshall, M.D.. (Related document(s) #73 ) (Ybarra, Michelle) (Filed on 4/17/2019)
April 17, 2019 Filing 74 Declaration of Michelle Ybarra in Support of #73 Supplemental Brief filed byEssential Access Health, Inc., Melissa Marshall, M.D.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) #73 ) (Ybarra, Michelle) (Filed on 4/17/2019)
April 17, 2019 Filing 73 Supplemental Submission in Support of Plaintiffs' #25 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Essential Access Health, Inc., Melissa Marshall, M.D.. (Related document(s) #66 ) (Ybarra, Michelle) (Filed on 4/17/2019) Modified on 4/18/2019 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
April 17, 2019 Filing 72 Defendants Response to #66 Order re Supplemental Submissions filed by Alex M. Azar II, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Related document(s) #66 ) (Humphreys, Bradley) (Filed on 4/17/2019) Modified on 4/18/2019 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
April 17, 2019 Filing 71 NOTICE of Appearance by R. Charlie Merritt (Merritt, R.) (Filed on 4/17/2019)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 70 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #68 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2019)
April 15, 2019 Filing 69 Statement of Non-Opposition re #54 MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Amicus Curiae in Support of Defendants filed byEssential Access Health, Inc., Melissa Marshall, M.D.. (Related document(s) #54 ) (Ybarra, Michelle) (Filed on 4/15/2019)
April 15, 2019 Filing 68 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13262209.) filed by Susan B. Anthony List. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing from MO Bar)(Pitlyk, Sarah) (Filed on 4/15/2019)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 67 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #65 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2019)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER Re Supplemental Submissions. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/15/2019. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2019)
April 12, 2019 Filing 65 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13256067.) filed by Susan B. Anthony List. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Hochschild, Adam) (Filed on 4/12/2019)
April 11, 2019 Filing 64 Declaration of Julie Rabinovitz in Support of #63 Reply to Opposition/Response, #25 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Supplemental) filed byEssential Access Health, Inc., Melissa Marshall, M.D.. (Related document(s) #63 , #25 ) (Ybarra, Michelle) (Filed on 4/11/2019)
April 11, 2019 Filing 63 REPLY in Support (re #25 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction) filed by Essential Access Health, Inc., Melissa Marshall, M.D.. (Ybarra, Michelle) (Filed on 4/11/2019)
April 10, 2019 Filing 62 MOTION to File Amicus Curiae Brief Motion for Leave to Appear as Amici Curiae and to File an Amicus Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction filed by City and County of San Francisco. Motion Hearing set for 4/18/2019 12:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 4/22/2019. Replies due by 4/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Eisenberg, Sara) (Filed on 4/10/2019)
April 10, 2019 Filing 61 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Salomon (Salomon, Sarah) (Filed on 4/10/2019)
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #50 Motion to File Amicus Curiae Brief. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2019)
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 59 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #49 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2019)
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 58 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #48 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2019)
April 9, 2019 Filing 57 Brief re #54 MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Amicus Curiae in Support of Defendants filed bySusan B. Anthony List. (Related document(s) #54 ) (Treppa, Michael) (Filed on 4/9/2019)
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 56 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #47 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2019)
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 55 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #46 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2019)
April 9, 2019 Filing 54 MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Amicus Curiae in Support of Defendants filed by Susan B. Anthony List. (Treppa, Michael) (Filed on 4/9/2019)
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 53 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #45 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2019)
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 52 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #44 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2019)
April 9, 2019 Filing 51 NOTICE of Appearance by James Mahoney Burnham (Burnham, James) (Filed on 4/9/2019)
April 8, 2019 Filing 50 Consent MOTION to File Amicus Curiae Brief filed by American Academy of Pediatrics, California, American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists, American College of Physicians, Society for Adolescent Health Medicine, Society for Maternal-Fetal Medicine. Motion Hearing set for 4/18/2019 12:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 4/22/2019. Replies due by 4/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Richards, Daniel) (Filed on 4/8/2019)
April 8, 2019 Filing 49 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Haley Eagon (Correction of #47 ) ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13242588.) Filing fee previously paid on 4/8/2019 filed by American Academy of Pediatrics, California, American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists, American College of Physicians, Society for Adolescent Health Medicine, Society for Maternal-Fetal Medicine. (Richards, Daniel) (Filed on 4/8/2019) Modified on 4/9/2019 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
April 8, 2019 Filing 48 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Douglas H. Hallward-Driemeier ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13242590.) filed by American Academy of Pediatrics, California, American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists, American College of Physicians, Society for Adolescent Health Medicine, Society for Maternal-Fetal Medicine. (Richards, Daniel) (Filed on 4/8/2019)
April 8, 2019 Filing 47 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Haley Eagon ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13242588.) filed by American Academy of Pediatrics, California, American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists, American College of Physicians, Society for Adolescent Health Medicine, Society for Maternal-Fetal Medicine. (Richards, Daniel) (Filed on 4/8/2019)
April 8, 2019 Filing 46 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Catherine J. Djang ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13242586.) filed by American Academy of Pediatrics, California, American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists, American College of Physicians, Society for Adolescent Health Medicine, Society for Maternal-Fetal Medicine. (Richards, Daniel) (Filed on 4/8/2019)
April 8, 2019 Filing 45 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Thomas N. Bulleit ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13242585.) filed by American Academy of Pediatrics, California, American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists, American College of Physicians, Society for Adolescent Health Medicine, Society for Maternal-Fetal Medicine. (Richards, Daniel) (Filed on 4/8/2019)
April 8, 2019 Filing 44 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Lisa H. Bebchick ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13242582.) filed by American Academy of Pediatrics, California, American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists, American College of Physicians, Society for Adolescent Health Medicine, Society for Maternal-Fetal Medicine. (Richards, Daniel) (Filed on 4/8/2019)
April 8, 2019 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Willis Richards (Richards, Daniel) (Filed on 4/8/2019)
April 8, 2019 Filing 42 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #25 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ) filed byAlex M. Azar II, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Humphreys, Bradley) (Filed on 4/8/2019)
March 21, 2019 Filing 41 Declaration of Louise McCarthy in Support of #25 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed byEssential Access Health, Inc., Melissa Marshall, M.D.. (Related document(s) #25 ) (Ybarra, Michelle) (Filed on 3/21/2019)
March 21, 2019 Filing 40 Declaration of Henry N. Tuttle in Support of #25 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed byEssential Access Health, Inc., Melissa Marshall, M.D.. (Related document(s) #25 ) (Ybarra, Michelle) (Filed on 3/21/2019)
March 21, 2019 Filing 39 Declaration of Carmela Castellano-Garcia in Support of #25 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed byEssential Access Health, Inc., Melissa Marshall, M.D.. (Related document(s) #25 ) (Ybarra, Michelle) (Filed on 3/21/2019)
March 21, 2019 Filing 38 Declaration of Tatiana W. Spritos in Support of #25 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed byEssential Access Health, Inc., Melissa Marshall, M.D.. (Related document(s) #25 ) (Ybarra, Michelle) (Filed on 3/21/2019)
March 21, 2019 Filing 37 Declaration of Marie McKinney in Support of #25 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed byEssential Access Health, Inc., Melissa Marshall, M.D.. (Related document(s) #25 ) (Ybarra, Michelle) (Filed on 3/21/2019)
March 21, 2019 Filing 36 Declaration of Shivaun M. Nestor in Support of #25 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed byEssential Access Health, Inc., Melissa Marshall, M.D.. (Related document(s) #25 ) (Ybarra, Michelle) (Filed on 3/21/2019)
March 21, 2019 Filing 35 Declaration of Jane Thomas in Support of #25 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed byEssential Access Health, Inc., Melissa Marshall, M.D.. (Related document(s) #25 ) (Ybarra, Michelle) (Filed on 3/21/2019)
March 21, 2019 Filing 34 Declaration of Kayla Wilburn in Support of #25 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed byEssential Access Health, Inc., Melissa Marshall, M.D.. (Related document(s) #25 ) (Ybarra, Michelle) (Filed on 3/21/2019)
March 21, 2019 Filing 33 Declaration of Jenna Tosh in Support of #25 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed byEssential Access Health, Inc., Melissa Marshall, M.D.. (Related document(s) #25 ) (Ybarra, Michelle) (Filed on 3/21/2019)
March 21, 2019 Filing 32 Declaration of Elizabeth Forer in Support of #25 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed byEssential Access Health, Inc., Melissa Marshall, M.D.. (Related document(s) #25 ) (Ybarra, Michelle) (Filed on 3/21/2019)
March 21, 2019 Filing 31 Declaration of Barbara Ferrer in Support of #25 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed byEssential Access Health, Inc., Melissa Marshall, M.D.. (Related document(s) #25 ) (Ybarra, Michelle) (Filed on 3/21/2019)
March 21, 2019 Filing 30 Declaration of Claire Brindis in Support of #25 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed byEssential Access Health, Inc., Melissa Marshall, M.D.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) #25 ) (Ybarra, Michelle) (Filed on 3/21/2019)
March 21, 2019 Filing 29 Declaration of Kathryn Kost in Support of #25 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed byEssential Access Health, Inc., Melissa Marshall, M.D.. (Related document(s) #25 ) (Ybarra, Michelle) (Filed on 3/21/2019)
March 21, 2019 Filing 28 Declaration of Melissa Marshall, M.D in Support of #25 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed byEssential Access Health, Inc., Melissa Marshall, M.D.. (Related document(s) #25 ) (Ybarra, Michelle) (Filed on 3/21/2019)
March 21, 2019 Filing 27 Declaration of Julie Rabinovitz in Support of #25 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed byEssential Access Health, Inc., Melissa Marshall, M.D.. (Related document(s) #25 ) (Ybarra, Michelle) (Filed on 3/21/2019)
March 21, 2019 Filing 26 Declaration of Michelle Ybarra in Support of #25 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed byEssential Access Health, Inc., Melissa Marshall, M.D.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Related document(s) #25 ) (Ybarra, Michelle) (Filed on 3/21/2019)
March 21, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Essential Access Health, Inc., Melissa Marshall, M.D.. Motion Hearing set for 4/18/2019 12:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 4/8/2019. Replies due by 4/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ybarra, Michelle) (Filed on 3/21/2019)
March 20, 2019 Filing 24 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Edward M. Chen: Initial Case Management Conference held on 3/20/2019. Plaintiffs to file motion for preliminary injunction by 3/21/2019. Opposition due by 4/8/2019. Reply due by 4/11/2019. Motion Hearing set for 4/18/2019 12:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. See pdf image for further details.Total Time in Court: 25 Minutes. Court Reporter: Katherine Sullivan. Plaintiff Attorneys: Anna Rich, Michelle Ybarra, Justina Sessions. Defendant Attorney: Bradley Humphries. Attachment: Minute Order. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/20/2019)
March 20, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathryn E. Bowen (Bowen, Kathryn) (Filed on 3/20/2019)
March 18, 2019 Filing 22 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Essential Access Health, Inc., Melissa Marshall, M.D.. (Sessions, Justina) (Filed on 3/18/2019)
March 15, 2019 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Essential Access Health, Inc., Melissa Marshall, M.D. of additional documents on Defendants (Tassin, Philip) (Filed on 3/15/2019)
March 15, 2019 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Essential Access Health, Inc., Melissa Marshall, M.D. re #1 Complaint, #4 Summons Issued as to USA (as to Defendant U.S. Department of Health and Human Services) (Tassin, Philip) (Filed on 3/15/2019)
March 15, 2019 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Essential Access Health, Inc., Melissa Marshall, M.D. re #1 Complaint, #4 Summons Issued as to USA (Service as to Defendant Alex M. Azar II) (Tassin, Philip) (Filed on 3/15/2019)
March 15, 2019 Filing 18 CLERK'S NOTICE: Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/20/2019 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor. Joint Case Management Statement due by 3/18/2019. The parties are to be present for this first appearance and should be prepared to discuss how they intend to proceed in this litigation before the challenged Rule takes effect. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2019)
March 14, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley Philip Humphreys (Humphreys, Bradley) (Filed on 3/14/2019)
March 14, 2019 Filing 16 Case reassigned to Judge Edward M. Chen Per Related Case Order. Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2019)
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER RELATING CASE. Related to 3:19-cv-1184-EMC. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/13/2019. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2019)
March 11, 2019 Filing 14 Certificate of Interested Entities by Essential Access Health, Inc., Melissa Marshall, M.D. identifying Other Affiliate San Francisco Department of Public Health, Other Affiliate Planned Parenthood Mar Monte, Other Affiliate Tri-City Health Center, Other Affiliate Community Health Systems, Inc., Other Affiliate La Clinica De La Raza, Inc., Other Affiliate HealthRIGHT 360, Other Affiliate Planned Parenthood of the Pacific Southwest, Other Affiliate Camarena Health Center, Other Affiliate Axis Community Health, Other Affiliate Planned Parenthood Pasadena & San Gabriel Valley, Inc., Other Affiliate Planned Parenthood Northern California, Other Affiliate All Peoples Christian Center, Other Affiliate AltaMed Health Services Corporation, Other Affiliate Altura Centers for Health, Other Affiliate Asian Pacific Health Care Venture, Inc., Other Affiliate Black Women for Wellness, Other Affiliate Butte County Public Health Department, Other Affiliate Childrens Law Center of California, Other Affiliate City of Berkeley Department of Health, Other Affiliate Clinica Msr. Oscar A. Romero, Other Affiliate CommuniCare Health Centers, Other Affiliate Community Action Partnership of San Luis Obispo County, Inc., Other Affiliate Comprehensive Community Health Centers, Inc., Other Affiliate County of Los Angeles Department of Health Services, Other Affiliate County of San Luis Obispo Public Health Agency, Other Affiliate East Valley Community Clinic, Other Affiliate East Valley Community Health Center, Inc., Other Affiliate Eisner Health, Other Affiliate Family Health Centers of San Diego, Other Affiliate Family HealthCare Network, Other Affiliate Fresno County EOC, Other Affiliate Hmong Cultural Center of Butte County, Other Affiliate Huckleberry Youth Programs, Other Affiliate Imperial Beach Community Clinic, Other Affiliate Inland Behavioral and Health Services, Inc., Other Affiliate JWCH Institute, Inc., Other Affiliate La Maestra Family Clinic, Inc., Other Affiliate Local Indians for Education (LIFE), Other Affiliate Logan Heights Community Development Corporation (Bethel AME Church), Other Affiliate Los Angeles Metropolitan Churches (LAM), Other Affiliate Los Angeles Trust for Childrens Health, Other Affiliate Marin Community Clinics, Other Affiliate Mountain Health & Community Services, Inc., Other Affiliate Neighborhood HealthCare, Other Affiliate Nevada County Public Health Department, Other Affiliate Northeast Valley Health Corporation, Other Affiliate Planned Parenthood CA Central Coast, Other Affiliate Planned Parenthood of Los Angeles, Other Affiliate Proyecto Pastoral (IMPACTO), Other Affiliate Radiant Health Centers, Other Affiliate Regents of UCLA, Other Affiliate Riverside University Health System-Public Health, Other Affiliate Sacramento Native American Health Center, Other Affiliate Salud Para La Gente, Other Affiliate San Bernardino County Department of Public Health, Other Affiliate San Diego Family Care, Other Affiliate San Francisco Community Health Center (Asian Pacific Islander), Other Affiliate San Ysidro Health, Other Affiliate Santa Rosa Community Health, Other Affiliate Shores of Hope, Other Affiliate South Bay Family Health Care, Other Affiliate South Central Family Health Center, Other Affiliate St. Johns Well Child and Family Center, Other Affiliate T.H.E. Health and Wellness Centers, Other Affiliate Tulare County Health & Human Services, Other Affiliate Valley Community Healthcare, Other Affiliate Valley Health Team, Other Affiliate Venice Family Clinic, Other Affiliate Via Care Community Health Center, Inc., Other Affiliate Vista Community Clinic, Other Affiliate Watts Healthcare Corporation, Other Affiliate Westside Family Health Center, Other Affiliate Wilmington Community Clinic, Other Affiliate Womens Health Specialists for Essential Access Health, Inc.. (Ybarra, Michelle) (Filed on 3/11/2019)
March 11, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Philip James Tassin (Tassin, Philip) (Filed on 3/11/2019)
March 11, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Justina Kahn Sessions (Sessions, Justina) (Filed on 3/11/2019)
March 11, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Sophie Anderson Hood (Hood, Sophie) (Filed on 3/11/2019)
March 11, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Divya Musinipally (Musinipally, Divya) (Filed on 3/11/2019)
March 11, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Michelle Sabrina Ybarra (Ybarra, Michelle) (Filed on 3/11/2019)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 03/08/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2019)
March 7, 2019 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ivaS, COURTSTAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2019)
March 6, 2019 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Essential Access Health, Inc., Melissa Marshall, M.D... (Ybarra, Michelle) (Filed on 3/6/2019)
March 5, 2019 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/28/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/4/2019 01:30 PM. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2019)
March 5, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Alex M. Azar II, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2019)
March 5, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 3/19/2019. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2019)
March 4, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Ybarra, Michelle) (Filed on 3/4/2019)
March 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against Alex M. Azar II, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13140745.). Filed byMelissa Marshall, M.D., Essential Access Health, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ybarra, Michelle) (Filed on 3/4/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Essential Access Health, Inc. et al v. Azar II et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Essential Access Health, Inc.
Represented By: Michelle Sabrina Ybarra
Represented By: Divya Musinipally
Represented By: Kathryn E. Bowen
Represented By: Justina Kahn Sessions
Represented By: Sarah Salomon
Represented By: Sophie Anderson Hood
Represented By: Philip James Tassin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Marshall, M.D.
Represented By: Michelle Sabrina Ybarra
Represented By: Divya Musinipally
Represented By: Kathryn E. Bowen
Represented By: Justina Kahn Sessions
Represented By: Sarah Salomon
Represented By: Sophie Anderson Hood
Represented By: Philip James Tassin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Health and Human Services
Represented By: Bradley Philip Humphreys
Represented By: R. Charlie Merritt
Represented By: Daniel Martin Riess
Represented By: James Mahoney Burnham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex M. Azar II
Represented By: Bradley Philip Humphreys
Represented By: R. Charlie Merritt
Represented By: Daniel Martin Riess
Represented By: James Mahoney Burnham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: American College of Physicians
Represented By: Catherine J. Djang
Represented By: Thomas N. Bulleit
Represented By: Douglas Hallward-Driemeier
Represented By: Lisa H Bebchick
Represented By: Daniel Willis Richards
Represented By: Haley Eagon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Society for Maternal-Fetal Medicine
Represented By: Catherine J. Djang
Represented By: Thomas N. Bulleit
Represented By: Douglas Hallward-Driemeier
Represented By: Lisa H Bebchick
Represented By: Daniel Willis Richards
Represented By: Haley Eagon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists
Represented By: Catherine J. Djang
Represented By: Thomas N. Bulleit
Represented By: Douglas Hallward-Driemeier
Represented By: Lisa H Bebchick
Represented By: Daniel Willis Richards
Represented By: Haley Eagon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: American Academy of Pediatrics, California
Represented By: Catherine J. Djang
Represented By: Thomas N. Bulleit
Represented By: Douglas Hallward-Driemeier
Represented By: Lisa H Bebchick
Represented By: Daniel Willis Richards
Represented By: Haley Eagon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: City and County of San Francisco
Represented By: Sara Jennifer Eisenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Susan B. Anthony List
Represented By: Adam Hochschild
Represented By: Michael Scott Treppa
Represented By: Sarah E Pitlyk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Society for Adolescent Health Medicine
Represented By: Catherine J. Djang
Represented By: Thomas N. Bulleit
Represented By: Douglas Hallward-Driemeier
Represented By: Lisa H Bebchick
Represented By: Daniel Willis Richards
Represented By: Haley Eagon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?