Bowers v. Interana, Inc.
Plaintiff: Eric Bowers
Defendant: Interana, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv01435
Filed: March 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 5/24/19. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2019)
May 23, 2019 Filing 12 STIPULATION (Joint) of Dismissal with Prejudice filed by Eric Bowers and Interana, Inc. (Fields, Justin) (Filed on 5/23/2019) Modified on 5/23/2019 (amgS, COURT STAFF).
April 30, 2019 Filing 11 Certificate of Interested Entities by Interana, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Vertex Ventures US Fund I, L.P., Other Affiliate Battery Ventures IX, L.P., Other Affiliate Index Ventures VII (Jersey, L.P.) for Interana, Inc.. (Bridges, Andrew) (Filed on 4/30/2019)
April 30, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Interana, Inc.. (Bridges, Andrew) (Filed on 4/30/2019) Modified on 5/1/2019 (amgS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 5/1/2019 (amgS, COURT STAFF).
March 20, 2019 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE RE: Standing Orders and Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording) (amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2019)
March 20, 2019 Filing 8 REPORT on the filing of an action regarding copyright enfringement (cc: form mailed to register). (amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2019)
March 20, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Interana, Inc.. (amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2019)
March 20, 2019 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 6/21/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/28/2019 02:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 01, 17th Floor. (amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2019)
March 20, 2019 Filing 5 Case assigned to Judge Susan Illston. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2019)
March 19, 2019 Filing 4 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding (cc: form mailed to register). (Killian, Meghan) (Filed on 3/19/2019)
March 19, 2019 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Eric Bowers identifying Other Affiliate ImageRights International, Inc. for Eric Bowers. (Killian, Meghan) (Filed on 3/19/2019)
March 19, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Killian, Meghan) (Filed on 3/19/2019)
March 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Copyright Infringement; Demand for Jury Trial against Interana, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13184612.). Filed byEric Bowers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Killian, Meghan) (Filed on 3/19/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bowers v. Interana, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Interana, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew P. Bridges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Bowers
Represented By: Meghan Charlene Killian
Represented By: Justin Jeremy Fields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?