Martha v. Catania
Plaintiff: George Nimer Martha
Defendant: Gene Catania
Case Number: 3:2019cv01535
Filed: March 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jon S Tigar
Referring Judge: Kandis A Westmore
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2019 Filing 30 Letter from Goerge Martha. (Attachments: #(1) Envelope) (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2019)
May 24, 2019 mailed copy of re #29 Order Revoking IFP Status on Appeal to United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2019)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Order Revoking IFP Status On Appeal re #28 USCA Order. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 23, 2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2019)
May 22, 2019 Filing 28 USCA REFERRAL NOTICE as to #26 Notice of Appeal filed by George Nimer Martha. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2019)
May 22, 2019 Filing 27 USCA Case Number 19-16044 for #26 Notice of Appeal filed by George Nimer Martha. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2019)
May 15, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by George Nimer Martha. Appeal of Order Adopting Report and Recommendations #25 - (Filing Fee: ifp granted 4/22/2019). (Attachments: #(1) Envelope) (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2019)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER ADOPTING MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION for #17 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 10, 2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2019)
May 6, 2019 Filing 24 Letter from George Martha. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2019)
April 29, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION TO SET MATTER FOR JURY TRIAL filed by George Nimer Martha. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2019)
April 29, 2019 Filing 22 EMERGENCY MOTION FOR T.R.O. filed by George Nimer Martha. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2019)
April 29, 2019 Filing 21 Letter from George Martha. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2019)
April 24, 2019 Filing 20 Letter from George Martha. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2019)
April 24, 2019 Filing 19 Letter from George Martha re #10 Consent/Declination. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2019)
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION to dismiss without prejudice #1 Complaint, filed by George Nimer Martha, ORDER granting #4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by George Nimer Martha. Objections to R&R due by 5/9/2019. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 4/22/2019. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2019) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/22/2019: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (ivaS, COURTSTAFF).
April 22, 2019 Filing 16 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 6/26/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/3/2019 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 9, 19th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service, #2 Standing Order, #3 Standing Order for All Judges of the Northern District) (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2019)
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jon S. Tigar for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Clerk on 4/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2019)
April 19, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE filed by George Nimer Martha (Attachments: #(1) Envelope) (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2019)
April 19, 2019 Filing 14 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge. Certificate of Service attached. (ivaS, COURTSTAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2019)
April 17, 2019 Filing 13 Letter from George Martha. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2019)
April 15, 2019 Filing 12 Letter from George Nimer Martha. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2019)
April 15, 2019 Filing 11 Letter from George Nimer Martha. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2019)
April 15, 2019 Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by George Nimer Martha.. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2019) Modified on 4/17/2019 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
April 12, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE by George Nimer Martha. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2019)
April 10, 2019 Filing 8 Statement by George Nimer Martha. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2019)
April 10, 2019 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 4/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (ivaS, COURTSTAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2019)
April 9, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel filed by George Nimer Martha. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2019) Modified on 4/16/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
April 8, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE by George Nimer Martha. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2019)
March 22, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by George Nimer Martha. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(rcsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2019) (**disregard, attached in error.** Additional attachment(s) added on 3/27/2019: #2 Standing Order) (jjbS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 3/27/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
March 22, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Protective Order filed by George Nimer Martha. Responses due by 4/5/2019. Replies due by 4/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(rcsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2019)
March 22, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 6/18/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/25/2019 at 1:30 PM at the Ronald Dellums Federal Building, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA. (rcsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2019) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/27/2019: #1 Standing Order) (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
March 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Gene Catania. Filed by George Nimer Martha. Consent/Declination due by 4/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(rcsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2019) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/25/2019: #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (rcsS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martha v. Catania
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gene Catania
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Nimer Martha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?