Tesla, Inc. v. Cao

Plaintiff: Tesla, Inc.
Defendant: Guangzhi Cao
Case Number: 3:2019cv01463
Filed: March 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Referring Judge: Susan van Keulen
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Filing 32 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Vince Chhabria: Telephonic Initial Case Management Conference held on 7/10/2019. The parties are ordered to file a stipulation and proposed order within 60 days outlining their preferred method of ADR. Case Schedule: Initial Disclosures due by 8/16/2019. Last day to amend pleadings due by 9/3/2019. Close of Fact Discovery due by 2/28/2020. Designation of Experts due by 3/27/2020. Rebuttal Reports due by 4/10/2020. Close of Expert Discovery due by 5/1/2020. Last day to hear Dispositive Motion Hearing set for 7/16/2020 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor before Judge Vince Chhabria. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/24/2020 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor. Jury Trial set for 9/14/2020 08:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor before Judge Vince Chhabria. Case Management Statement due by 11/13/2019. Further Case Management Conference set for 11/20/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor.Total Time in Court: 9 minutes. Hearing not reported or recorded. Plaintiff Attorney: Bree Hann and Fred Norton. Defendant Attorney: Mark Conrad. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (knm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/10/2019)
July 8, 2019 Filing 31 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byGuangzhi Cao. (Conrad, Mark) (Filed on 7/8/2019)
July 3, 2019 Filing 30 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Tesla, Inc.. (Turetzky, Matthew) (Filed on 7/3/2019)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Order by Judge Vince Chhabria granting #28 Motion to Appear by Telephone. Telephonic Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/10/2019 11:00 AM. Defendant is ordered to provide the Court and opposing counsel a telephone conference phone number to use for the hearing by July 5, 2019, by way of email to the Court at vccrd@cand.uscourts.gov, with a cc to opposing counsel.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2019)
July 2, 2019 Filing 28 MOTION to Appear by Telephone at the Initial Case Management Conference filed by Guangzhi Cao. (Conrad, Mark) (Filed on 7/2/2019)
July 1, 2019 Filing 27 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint filed by Guangzhi Cao. (Conrad, Mark) (Filed on 7/1/2019)
June 18, 2019 Filing 26 Certificate of Interested Entities by Guangzhi Cao (Conrad, Mark) (Filed on 6/18/2019)
June 17, 2019 Filing 25 CLERK'S NOTICE RESCHEDULING THE INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FROM 7/3/2019 TO 7/10/2019. Judge Chhabria will not be holding court hearings on 7/3/2019, and therefore is resetting this matter. Case Management Statement due by 7/3/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/10/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2019)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Order by Judge Vince Chhabria granting #23 Stipulation to Continue Initial Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 6/26/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/3/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2019)
June 3, 2019 Filing 23 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to continue Initial Case Management Conference filed by Tesla, Inc.. (Turetzky, Matthew) (Filed on 6/3/2019)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Order by Judge Vince Chhabria granting #18 Stipulated Protective Order.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2019)
May 29, 2019 Filing 21 CLERK'S NOTICE RESCHEDULING THE INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FROM 6/18/2019 TO 6/26/2019. Judge Chhabria's CMC calendar has shifted from Tuesday afternoons to Wednesday mornings, therefore this case is being rescheduled consistent with the change. Case Management Statement due by 6/19/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/26/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2019)
May 28, 2019 Filing 20 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Turetzky, Matthew) (Filed on 5/28/2019)
May 28, 2019 Filing 19 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Conrad, Mark) (Filed on 5/28/2019)
May 28, 2019 Filing 18 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER (Stipulated Protective Order) filed by Tesla, Inc.. (Turetzky, Matthew) (Filed on 5/28/2019)
May 8, 2019 Filing 17 STIPULATION For Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint filed by Guangzhi Cao. (Kipnis, Gabriela) (Filed on 5/8/2019)
April 25, 2019 Filing 16 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint filed by Guangzhi Cao. (Kipnis, Gabriela) (Filed on 4/25/2019)
April 15, 2019 Filing 15 REASSIGNED CASE - NOTICE OF NEW HEARING DATE: You are notified that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference before Judge Vince Chhabria upon reassignment. For a copy of Judge Chhabria's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov. Case Management Statement due by 6/11/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/18/2019 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2019)
April 9, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark R. Conrad (Conrad, Mark) (Filed on 4/9/2019)
April 9, 2019 Filing 13 STIPULATION For Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint filed by Guangzhi Cao. (Kipnis, Gabriela) (Filed on 4/9/2019)
April 9, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Gabriela Kipnis (Kipnis, Gabriela) (Filed on 4/9/2019)
April 8, 2019 Filing 11 Case reassigned to Judge Vince Chhabria. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Judge Susan Van Keulen no longer assigned to case. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording) (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2019)
April 8, 2019 Filing 10 This case will be randomly reassigned to a District Judge outside the San Jose Division pursuant to the Caseload Rebalancing Pilot Program approved by the Court effective March 1, 2018. For information, visit our web page at #http://cand.uscourts.gov/news/225. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2019)
April 5, 2019 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (djmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2019)
April 4, 2019 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Tesla, Inc... (Turetzky, Matthew) (Filed on 4/4/2019)
March 26, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Tesla, Inc. re #6 Summons Issued (Turetzky, Matthew) (Filed on 3/26/2019)
March 22, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Guangzhi Cao. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2019)
March 21, 2019 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 6/18/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/25/2019 09:30 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2019)
March 21, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/4/2019. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2019)
March 21, 2019 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Tesla, Inc. (Norton, William) (Filed on 3/21/2019)
March 21, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Norton, William) (Filed on 3/21/2019)
March 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13189280.). Filed byTesla, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Norton, William) (Filed on 3/21/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tesla, Inc. v. Cao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guangzhi Cao
Represented By: Mark R. Conrad
Represented By: Gabriela Kipnis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tesla, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew William Turetzky
Represented By: William Fred Norton, Jr.
Represented By: Bree Hann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?