Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company v. Ford Motor Company
Plaintiff: Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv01458
Filed: March 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2019 Filing 19 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Vince Chhabria: Initial Case Management Conference held on 6/26/2019. Case referred to Private ADR, which is to be completed by 2/21/2020. The two related cases on calendar today are to be adjudicated together on the same case schedule: Close of Fact Discovery due by 12/20/2019. Opening Reports due by 11/8/2019. Rebuttal Reports due by 12/13/2019. Close of Expert Discovery due by 2/14/2019. Last day to hear Dispositive and Daubert Motions Hearing set for 4/30/2020 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor before Judge Vince Chhabria. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/15/2020 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor. Jury Trial set for 6/22/2020 08:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor before Judge Vince Chhabria. ***The motions and related briefing for summary judgment and daubert, whether cross motions or not, are to be filed as one document for all motions and one document per brief. There should not be a motion for summary judgment and a separate daubert motion, for example. Total Time in Court: 9 minutes. Hearing not reported or recorded. Plaintiff Attorney: Michael Deal. Defendant Attorney: Samantha Burnett. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (knm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/26/2019)
June 19, 2019 Filing 18 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Ford Motor Company. (Burnett, Samantha) (Filed on 6/19/2019)
June 7, 2019 Filing 17 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Burnett, Samantha) (Filed on 6/7/2019)
June 7, 2019 Filing 16 CLERK'S NOTICE: Judge Chhabria's CMC calendar has shifted from Tuesday afternoons to Wednesday mornings, therefore this case is being rescheduled consistent with the change. Case Management Statement due by 6/19/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/26/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2019)
June 5, 2019 Filing 15 ADR Clerks Notice re: Non-Compliance with Court Order. The parties have failed to file an ADR Certification as required by the Initial Case Management Scheduling Order. Counsel shall comply promptly with the requirements of ADR L.R. 3-5(b) and shall file the ADR Certification. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(cmfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2019)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Order by Judge Vince Chhabria granting #13 Motion to Relate Cases 19-cv-01458-VC, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company v. Ford Motor Company; and 19-cv-02424-LHK, Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company v. Ford Motor Company.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2019)
May 31, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Relate Case filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Samantha Burnett ISO, #2 Exhibit A - Stipulation, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Proposed Order)(Burnett, Samantha) (Filed on 5/31/2019)
April 15, 2019 Filing 12 REASSIGNED CASE - NOTICE OF NEW HEARING DATE: You are notified that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference before Judge Vince Chhabria upon reassignment. For a copy of Judge Chhabria's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov. Case Management Statement due by 6/18/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/25/2019 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2019)
April 4, 2019 Filing 11 Case REASSIGNED to Judge Vince Chhabria. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Susan Van Keulen no longer assigned to case. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording) (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2019)
April 4, 2019 Filing 10 This case will be randomly reassigned to a District Judge outside the San Jose Division pursuant to the Caseload Rebalancing Pilot Program approved by the Court effective March 1, 2018. For information, visit our web page at #http://cand.uscourts.gov/news/225. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2019)
April 4, 2019 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (djmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2019)
April 4, 2019 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Ford Motor Company.. (Camagong, Joan) (Filed on 4/4/2019)
April 4, 2019 Filing 7 *** POSTED IN ERROR *** please see #8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Ford Motor Company.. (Camagong, Joan) (Filed on 4/4/2019) Modified on 4/4/2019 (cv, COURT STAFF).
March 27, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ford Motor Company re 3 Case Assigned by Intake,,, served 3/21/19 (Camagong, Joan) (Filed on 3/27/2019)
March 27, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ford Motor Company re #2 Certificate of Interested Entities, 1 Notice of Removal, served 3/20/19 (Camagong, Joan) (Filed on 3/27/2019)
March 22, 2019 Filing 1 Answer to Removal Complaint byFord Motor Company. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2019)
March 21, 2019 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 6/18/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/25/2019 09:30 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2019)
March 21, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/4/2019. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2019)
March 20, 2019 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Ford Motor Company identifying Other Affiliate State Street Corporation, Other Affiliate Evercore Trust Company, N.A., Other Affiliate The Vanguard Group, Other Affiliate Black Rock, Inc. for Ford Motor Company. (Camagong, Joan) (Filed on 3/20/2019)
March 20, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Monterey. Their case number is 19CV000661. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-13188483). Filed byFord Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Declaration of Joan Camagong, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C)(Camagong, Joan) (Filed on 3/20/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company v. Ford Motor Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael R Deal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Joan Alexis Rabutaso Camagong
Represented By: Samantha K.N. Burnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?