Mon Cheri Bridals, LLC et al v. Cloudflare, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Maggie Sottero Designs, LLC and Mon Cheri Bridals, LLC
Defendant: 1-50 Does and CloudFlare, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv01356
Filed: March 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2019 Filing 35 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras Case Management Statement due by 6/11/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/18/2019 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2019) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/14/2019: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording) (fabS, COURT STAFF).
March 14, 2019 Filing 34 Case transferred in from District of California Central; Case Number 2:18-cv-09453. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: MOTION TO TRANSFER #24 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. The Motion is GRANTED. The Clerk of the Court is ORDERED to transfer this action to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California. Case transferred electronically. MD JS-6. Case Terminated. (iv)
March 4, 2019 Filing 32 MINUTES OF MOTION TO DISMISS #23 ; MOTION TO TRANSFER #24 held before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. The Court invites counsel to present their oral arguments. Arguments by counsel are heard. For the reasons stated on the record, the Court takes the matter under submission. An order will issue. Court Reporter: Amy Diaz. (iv)
February 21, 2019 Filing 31 REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of California #24 filed by Defendant Cloudflare, Inc.. (Bridges, Andrew)
February 21, 2019 Filing 30 Stipulation re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of California #24 filed by Defendant Cloudflare, Inc.. (Bridges, Andrew)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: DEFENDANT CLOUDFLARE, INC'S MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM #23 AND MOTION TO TRANSFER CASE TO THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA FOR THE CONVENIENCE OF PARTIES AND WITNESSES #24 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. The Motion to Dismiss is DENIED as moot. The Court ORDERS Cloudflare to file its Reply in support of the Motion to Transfer by no later than February 22, 2019, addressing the additional question of whether the Motion to Transfer remains appropriate in light of the FAC. Plaintiff may file a Supplemental Opposition of no more than three pages by no later than February 27, 2019, also addressing the appropriateness of the Motion to Transfer in light of the FAC. The hearing remains set for March 4, 2019. (iv)
February 6, 2019 Filing 28 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant All Plaintiffs amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , filed by Plaintiffs Mon Cheri Bridals, LLC, Maggie Sottero Designs, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Owens, Robert)
February 1, 2019 Filing 27 DECLARATION of Craig Hilliard in opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of California #24 filed by Plaintiffs Maggie Sottero Designs, LLC, Mon Cheri Bridals, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Owens, Robert)
February 1, 2019 Filing 26 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of California #24 filed by Plaintiffs Maggie Sottero Designs, LLC, Mon Cheri Bridals, LLC. (Owens, Robert)
February 1, 2019 Filing 25 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #23 filed by Plaintiffs Maggie Sottero Designs, LLC, Mon Cheri Bridals, LLC. (Owens, Robert)
January 16, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of California filed by Defendant Cloudflare, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 3/4/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Transfer Case to N.D. Cal., #2 Declaration of Justin Paine, #3 Declaration of Andrew Bridges, #4 Exhibit A to Declaration of Andrew Bridges, #5 Exhibit B to Declaration of Andrew Bridges, #6 Exhibit C to Declaration of Andrew Bridges, #7 Proposed Order) (Bridges, Andrew)
January 16, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant Cloudflare, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 3/4/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #2 Proposed Order) (Bridges, Andrew)
December 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR MOTIONS #20 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. The Court APPROVES the Stipulation. Cloudflare may file the motion and associated papers by January 16, 2019. If Cloudflare decides not to file a motion to dismiss the action, its responsive pleading shall be due on January 16, 2019. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (iv)
December 26, 2018 Filing 21 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Cloudflare, Inc., identifying Cloudflare, Inc. and Indian Harbor Insurance Company/AXA XL. (Bridges, Andrew)
December 26, 2018 Filing 20 STIPULATION for Leave to extend time to answer complaint filed by Defendant Cloudflare, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Andrew P. Bridges, #2 Proposed Order)(Bridges, Andrew)
December 26, 2018 Filing 19 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Meghan Elyse Fenzel counsel for Defendant Cloudflare, Inc.. Adding Meghan Elyse Fenzel as counsel of record for Cloudflare, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Cloudflare, Inc.. (Attorney Meghan Elyse Fenzel added to party Cloudflare, Inc.(pty:dft))(Fenzel, Meghan)
December 26, 2018 Filing 18 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Armen Nercess Nercessian counsel for Defendant Cloudflare, Inc.. Adding Armen Nercess Nercessian as counsel of record for Cloudflare, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Cloudflare, Inc.. (Attorney Armen Nercess Nercessian added to party Cloudflare, Inc.(pty:dft))(Nercessian, Armen)
December 26, 2018 Filing 17 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Andrew P Bridges counsel for Defendant Cloudflare, Inc.. Adding Andrew Phillip Bridges as counsel of record for Cloudflare, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Cloudflare, Inc.. (Attorney Andrew P Bridges added to party Cloudflare, Inc.(pty:dft))(Bridges, Andrew)
November 29, 2018 Filing 16 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint filed by Plaintiffs Maggie Sottero Designs, LLC, Mon Cheri Bridals, LLC.(Owens, Robert)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE GRANTING #14 on behalf of Plaintiffs, Mon Cheri Bridals, LLC and Maggie Sottero Designs, LLC designating Robert B. Owens as local counsel, by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. (lt)
November 26, 2018 Filing 14 Amendment to APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Craig S. Hilliard to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Maggie Sottero Designs, LLC, Mon Cheri Bridals, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22730298) #9 filed by Plaintiffs Maggie Sottero Designs, LLC, Mon Cheri Bridals, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Good Standing Certification (New Jersey), #2 Exhibit Good Standing Certification (New York), #3 Proposed Order Amended)(Owens, Robert)
November 15, 2018 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Mon Cheri Bridals, LLC, Maggie Sottero Designs, LLC, upon Defendant Cloudflare, Inc. served on 11/9/2018, answer due 11/30/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Trisha Rosano, Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Owens, Robert)
November 14, 2018 Filing 12 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice #9 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. The document is stricken and counsel is ordered to file an amended or corrected document by 11/30/2018. (iv)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 16-05 (Related Case) filed. Transfer of case declined by Judge George H. Wu, for the reasons set forth on this order. Related Case No. 2:16cv5051 GW(AFMx) (rn)
November 13, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Craig S. Hilliard to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Maggie Sottero Designs, LLC, Mon Cheri Bridals, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22730298) #9 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) Certificate of Good Standing not attached for every state court listed to which the applicant has been admitted. (lt)
November 13, 2018 Filing 9 ***STRICKEN*** APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Craig S. Hilliard to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Maggie Sottero Designs, LLC, Mon Cheri Bridals, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22730298) filed by Plaintiffs Maggie Sottero Designs, LLC, Mon Cheri Bridals, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice) (Owens, Robert) Modified on 11/15/2018 Per #12 (iv).
November 8, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Craig S Hilliard. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap)
November 8, 2018 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Cloudflare, Inc. (ghap)
November 8, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
November 8, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (ghap)
November 7, 2018 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintitffs Maggie Sottero Designs, LLC, Mon Cheri Bridals, LLC. (Owens, Robert)
November 7, 2018 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Maggie Sottero Designs, LLC, Mon Cheri Bridals, LLC. (Owens, Robert)
November 7, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Maggie Sottero Designs, LLC, Mon Cheri Bridals, LLC, identifying American Bridal & Prom Industry Association, Inc. and Stephen Lang. (Owens, Robert)
November 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22708963 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Mon Cheri Bridals, LLC, Maggie Sottero Designs, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit "A" to Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit "B" to Complaint) (Attorney Robert B Owens added to party Maggie Sottero Designs, LLC (pty:pla), Attorney Robert B Owens added to party Mon Cheri Bridals, LLC(pty:pla))(Owens, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mon Cheri Bridals, LLC et al v. Cloudflare, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maggie Sottero Designs, LLC
Represented By: Craig S. Hilliard
Represented By: Robert B Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mon Cheri Bridals, LLC
Represented By: Craig S. Hilliard
Represented By: Robert B Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1-50 Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CloudFlare, Inc.
Represented By: Armen Nercess Nercessian
Represented By: Meghan Elyse Fenzel
Represented By: Andrew P. Bridges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?