Bayview Hunters Point Residents et al v. Tetra Tech EC, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Bayview Hunters Point Residents, Catherine Muhammad and Danielle Carpenter
Defendant: Tetra Tech, Inc., FivePoint Holdings LLC, Tetra Tech EC, Inc., Stephen C. Rolfe, Justin E. Hubbard, Dan L. Batrack, Lennar, Inc. and Steven M. Burdick
Case Number: 3:2019cv01417
Filed: March 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: James Donato
Referring Judge: Elizabeth D Laporte
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2019 Filing 24 REPLY (re #12 MOTION to Remand ) filed byBayview Hunters Point Residents, Danielle Carpenter, Catherine Muhammad. (Bonner, Adam) (Filed on 5/14/2019)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Order by Judge James Donato granting #22 Stipulation to Extend Time for Plaintiffs to File Reply Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand. Plaintiffs' reply brief is due by May 14, 2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2019)
May 6, 2019 Filing 22 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO EXTEND TIME FOR PLAINTIFFS TO FILE A REPLY BRIEF filed by Bayview Hunters Point Residents, Danielle Carpenter, Catherine Muhammad. (Bonner, Adam) (Filed on 5/6/2019)
April 30, 2019 Filing 21 Request for Judicial Notice re #19 Opposition/Response to Motion to Remand filed byTetra Tech EC, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23)(Related document(s) #19 ) (Oliver-Thompson, Megan) (Filed on 4/30/2019)
April 30, 2019 Filing 20 Declaration of Andrew N. Bolt in Support of #19 Opposition/Response to Motion to Remand filed byTetra Tech EC, Inc.. (Related document(s) #19 ) (Oliver-Thompson, Megan) (Filed on 4/30/2019)
April 30, 2019 Filing 19 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #12 MOTION to Remand ) filed byTetra Tech EC, Inc.. (Oliver-Thompson, Megan) (Filed on 4/30/2019)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge James Donato for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 4/18/19. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2019)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER RELATING CASE 19-cv-01417-EDL Bayview Hunters Point Residents v. Tetra Tech EC,. Signed by Judge James Donato on 4/17/19. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2019)
April 16, 2019 Filing 16 CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANTS Re: Consent or Declination. Plaintiff/Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 4/23/2019. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2019)
April 16, 2019 Filing 15 CLERK'S NOTICE: The hearing on the motion to remand #12 is rescheduled to 7/2/2019 at 9:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2019)
April 16, 2019 Filing 14 Request for Judicial Notice re #12 MOTION to Remand filed byBayview Hunters Point Residents, Danielle Carpenter, Catherine Muhammad. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #12 ) (Bonner, Adam) (Filed on 4/16/2019)
April 16, 2019 Filing 13 Brief re #12 MOTION to Remand Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed byBayview Hunters Point Residents, Danielle Carpenter, Catherine Muhammad. (Related document(s) #12 ) (Bonner, Adam) (Filed on 4/16/2019)
April 16, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Remand filed by Bayview Hunters Point Residents, Danielle Carpenter, Catherine Muhammad. Motion Hearing set for 5/28/2019 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Responses due by 4/30/2019. Replies due by 5/7/2019. (Bonner, Adam) (Filed on 4/16/2019)
April 11, 2019 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs/Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 4/25/2019. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2019)
April 11, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE by Tetra Tech EC, Inc. re Proof of Filing in State Court of Notice to Adverse Parties of Removal to Federal Court (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Oliver-Thompson, Megan) (Filed on 4/11/2019)
April 8, 2019 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE. The Court has reviewed the motion and determined that no cases are related and no reassignments shall occur. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2019)
April 5, 2019 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE: The parties are hereby notified that the Initial Case Management Conference is rescheduled to 7/9/2019 at 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Case Management Statement is now due by 7/2/2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2019)
March 25, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION Extending Time to Respond to Complaint Until After Resolution of Remand Motion filed by Dan L. Batrack, Steven M. Burdick, Tetra Tech EC, Inc., Tetra Tech, Inc.. (Oliver-Thompson, Megan) (Filed on 3/25/2019)
March 19, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Tetra Tech EC, Inc. (Oliver-Thompson, Megan) (Filed on 3/19/2019)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 6/11/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/18/2019 10:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 3/18/19. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2019)
March 18, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/1/2019. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2019)
March 18, 2019 Filing 3 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Tetra Tech EC, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Tetra Tech, Inc. for Tetra Tech EC, Inc.. (Oliver-Thompson, Megan) (Filed on 3/18/2019)
March 18, 2019 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Tetra Tech EC, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Tetra Tech, Inc., Other Affiliate United States Navy for Tetra Tech EC, Inc.. (Oliver-Thompson, Megan) (Filed on 3/18/2019)
March 18, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF ACTION UNDER 28 U.S.C. 1441(a) AND 1442(A)91); (NO PROCESS); from San Francisco Superior. Their case number is CGC-18-566188. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-13180012). Filed byTetra Tech EC, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Oliver-Thompson, Megan) (Filed on 3/18/2019) Modified on 3/19/2019 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bayview Hunters Point Residents et al v. Tetra Tech EC, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tetra Tech, Inc.
Represented By: Megan Oliver-Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FivePoint Holdings LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tetra Tech EC, Inc.
Represented By: Megan Oliver-Thompson
Represented By: Geoffrey R. Pittman
Represented By: Davina Pujari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen C. Rolfe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin E. Hubbard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan L. Batrack
Represented By: Megan Oliver-Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lennar, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven M. Burdick
Represented By: Megan Oliver-Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bayview Hunters Point Residents
Represented By: Charles A. Bonner
Represented By: Adam Cabral Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherine Muhammad
Represented By: Charles A. Bonner
Represented By: Adam Cabral Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danielle Carpenter
Represented By: Charles A. Bonner
Represented By: Adam Cabral Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?