Uniloc USA, Inc. et al v. Apple Inc.
Plaintiff: UNILOC Luxembourg S.A. and Uniloc USA, Inc.
Defendant: Apple Inc
Case Number: 3:2019cv01694
Filed: April 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M Cousins
Referring Judge: Jon S Tigar
Nature of Suit: Patent - Abbreviated New Drug Applications (ANDA)
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER STAYING CASE PENDING RESOLUTION OF INTER PARTES REVIEW PROCEEDINGS by Judge Jon S. Tigar.(mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2019)
June 12, 2019 Filing 59 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER STAYING CASE PENDING RESOLUTION OF INTER PARTES REVIEW PROCEEDINGS filed by UNILOC Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Foster, James) (Filed on 6/12/2019)
May 23, 2019 Filing 58 SECOND JOINT STIPULATION Regarding Responsive Pleading filed by Apple Inc. (Corbett, Christine) (Filed on 5/23/2019)
April 11, 2019 Filing 57 JOINT STIPULATION Regarding Responsive Pleading filed by Apple Inc. (Corbett, Christine) (Filed on 4/11/2019)
April 5, 2019 Filing 56 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 7/3/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/10/2019 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 9, 19th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Standing Order for All Judges of the Northern District) (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2019)
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Jon S. Tigar for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins no longer assigned to case, Reassignment Order signed by Judge Clerk on 4/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2019)
April 4, 2019 Filing 54 NOTICE of Pendency of Other Action Involving Same Patent by UNILOC Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Foster, James) (Filed on 4/4/2019)
April 3, 2019 Filing 52 Case Transferred in from United States District Court for the Western District of Texas (Austin); Case Number 1:18-cv-00163-LY. Original File Certified Copy of Transfer Order and Docket Sheet Received.
April 2, 2019 Filing 53 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 6/26/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/3/2019 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2019)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER GRANTING #35 Motion to Change Venue and this cause is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California; DISMISSING WITHOUT PREJUDICE #28 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (afd)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER GRANTING #49 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (afd)
March 6, 2019 Filing 49 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Andrew Stein by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Guaragna, John)
March 1, 2019 Filing 48 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Apple Inc., re #35 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Defendant Apple Inc. (Attachments: #1 Guaragna Decl., #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8)(Guaragna, John)
February 15, 2019 Filing 47 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Uniloc Luxembourg, S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc., re #35 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Defendant Apple Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kevin Gannon, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Exhibit R, #20 Exhibit S, #21 Exhibit T, #22 Exhibit U, #23 Exhibit V, #24 Exhibit W, #25 Exhibit X, #26 Exhibit Y, #27 Exhibit Z, #28 Exhibit AA, #29 Exhibit BB, #30 Exhibit CC, #31 Exhibit DD, #32 Exhibit EE, #33 Exhibit FF, #34 Exhibit GG, #35 Exhibit HH, #36 Exhibit II, #37 Exhibit JJ, #38 Exhibit KK, #39 Declaration of James J. Foster, #40 Proposed Order)(Gannon, Kevin)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER Granting Joint Stipulation Setting Deadlines. ORDER continuing Initial Pretrial Conference until further notice. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dm)
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING THE DISCLOSURE AND USE OF DISCOVERY MATERIALS. Signed by Judge Mark Lane. (td)
September 13, 2018 Motions No Longer Referred: #38 Opposed MOTION FOR AN INTERIM PROTECTIVE ORDER (td)
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER DENYING #38 Opposed Motion for an Interim Protective Order. Signed by Judge Mark Lane. (td)
September 11, 2018 Filing 43 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mark Lane: Motion Hearing held on 9/11/2018 re #38 Opposed MOTION FOR AN INTERIM PROTECTIVE ORDER filed by Uniloc Luxembourg, S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter ero.)(td)
September 10, 2018 Filing 42 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Shawn A. Latchford on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg, S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. Attorney Shawn A. Latchford added to party Uniloc Luxembourg, S.A.(pty:pla), Attorney Shawn A. Latchford added to party Uniloc USA, Inc.(pty:pla) (Latchford, Shawn)
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER REFERRING all pending and future nondispositive motions in this case related to the scope of venue discovery to United States Magistrate Judge Mark Lane. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dl)
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER Setting Hearing on #38 Opposed MOTION FOR AN INTERIM PROTECTIVE ORDER : Motion Hearing set for 9/11/2018 at 09:30 AM before Judge Mark Lane. Signed by Judge Mark Lane. (dl)
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER REFERRING MOTION: #38 Opposed MOTION FOR AN INTERIM PROTECTIVE ORDER filed by Uniloc Luxembourg, S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel.. Referral Magistrate Judge: Mark Lane. (dl)
August 16, 2018 Filing 38 Opposed MOTION FOR AN INTERIM PROTECTIVE ORDER by Uniloc Luxembourg, S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Foster, James)
June 26, 2018 Filing 37 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Uniloc Luxembourg, S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc., re #35 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Defendant Apple Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kevin Gannon, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Exhibit R, #20 Exhibit S, #21 Declaration of James J. Foster, #22 Exhibit 1, #23 Proposed Order)(Gannon, Kevin)
June 19, 2018 Filing 36 Transcript filed of Proceedings held on June 12, 2018, Proceedings Transcribed: Initial Pretrial Conference. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Arlinda Rodriguez, Telephone number: 512-391-8791. Parties are notified of their duty to review the transcript to ensure compliance with the FRCP 5.2(a)/FRCrP 49.1(a). A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a Notice of Redaction Request must be filed within 21 days. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed Redaction Request due 7/10/2018, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/20/2018, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/17/2018, (Rodriguez, Arlinda)
June 12, 2018 Filing 35 MOTION to Transfer Venue by Apple Inc. (lt) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/13/2018: #1 Declaration of Michael Jaynes, #2 Declaration of John Guaragna, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Proposed Order) (lt).
June 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER GRANTING Apple Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Motion toTransfer Venue. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the stay is LIFTED for the limited purpose of proceeding with Apple's Motion to Transfer Venue. Uniloc may file a response to Apple's Motion to Transfer Venue on or before June 26th, 2018. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dl)
June 12, 2018 Filing 33 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lee Yeakel: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 6/12/2018. Minute entry documents are not available electronically. (Court Reporter Arlinda Rodriguez) (dl)
May 30, 2018 Filing 32 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Apple Inc. amending, filed by Uniloc USA, Inc., Uniloc Luxembourg, S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Gannon, Kevin)
May 23, 2018 Filing 31 NOTICE by Uniloc Luxembourg, S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. re #28 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Foster, James)
May 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER setting Initial Pretrial Conference for 6/12/2018 02:00 PM before Judge Lee Yeakel and ORDER STAYING CASE. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (klw)
May 9, 2018 Filing 29 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Apple Inc.. (Erickson, Brian)
May 9, 2018 Filing 28 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Erickson, Brian)
April 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER GRANTING #26 Motion to Set Deadline to Answer or Otherwise Respond. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (td)
April 18, 2018 Filing 26 Unopposed MOTION to Set Deadline to Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint, by Apple Inc.. (Guaragna, John)
March 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER GRANTING #18 Motion for Mark Fowler to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Apple. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (klw)
March 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER GRANTING #19 Motion for Andrew Stein to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Apple. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (klw)
March 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER GRANTING #16 Motion for Larissa Park to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Apple. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (klw)
March 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER GRANTING #14 Motion for Christine Corbett to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Apple. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (klw)
March 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING #17 Motion for Summer Torrez to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Apple. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (klw)
March 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING #15 Motion for Jonathan Hicks to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Apple. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (klw)
March 19, 2018 Filing 19 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John Michael Guaragna for Andrew N. Stein ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-10585934) by on behalf of Apple Inc.. (Guaragna, John)
March 19, 2018 Filing 18 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John Michael Guaragna for Mark D. Fowler ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-10583870) by on behalf of Apple Inc.. (Guaragna, John)
March 15, 2018 Filing 17 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John Michael Guaragna for Summer Torrez ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-10575526) by on behalf of Apple Inc.. (Guaragna, John)
March 15, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John Michael Guaragna for Larissa Park ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-10575486) by on behalf of Apple Inc.. (Guaragna, John)
March 15, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John Michael Guaragna for Jonathan Hicks ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-10575341) by on behalf of Apple Inc.. (Guaragna, John)
March 15, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John Michael Guaragna for Christine K. Corbett ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-10575249) by on behalf of Apple Inc.. (Guaragna, John)
March 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, ; Apple Inc. answer due 4/23/2018. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dl)
March 13, 2018 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, or Otherwise Respond by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Guaragna, John)
March 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Case transferred to Judge Lee Yeakel for all proceedings. Judge Robert Pitman no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (klw)
March 5, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Uniloc USA, Inc., Uniloc Luxembourg, S.A.. Apple Inc. served on 3/1/2018, answer due 3/22/2018. (Nelson, Edward)
February 22, 2018 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Apple Inc.. (cj)
February 22, 2018 Filing 8 Report on Patent/Trademark sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office along with copy of Complaint. (cj)
February 22, 2018 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Uniloc Luxembourg, S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (cj)
February 22, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cj)
February 22, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Anthony M. Vecchione on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg, S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Vecchione, Anthony)
February 22, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kevin Gannon on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg, S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Gannon, Kevin)
February 22, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Aaron S. Jacobs on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg, S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Jacobs, Aaron)
February 22, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James J. Foster on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg, S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Foster, James)
February 22, 2018 Filing 3 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Uniloc Luxembourg, S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Nelson, Edward)
February 22, 2018 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Nelson, Edward)
February 22, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-10489476), filed by Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Nelson, Edward) (Attachment 2 replaced and flattened on 2/22/2018) (cj). (Attachment 2 replaced on 3/8/2018) (klw).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Uniloc USA, Inc. et al v. Apple Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc
Represented By: Larissa Bifano
Represented By: Christine K Corbett
Represented By: Mark D Fowler
Represented By: Jonathan H Hicks
Represented By: Andrew N. Stein
Represented By: Summer Torrez
Represented By: Brian K. Erickson
Represented By: John Michael Guaragna
Represented By: Jeffrey Reuben Cole
Represented By: Christine Kerba Corbett
Represented By: Larissa Susan Bifano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNILOC Luxembourg S.A.
Represented By: James J. Foster
Represented By: Shawn A Latchford
Represented By: Kevin Gannon
Represented By: Edward Nelson, III
Represented By: Anthony M Vecchione
Represented By: Aaron S. Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Uniloc USA, Inc.
Represented By: James J. Foster
Represented By: Shawn A Latchford
Represented By: Kevin Gannon
Represented By: Edward Nelson, III
Represented By: Anthony M Vecchione
Represented By: Aaron S. Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?