Uniloc USA, Inc. et al v. Apple Inc.
Plaintiff: UNILOC Luxembourg S.A. and Uniloc USA, Inc.
Defendant: Apple Inc
Case Number: 3:2019cv01691
Filed: April 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Sallie Kim
Referring Judge: Jon S Tigar
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 77 Order Staying Case by Judge Jon S. Tigar.(mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2019)
June 5, 2019 Filing 76 CLERK'S NOTICE DETERMINING THAT NO CASES ARE RELATED. re 68 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related Under Civil Local Rule 3-12. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2019)
June 4, 2019 Filing 75 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER Re: Joint Motion to Stay filed by UNILOC Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Foster, James) (Filed on 6/4/2019)
June 4, 2019 Filing 74 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Case Management Statement due 8/14/2019 by 5:00 PM. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/21/2019 2:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 09, 19th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2019)
May 23, 2019 Filing 73 Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Uniloc's First Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Apple Inc. Motion Hearing set for 6/27/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 09, 19th Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 6/6/2019. Replies due by 6/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Defendant Apple Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss)(Corbett, Christine) (Filed on 5/23/2019)
May 22, 2019 Filing 72 Certification of Interested Entities or Persons (Civil Local Rule 3-15) filed by Apple Inc. (Corbett, Christine) (Filed on 5/22/2019)
May 22, 2019 Filing 71 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Corbett, Christine) (Filed on 5/22/2019)
May 22, 2019 Filing 70 *****PLEASE DISREGARD. DOCKET ENTRY MADE IN ERROR.***** CLERK'S NOTICE DETERMINING THAT NO CASES ARE RELATED. re #68 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related Under Civil Local Rule 3-12. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2019) Modified on 5/22/2019 (mllS, COURT STAFF).
May 21, 2019 Filing 69 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Jacobs, Aaron) (Filed on 5/21/2019)
May 20, 2019 Filing 68 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related Under Civil Local Rule 3-12 filed by Apple Inc. Responses due by 5/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christine K. Corbett in Support of Defendant Apple Inc.'s Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related Under Civil Local Rule 3-12, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Proposed Order)(Corbett, Christine) (Filed on 5/20/2019) Modified on 5/22/2019 (mllS, COURT STAFF).
May 20, 2019 Filing 67 Certification of Interested Entities or Persons (Civil Local Rule 3-15) filed by Apple Inc. (Corbett, Christine) (Filed on 5/20/2019)
April 11, 2019 Filing 66 JOINT STIPULATION Regarding Responsive Pleading filed by Apple Inc. (Corbett, Christine) (Filed on 4/11/2019)
April 11, 2019 Filing 65 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 6/5/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/12/2019 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 9, 19th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Standing Order for All Judges of the Northern District) (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2019)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Jon S. Tigar for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 4/10/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2019)
April 9, 2019 Filing 63 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Apple Inc.. (Corbett, Christine) (Filed on 4/9/2019)
April 4, 2019 Filing 62 NOTICE of Pendency of Other Action Involving Same Patent by UNILOC Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Foster, James) (Filed on 4/4/2019)
April 3, 2019 Filing 61 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Joint Case Management Statement due by 6/24/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/1/2019 at 1:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2019)
April 2, 2019 Filing 60 CASE TRANSFERRED in from United States District Court for the Western District of Texas (Austin); Case Number 1:18-cv- 00158-LY. Original File Certified Copy of Transfer Order and Docket Sheet Received. Modified on 4/3/2019 (tnS, COURT STAFF).
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER GRANTING #37 Motion to Transfer Venue and this case is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California; DISMISSING #29 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (td)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER GRANTING #57 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (td)
March 6, 2019 Filing 57 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Andrew Stein by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Guaragna, John)
March 1, 2019 Filing 56 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Apple Inc., re #37 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Defendant Apple Inc. (Attachments: #1 Guaragna Decl., #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8)(Guaragna, John)
February 15, 2019 Filing 55 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Uniloc Luxembourg, S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc., re #37 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Defendant Apple Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kevin Gannon, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Exhibit R, #20 Exhibit S, #21 Exhibit T, #22 Exhibit U, #23 Exhibit V, #24 Exhibit W, #25 Exhibit X, #26 Exhibit Y, #27 Exhibit Z, #28 Exhibit AA, #29 Exhibit BB, #30 Exhibit CC, #31 Exhibit DD, #32 Exhibit EE, #33 Exhibit FF, #34 Exhibit GG, #35 Exhibit HH, #36 Exhibit II, #37 Exhibit JJ, #38 Exhibit KK, #39 Declaration of James J. Foster, #40 Proposed Order)(Gannon, Kevin)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER Granting Joint Stipulation Setting Deadlines. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (lt)
September 20, 2018 Filing 53 Transcript filed of Proceedings held on September 11, 2018, Proceedings Transcribed: Motions Hearing. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Arlinda Rodriguez, Telephone number: 512-391-8791. Parties are notified of their duty to review the transcript to ensure compliance with the FRCP 5.2(a)/FRCrP 49.1(a). A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a Notice of Redaction Request must be filed within 21 days. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed Redaction Request due 10/11/2018, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/22/2018, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/19/2018, (Rodriguez, Arlinda)
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 52 PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING THE DISCLOSURE AND USE OF DISCOVERY MATERIALS. Signed by Judge Mark Lane. (td)
September 13, 2018 Motions No Longer Referred: #41 Opposed MOTION FOR AN INTERIM PROTECTIVE ORDER. (td)
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER DENYING #41 Opposed Motion for Interim Protective Order. Signed by Judge Mark Lane. (td)
September 11, 2018 Filing 50 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mark Lane: Motion Hearing held on 9/11/2018 re #41 Opposed MOTION FOR AN INTERIM PROTECTIVE ORDER filed by Uniloc Luxembourg, S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter ero.)(td)
September 10, 2018 Filing 49 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Shawn A. Latchford on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg, S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. Attorney Shawn A. Latchford added to party Uniloc Luxembourg, S.A.(pty:pla), Attorney Shawn A. Latchford added to party Uniloc USA, Inc.(pty:pla) (Latchford, Shawn)
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER GRANTING #46 Motion for Referral to Magistrate Judge Lane. ORDERED that all pending and future non-dispositive motions in this case related to the scope of venue discovery are REFERRED to United States Magistrate Judge Mark Lane for resolution. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (td)
September 5, 2018 Filing 47 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Apple Inc., re #46 MOTION FOR REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE LANE (EXPEDITED) filed by Plaintiff Uniloc Luxembourg, S.A., Plaintiff Uniloc USA, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Guaragna, John)
September 5, 2018 Filing 46 MOTION FOR REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE LANE (EXPEDITED) by Uniloc Luxembourg, S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gannon, Kevin)
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER Setting Hearing on #41 Opposed MOTION FOR AN INTERIM PROTECTIVE ORDER : Motion Hearing set for 9/11/2018 at 09:30 AM before Judge Mark Lane. Signed by Judge Mark Lane. (lt)
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER REFERRING MOTION: #41 Opposed MOTION FOR AN INTERIM PROTECTIVE ORDER filed by Uniloc Luxembourg, S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. Referral Magistrate Judge: Mark Lane. (lt)
August 24, 2018 Filing 43 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Uniloc Luxembourg, S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc., re #41 Opposed MOTION FOR AN INTERIM PROTECTIVE ORDER filed by Plaintiff Uniloc Luxembourg, S.A., Plaintiff Uniloc USA, Inc. (Foster, James)
August 23, 2018 Filing 42 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Apple Inc., re #41 Opposed MOTION FOR AN INTERIM PROTECTIVE ORDER filed by Plaintiff Uniloc Luxembourg, S.A., Plaintiff Uniloc USA, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order)(Guaragna, John)
August 16, 2018 Filing 41 Opposed MOTION FOR AN INTERIM PROTECTIVE ORDER by Uniloc Luxembourg, S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Foster, James)
July 18, 2018 Filing 40 STATUS REPORT on Venue Discovery by Apple Inc.. (Guaragna, John)
June 26, 2018 Filing 39 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Uniloc Luxembourg, S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc., re #37 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Defendant Apple Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kevin Gannon, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Exhibit R, #20 Exhibit S, #21 Declaration of James J. Foster, #22 Exhibit 1, #23 Proposed Order)(Gannon, Kevin)
June 19, 2018 Filing 38 Transcript filed of Proceedings held on June 12, 2018, Proceedings Transcribed: Initial Pretrial Conference. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Arlinda Rodriguez, Telephone number: 512-391-8791. Parties are notified of their duty to review the transcript to ensure compliance with the FRCP 5.2(a)/FRCrP 49.1(a). A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a Notice of Redaction Request must be filed within 21 days. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed Redaction Request due 7/10/2018, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/20/2018, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/17/2018, (Rodriguez, Arlinda)
June 12, 2018 Filing 37 MOTION to Transfer Venue by Apple Inc. (lt) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/13/2018: #1 Declaration of Michael Jaynes, #2 Declaration of John Guaragna, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Proposed Order) (lt).
June 12, 2018 Case No Longer Stayed per Order #36 for the limited purpose of proceeding with Apple's Motion to Transfer Venue. (lt)
June 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER GRANTING Apple Inc's Unopposed #34 Motion for Leave to File Motion to Transfer Venue. ORDER that the stay is LIFTED for the limited purpose of proceeding with Apple's Motion to Transfer Venue. FURTHER ORDERED that parties shall file a joint proposed scheduling order relating to venue on or before July 10, 2018. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (lt)
June 12, 2018 Filing 35 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lee Yeakel: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 6/12/2018. Written Order forthcoming. (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.) (Court Reporter Arlinda Rodriguez.)(lt)
June 11, 2018 Filing 34 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1404(a) by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Motion to Transfer, #2 Jaynes Decl ISO Motion to Transfer, #3 Guaragna Decl ISO Motion to Transfer, #4 Exhibit 1 to Guaragna Decl., #5 Exhibit 2 to Guaragna Decl, #6 Exhibit 3 to Guaragna Decl, #7 Exhibit 4 to Guaragna Decl, #8 Exhibit 5 to Guaragna Decl, #9 Exhibit 6 to Guaragna Decl, #10 Exhibit 7 to Guaragna Decl, #11 Exhibit 8 to Guaragna Decl, #12 Exhibit 9 to Guaragna Decl, #13 Exhibit 10 to Guaragna Decl, #14 Exhibit 11 to Guaragna Decl, #15 Exhibit 12 to Guaragna Decl, #16 Exhibit 13 to Guaragna Decl, #17 Exhibit 14 to Guaragna Decl, #18 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Transfer, #19 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Leave)(Guaragna, John)
May 30, 2018 Filing 33 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Apple Inc. amending, filed by Uniloc USA, Inc., Uniloc Luxembourg, S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Gannon, Kevin)
May 23, 2018 Filing 32 NOTICE by Uniloc Luxembourg, S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. re #29 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Foster, James)
May 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER SETTING INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND STAYING CASE, (Initial Pretrial Conference set for 6/12/2018 02:00 PM before Judge Lee Yeakel). Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (td)
May 9, 2018 Filing 30 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Apple Inc.. (Erickson, Brian)
May 9, 2018 Filing 29 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Erickson, Brian)
April 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER GRANTING Apple Inc.'s #27 Unopposed MOTION to Set Deadline to Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint. Apple Inc.'s answer due 5/9/2018. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (lt)
April 18, 2018 Filing 27 Unopposed MOTION to Set Deadline to Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint, by Apple Inc.. (Guaragna, John)
March 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER GRANTING #20 Motion by Andrew N. Stein to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (td)
March 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER GRANTING #19 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Mark D. Fowler. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (td)
March 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER GRANTING #18 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Summer Torrez. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dl)
March 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER GRANTING #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Christine K. Corbett. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dl)
March 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER GRANTING #16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Jonathan Hicks. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dl)
March 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING #17 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Larissa Park. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dl)
March 19, 2018 Filing 20 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John Michael Guaragna for Andrew N. Stein ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-10585930) by on behalf of Apple Inc.. (Guaragna, John)
March 19, 2018 Filing 19 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John Michael Guaragna for Mark Fowler ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-10583801) by on behalf of Apple Inc.. (Guaragna, John)
March 15, 2018 Filing 18 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John Michael Guaragna for Summer Torrez ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-10575189) by on behalf of Apple Inc.. (Guaragna, John)
March 15, 2018 Filing 17 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John Michael Guaragna for Larissa Park ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-10575166) by on behalf of Apple Inc.. (Guaragna, John)
March 15, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John Michael Guaragna for Jonathan Hicks ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-10575138) by on behalf of Apple Inc.. (Guaragna, John)
March 15, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John Michael Guaragna for Christine K. Corbett ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-10575071) by on behalf of Apple Inc.. (Guaragna, John)
March 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; Apple Inc. answer due 4/23/2018. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (td)
March 13, 2018 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, or Otherwise Respond by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Guaragna, John)
March 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Lee Yeakel for all proceedings. Judge Robert Pitman no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (td)
March 5, 2018 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Uniloc USA, Inc., Uniloc Luxembourg, S.A.. Apple Inc. served on 3/1/2018, answer due 3/22/2018. (Nelson, Edward)
February 22, 2018 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Apple Inc. (cj)
February 22, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Anthony M. Vecchione on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg, S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Vecchione, Anthony)
February 22, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kevin Gannon on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg, S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Gannon, Kevin)
February 22, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Aaron S. Jacobs on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg, S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Jacobs, Aaron)
February 22, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James J. Foster on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg, S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Foster, James)
February 22, 2018 Filing 5 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Uniloc Luxembourg, S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Nelson, Edward)
February 22, 2018 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Nelson, Edward)
February 22, 2018 Filing 3 Letters sent to Jaul J. Hayes, Kevin Gannon, Dean G. Bostock, and Aaron Jacobs re: Non-admitted status.(cj)
February 22, 2018 Filing 2 Report on Patent/Trademark sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office along with copy of Complaint. (cj)
February 22, 2018 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Uniloc Luxembourg, S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (cj)
February 22, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cj)
February 22, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-10489116), filed by Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Nelson, Edward) (Attachment 2 replaced and flattened on 2/22/2018) (cj). (Main Document 1 replaced with corrected admitted attorneys on case on 2/22/2018) (cj).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Uniloc USA, Inc. et al v. Apple Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc
Represented By: Larissa Bifano
Represented By: Christine K Corbett
Represented By: Mark D Fowler
Represented By: Jonathan H Hicks
Represented By: Summer Torrez
Represented By: Andrew N. Stein
Represented By: Brian K. Erickson
Represented By: John Michael Guaragna
Represented By: Jeffrey Reuben Cole
Represented By: Christine Kerba Corbett
Represented By: Larissa Susan Bifano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNILOC Luxembourg S.A.
Represented By: James J. Foster
Represented By: Shawn A Latchford
Represented By: Kevin Gannon
Represented By: Edward Nelson, III
Represented By: Anthony M Vecchione
Represented By: Aaron S. Jacobs
Represented By: Aaron Seth Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Uniloc USA, Inc.
Represented By: James J. Foster
Represented By: Shawn A Latchford
Represented By: Kevin Gannon
Represented By: Edward Nelson, III
Represented By: Anthony M Vecchione
Represented By: Aaron S. Jacobs
Represented By: Aaron Seth Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?