Inn Foods, Inc. v. B3 Distributing, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Inn Foods, Inc., a California corporation and Inn Foods, Inc.
Defendant: B3 Distributing, Inc., a California corporation, Daniel Bever and B3 Distributing, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv01442
Filed: March 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Referring Judge: Jon S Tigar
Nature of Suit: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 07:499
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Inn Foods, Inc. (Meuers, Lawrence) (Filed on 3/26/2019)
March 25, 2019 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 6/19/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/26/2019 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 9, 19th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Standing Order for All Judges of the Northern District) (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2019)
March 22, 2019 #Electronic filing error Re: #10 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice filed by Inn Foods, Inc. - "Document filed in wrong case" [err401]. No further action is necessary. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2019)
March 22, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice by Inn Foods, Inc. (Meuers, Lawrence) (Filed on 3/22/2019)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Jon S. Tigar for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 3/22/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2019)
March 21, 2019 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2019)
March 21, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to B3 Distributing, Inc., a California corporation, Daniel Bever. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2019)
March 21, 2019 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 6/13/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/20/2019 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2019)
March 20, 2019 Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Inn Foods, Inc., a California corporation.. (Meuers, Lawrence) (Filed on 3/20/2019)
March 20, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/3/2019. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2019)
March 20, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Inn Foods, Inc. (Meuers, Lawrence) (Filed on 3/20/2019)
March 20, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Meuers, Lawrence) (Filed on 3/20/2019)
March 20, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL ACTION COMPLAINT against B3 Distributing, Inc. and Daniel Bever, (Filing Fee: $400.00, receipt number 0971-13186694). Filed by Inn Foods, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Invoices, #2 Exhibit B - Bills of Lading, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Meuers, Lawrence) (Filed on 3/20/2019) Modified on 3/21/2019 (slhS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Inn Foods, Inc. v. B3 Distributing, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Inn Foods, Inc., a California corporation
Represented By: Lawrence Henry Meuers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Inn Foods, Inc.
Represented By: Lawrence Henry Meuers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B3 Distributing, Inc., a California corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Bever
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B3 Distributing, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?