Rexroad et al v. Hyundai Motors Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Susie Rexroad, Guan Perry, Melissa Gurtler, Eduardo Silvera, Julie Esqueda, Deonte Witcher and Claudia Galindo
Defendant: Hyundai Motors America, Hyundai Motors Corporation, Kia Motors America, Inc. and Kia Motors Corporation
Case Number: 3:2019cv01461
Filed: March 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting #19 Stipulation To Stay All Deadlines Pending Resolution of the Motion to Transfer and Coordinate or Consolidate Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407 (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2019)
May 30, 2019 Filing 19 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Stay All Deadlines Pending Resolution of the Motion to Transfer and Coordinate or Consolidate Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407 filed by Hyundai Motors America, Hyundai Motors Corporation, Kia Motors America, Inc., Kia Motors Corporation, Susie Rexroad, Deonte Witcher, Eduardo Silvera, Guan Perry, Melissa Gurtler, Claudia Galindo and Julie Edqueda. (Morgan, Shon) (Filed on 5/30/2019) Modified on 5/30/2019 (amgS, COURT STAFF).
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER, Motions terminated: #17 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Extend Time to Respond to Complaint and Continue Case Management Conference filed by Eduardo Silvera, Claudia Galindo, Susie Rexroad, Julie Esqueda, Kia Motors America, Inc., Deonte Witcher, Melissa Gurtler, Hyundai Motors America, Kia Motors Corporation, Guan Perry, Hyundai Motors Corporation. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/28/19 has been continued to 8/30/2019 02:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 01, 17th Floor.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 4/26/19. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2019)
April 25, 2019 Filing 17 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Extend Time to Respond to Complaint and Continue Case Management Conference filed by Hyundai Motors America, Hyundai Motors Corporation, Kia Motors America, Inc., Kia Motors Corporation, Susie Rexroad, Deonte Witcher, Eduardo Silvera, Guan Perry, Melissa Gurtler, Claudia Galindo and Julie Esqueda. (Morgan, Shon) (Filed on 4/25/2019) Modified on 4/25/2019 (amgS, COURT STAFF).
April 25, 2019 Filing 16 Certificate of Interested Entities by Kia Motors America, Inc., Kia Motors Corporation identifying Other Affiliate Hyundai Motor Company for Kia Motors Corporation; Corporate Parent Kia Motors Corporation for Kia Motors America, Inc.. (Morgan, Shon) (Filed on 4/25/2019)
April 25, 2019 Filing 15 Certificate of Interested Entities by Hyundai Motors America, Hyundai Motors Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Hyundai Motor Company for Hyundai Motors America. (Morgan, Shon) (Filed on 4/25/2019)
April 25, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Tina T. Lo (Lo, Tina) (Filed on 4/25/2019)
April 25, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick T Burns (Burns, Patrick) (Filed on 4/25/2019)
April 25, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Shon Morgan (Morgan, Shon) (Filed on 4/25/2019)
April 9, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Melissa Gurtler, Eduardo Silvera, Julie Esqueda, Deonte Witcher, Claudia Galindo, Susie Rexroad, Guan Perry. Hyundai Motors America served on 4/8/2019, answer due 4/29/2019; Kia Motors America, Inc. served on 4/8/2019, answer due 4/29/2019. (Persinger, Annick) (Filed on 4/9/2019)
April 9, 2019 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/28/2019 02:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 01, 17th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Standing Order, #3 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording) (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2019)
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Susan Illston for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 4/9/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2019)
April 8, 2019 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2019)
April 8, 2019 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 4/22/2019. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2019)
March 26, 2019 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Julie Esqueda, Claudia Galindo, Melissa Gurtler, Guan Perry, Susie Rexroad, Eduardo Silvera, Deonte Witcher.. (Persinger, Annick) (Filed on 3/26/2019)
March 21, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Hyundai Motors America, Hyundai Motors Corporation, Kia Motors America, Inc., Kia Motors Corporation. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2019)
March 21, 2019 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 6/14/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/21/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2019)
March 21, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/4/2019. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2019)
March 20, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Zavareei, Hassan) (Filed on 3/20/2019)
March 20, 2019 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT; Jury Trial Demanded against Hyundai Motors America, Hyundai Motors Corporation, Kia Motors America, Inc., Kia Motors Corporation (Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number 0971-13189038.). Filed by Melissa Gurtler, Eduardo Silvera, Julie Esqueda, Deonte Witcher, Claudia Galindo, Susie Rexroad, Guan Perry. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Zavareei, Hassan) (Filed on 3/20/2019) Modified on 3/21/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rexroad et al v. Hyundai Motors Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susie Rexroad
Represented By: Hassan Ali Zavareei
Represented By: Jonathan Marc Streisfeld
Represented By: Annick Marie Persinger
Represented By: Jeffrey Douglas Kaliel
Represented By: Tanya Susan Koshy
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Sophia Goren Gold
Represented By: Sharon S. Almonrode
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guan Perry
Represented By: Hassan Ali Zavareei
Represented By: Jonathan Marc Streisfeld
Represented By: Annick Marie Persinger
Represented By: Jeffrey Douglas Kaliel
Represented By: Tanya Susan Koshy
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Sophia Goren Gold
Represented By: Sharon S. Almonrode
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Gurtler
Represented By: Hassan Ali Zavareei
Represented By: Jonathan Marc Streisfeld
Represented By: Annick Marie Persinger
Represented By: Jeffrey Douglas Kaliel
Represented By: Tanya Susan Koshy
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Sophia Goren Gold
Represented By: Sharon S. Almonrode
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eduardo Silvera
Represented By: Hassan Ali Zavareei
Represented By: Jonathan Marc Streisfeld
Represented By: Annick Marie Persinger
Represented By: Jeffrey Douglas Kaliel
Represented By: Tanya Susan Koshy
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Sophia Goren Gold
Represented By: Sharon S. Almonrode
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Esqueda
Represented By: Hassan Ali Zavareei
Represented By: Jonathan Marc Streisfeld
Represented By: Annick Marie Persinger
Represented By: Jeffrey Douglas Kaliel
Represented By: Tanya Susan Koshy
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Sophia Goren Gold
Represented By: Sharon S. Almonrode
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deonte Witcher
Represented By: Hassan Ali Zavareei
Represented By: Jonathan Marc Streisfeld
Represented By: Annick Marie Persinger
Represented By: Jeffrey Douglas Kaliel
Represented By: Tanya Susan Koshy
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Sophia Goren Gold
Represented By: Sharon S. Almonrode
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claudia Galindo
Represented By: Hassan Ali Zavareei
Represented By: Jonathan Marc Streisfeld
Represented By: Annick Marie Persinger
Represented By: Jeffrey Douglas Kaliel
Represented By: Tanya Susan Koshy
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Sophia Goren Gold
Represented By: Sharon S. Almonrode
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hyundai Motors America
Represented By: Patrick T Burns
Represented By: Shon Morgan
Represented By: Tina T. Lo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hyundai Motors Corporation
Represented By: Patrick T Burns
Represented By: Shon Morgan
Represented By: Tina T. Lo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kia Motors America, Inc.
Represented By: Patrick T Burns
Represented By: Shon Morgan
Represented By: Tina T. Lo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kia Motors Corporation
Represented By: Patrick T Burns
Represented By: Shon Morgan
Represented By: Tina T. Lo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?