Covarrubias v. Ford Motor Company et al
Plaintiff: Alexis Covarrubias
Defendant: Citrus Motors Ontario, Inc. and Ford Motor Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv01832
Filed: April 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edward M Chen
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2022 Filing 82 NOTICE by Alexis Covarrubias of Disassociation of Counsel for Plaintiff (Dolin, Tionna) (Filed on 7/26/2022)
January 29, 2022 Filing 81 NOTICE of Change of Address by Tionna Grace Dolin (Dolin, Tionna) (Filed on 1/29/2022)
December 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER GRANTING #79 Dismissal With Prejudice by Judge Edward M. Chen (vla, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2021)
December 27, 2021 Filing 79 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Dismissal with Prejudice filed by Alexis Covarrubias. (Clark, Jason) (Filed on 12/27/2021)
December 18, 2021 Filing 78 NOTICE by Alexis Covarrubias of Disassociation of Counsel (Dolin, Tionna) (Filed on 12/18/2021)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting in Part and Denying in Part #63 Plaintiff's Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2021)
July 26, 2021 Filing 76 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory Sogoyan (Sogoyan, Gregory) (Filed on 7/26/2021)
July 26, 2021 Filing 75 CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING HEARING RE: #63 MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES AND STATUS CONFERENCE. Hearing set 7/29/2021 is vacated. Pursuant to Local Rule 7-1(b), Court will rule on papers. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2021)
July 23, 2021 Filing 74 CLERKS NOTICE CONVERTING MOTION AND STATUS CONFERENCE TO ZOOM HEARING. Status Conference and Motion Hearing re: #63 Motion for Attorney Fees set for 7/29/2021 01:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Judge Edward M. Chen. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/emc General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/., Set/Reset Deadlines as to #63 MOTION for Attorney Fees , C osts, And Expenses. Status Conference set for 7/29/2021 01:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Judge Edward M. Chen. Motion Hearing set for 7/29/2021 01:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Judge Edward M. Chen. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2021)
July 14, 2021 Filing 73 OBJECTIONS to #70 Declaration in Opposition to Motion for Attorney's Fees, Costs and Expenses by Alexis Covarrubias. (Law, Daniel) (Filed on 7/14/2021)
July 14, 2021 Filing 72 Declaration of Jason Clark in Support of #71 Reply to Opposition/Response filed byAlexis Covarrubias. (Related document(s) #71 ) (Law, Daniel) (Filed on 7/14/2021)
July 14, 2021 Filing 71 REPLY in Support (re #63 MOTION for Attorney Fees , Costs, And Expenses) filed by Alexis Covarrubias. (Law, Daniel) (Filed on 7/14/2021)
July 7, 2021 Filing 70 DECLARATION of Charles F. Harlow in Opposition to #69 Opposition/Response to Motion filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to C. Harlow Declaration)(Related document(s) #69 ) (Harlow, Charles) (Filed on 7/7/2021)
July 7, 2021 Filing 69 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #63 MOTION for Attorney Fees , Costs, And Expenses ) filed byFord Motor Company. (Harlow, Charles) (Filed on 7/7/2021)
June 25, 2021 Filing 68 CLERK'S NOTICE RESCHEDULING STATUS CONFERENCE FROM 7/1/1021 TO 7/29/2021 AT 1:30PM: Status Conference set for 7/1/2021 is vacated and rescheduled for 7/29/2021 01:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Judge Edward M. Chen. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov /emcGeneral Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Status Conference set for 7/29/2021 01:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Judge Edward M. Chen. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2021)
June 24, 2021 Filing 67 STATUS REPORT by Ford Motor Company. (Harlow, Charles) (Filed on 6/24/2021)
June 24, 2021 Filing 66 CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND TRIAL DATES. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2021)
June 23, 2021 Filing 65 STATUS REPORT by Alexis Covarrubias. (Law, Daniel) (Filed on 6/23/2021)
June 23, 2021 Filing 64 Request for Judicial Notice re #63 MOTION for Attorney Fees , Costs, And Expenses filed by Alexis Covarrubias. (Related document(s) #63 ) (Law, Daniel) (Filed on 6/23/2021) Modified on 6/24/2021 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
June 23, 2021 Filing 63 MOTION for Attorney Fees , Costs, And Expenses; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Alexis Covarrubias. Motion Hearing set for 7/29/2021 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 7/7/2021. Replies due by 7/14/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Jason Clark, #3 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Jason Clark, #4 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Jason Clark, #5 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Jason Clark, #6 Exhibit 4 to Declaration of Jason Clark, #7 Declaration of Payam Shahian, #8 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Payam Shahian, #9 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Payam Shahian, #10 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Payam Shahian, #11 Exhibit 4 to Declaration of Payam Shahian, #12 Exhibit 5 to Declaration of Payam Shahian, #13 Exhibit 6 to Declaration of Payam Shahian, #14 Exhibit 7 to Declaration of Payam Shahian, #15 Exhibit 8 to Declaration of Payam Shahian, #16 Exhibit 9 to Declaration of Payam Shahian, #17 Exhibit 10 to Declaration of Payam Shahian, #18 Exhibit 11 to Declaration of Payam Shahian, #19 Exhibit 12 to Declaration of Payam Shahian, #20 Exhibit 13 to Declaration of Payam Shahian, #21 Exhibit 14 to Declaration of Payam Shahian, #22 Exhibit 15 to Declaration of Payam Shahian, #23 Exhibit 16 to Declaration of Payam Shahian, #24 Exhibit 17 to Declaration of Payam Shahian, #25 Exhibit 18 to Declaration of Payam Shahian, #26 Exhibit 19 to Declaration of Payam Shahian, #27 Exhibit 20 to Declaration of Payam Shahian, #28 Exhibit 21 to Declaration of Payam Shahian, #29 Exhibit 22 to Declaration of Payam Shahian)(Law, Daniel) (Filed on 6/23/2021)
June 23, 2021 Filing 62 NOTICE by Alexis Covarrubias of Motion for Attorney Fees, Costs and Expenses (Law, Daniel) (Filed on 6/23/2021)
May 12, 2021 Filing 61 CLERK'S NOTICE RESCHEDULING STATUS CONFERENCE FROM 5/20/2021 TO 7/1/2021 AT 10:30AM: Status Conference set for 5/20/2021 is vacated and rescheduled for 7/1/2021 10:30 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Judge Edward M. Chen. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Joint Status Report due by 6/24/2021. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/emcGeneral Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Joint Status Report d ue by 6/24/2021. Status Conference set for 7/1/2021 10:30 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Judge Edward M. Chen. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2021)
April 1, 2021 Filing 60 CLERK'S NOTICE RESCHEDULING STATUS CONFERENCE FROM 4/8/2021 TO 5/20/2021 AT 10:30AM: Status Conference set for 4/8/2021 is vacated and rescheduled for 5/20/2021 10:30 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Judge Edward M. Chen. Joint Status Report due by 5/13/2021. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2021)
April 1, 2021 Filing 59 Joint STATUS REPORT by Ford Motor Company. (Harlow, Charles) (Filed on 4/1/2021) Modified on 4/2/2021 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
February 25, 2021 Filing 58 CLERK'S NOTICE RESCHEDULING STATUS CONFERENCE FROM 3/4/2021 TO 4/8/2021: Joint Status Report due by 4/1/2021. Status Conference set for 3/4/2021 is vacated and rescheduled for 4/8/2021 10:30 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Judge Edward M. Chen. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2021)
February 25, 2021 Filing 57 STATUS REPORT by Alexis Covarrubias. (Nguyen, Anh) (Filed on 2/25/2021)
January 11, 2021 Filing 56 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel A. Law (Law, Daniel) (Filed on 1/11/2021)
January 8, 2021 Filing 55 CLERK'S NOTICE RESCHEDULING STATUS CONFERENCE FROM 1/14/2021 TO 3/4/2021: Joint Status Report due by 2/25/2021. Status Conference set for 1/14/2021 is vacated and rescheduled as control date for 3/4/2021 10:30 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Judge Edward M. Chen. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2021)
January 7, 2021 Filing 54 STATUS REPORT - JOINT by Ford Motor Company. (Harlow, Charles) (Filed on 1/7/2021)
November 25, 2020 Filing 53 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING STATUS CONFERENCE SET 12/4/2020 TO 1/14/2021: Status Conference set as control date for 1/14/2021 10:30 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Judge Edward M. Chen. Joint Status Report due by 1/7/2021. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2020)
November 25, 2020 Filing 52 Joint Status Report filed by Ford Motor Company. (Harlow, Charles) (Filed on 11/25/2020)
November 22, 2020 Filing 51 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING STATUS CONFERENCE FROM 12/3/2020 TO 12/4/2020: Due to unavailability of the Court, Status Conference set for 12/3/2020 is vacated and rescheduled for 12/4/2020 10:30 AM by Videoconference Only before Judge Edward M. Chen. Joint Status Report remains due 11/25/2020. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/emcGeneral Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Stat us Conference set for 12/4/2020 10:30 AM by Videoconference Only before Judge Edward M. Chen. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2020)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 50 AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE PRETRIAL ORDER FOR JURY TRIAL: Motions due by 3/11/2021. Motion Hearing set for 4/15/2021 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. Close of Fact Discovery due by 1/21/2021. Close of Expert Discovery due by 3/4/2021. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/29/2021 02:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor. Jury Selection/Jury Trial set for 7/26/2021 08:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. Further Jury Trial set for 7/27/2021, 7/28/2021, 7/30/2021, 8/2/2021 08:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/14/2020. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2020)
August 13, 2020 Filing 49 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Edward M. Chen: Status Conference held on 8/13/2020. Joint Status Report due by 11/25/2020. Further Status Conference set for 12/3/2020 10:30 AM in San Francisco before Judge Edward M. Chen. Jury Selection/Jury Trial set for 7/26/2021 08:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. Scheduling Order to issue. See pdf for further details.Total Time in Court: 11 Minutes. Court Reporter: Ruth Ekhaus. Plaintiff Attorney: Anh Nguyen. Defendant Attorney: Charles Harlow. Attachment: Minute Order. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/13/2020)
August 11, 2020 Filing 48 CLERKS NOTICE CONVERTING STATUS CONFERENCE TO ZOOM HEARING. Status Conference set for 8/13/2020 10:30 AM in San Francisco before Judge Edward M. Chen. For Zoom connection, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/This proceeding will be a Zoom video conferencing webinar. PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III.Case participants will enter proceeding as attendees, thereafter promoted to panelists and are to arrive at least 5 minutes prior to start time of hearing.All counsel, members of the public and press please click the link or use the information below to join the webinar: https://cand-uscourts.zoomgov.com/j/1619911861?pwd=TjVma1lnMlJlNHR3ZE9QMkFjNkFndz09Meeting ID: 161 991 1861Password: 912881Dial by your location+1 929 205 6099 US (New York)+1 253 215 8782 US+1 301 715 8592 US+1 312 626 6799 US (Chicago)+1 346 248 7799 US (Houston)+1 669 900 6833 US (San Jose)Find your local number: https://zoom.us/u/ac4JkPfcjoFor important information and guidance on technical preparation, please see #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Status Conference set for 8/13/202 0 10:30 AM in San Francisco before Judge Edward M. Chen. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2020)
August 10, 2020 Filing 47 JOINT STATUS REPORT of the Parties by Ford Motor Company. (Harlow, Charles) (Filed on 8/10/2020) Modified on 8/11/2020 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
August 10, 2020 Filing 46 CLERK'S NOTICE: Joint Status Report was due to be filed in this case by 8/6/2020. That report is now overdue. The parties are to file joint statement today no later than 12:00 PM noon. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2020)
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 45 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #44 Joint Stipulation to (1) Continue Trial Date or, in the Alternative, (2) Vacate Trial Date and Set Scheduling Conference. Trial date of 9/28/2020 VACATED. Status Conference re: Rescheduling Trial set for 8/13/2020 at 10:30 AM before Judge Edward M. Chen.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2020)
April 14, 2020 Filing 44 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #43 Case Management Scheduling Order JOINT STIPULATION TO (1) CONTINUE TRIAL DATE OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, (2) VACATE TRIAL DATE AND SET SCHEDULING CONFERENCE filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Counsel, #2 Proposed Order)(Harlow, Charles) (Filed on 4/14/2020)
March 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 43 AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER FOR JURY TRIAL. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/6/2020. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2020)
March 6, 2020 Filing 42 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Edward M. Chen: Telephonic Status Conference held on 3/6/2020. Amended Scheduling Order to issue. See pdf image for further details. Total Time in Court: 7 Minutes. Court Reporter: Not Reported. Plaintiff Attorney: Jacob Cutler (Court Call). Defendant Attorney: Charles Harlow (Court Call). Attachment: Minute Order. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/6/2020)
March 4, 2020 Filing 41 CLERK'S NOTICE: Status Conference on calendar for Friday, March 6, 2020, at 10:30 a.m. is converted to Telephonic Status Conference. All parties to participate via Court Call. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2020)
March 4, 2020 Filing 40 MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by Alexis Covarrubias. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Nguyen, Anh) (Filed on 3/4/2020)
March 2, 2020 Filing 39 JOINT STATUS REPORT Re Mediation by Ford Motor Company. (Harlow, Charles) (Filed on 3/2/2020) Modified on 3/3/2020 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
March 2, 2020 Filing 38 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to 37 , parties were ordered to file a joint status report by 2/28/2020. Joint report is now past due. Parties are to file the joint statement immediately. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2020)
February 3, 2020 Filing 37 CLERK'S NOTICE: Due to unavailability of the Court, Status Conference set for 3/5/2020 is vacated and rescheduled for 3/6/2020 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. Joint Status Report due by 2/28/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2020)
November 14, 2019 Filing 36 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Edward M. Chen: Status Conference held on 11/14/2019. Joint Status Report due by 2/27/2020. Status Conference set for 3/5/2020 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. See pdf image for further details.Total Time in Court: 23 Minutes. Court Reporter: Not Reported. Plaintiff Attorney: Anh Ngyuen (Court Call). Defendant Attorney: Charles Harlow. Attachment: Minute Order. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/14/2019)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #34 Motion to Appear by Telephone. Counsel shall make arrangements to appear through Court Call.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2019)
November 12, 2019 Filing 34 MOTION to Appear by Telephone at Status Conference Re: Mediation by Telephone filed by Alexis Covarrubias. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Nguyen, Anh) (Filed on 11/12/2019)
November 7, 2019 Filing 33 STATUS REPORT -JOINT by Ford Motor Company. (Harlow, Charles) (Filed on 11/7/2019)
October 30, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob William Cutler (Cutler, Jacob) (Filed on 10/30/2019)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #30 Stipulation to Continue Status Conference. Joint Status Report due by 11/7/2019. Status Conference set for 10/8/2019 is vacated and rescheduled for 11/14/2019 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2019)
October 1, 2019 Filing 30 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #29 Status Report filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Charles F. Harlow in Support of Joint Stipulation to Continue Status Conference, #2 Proposed Order)(Harlow, Charles) (Filed on 10/1/2019)
October 1, 2019 Filing 29 STATUS REPORT -JOINT by Ford Motor Company. (Harlow, Charles) (Filed on 10/1/2019)
September 13, 2019 Filing 28 CLERK'S NOTICE: Due to unavailability of the Court, Status Conference set for 10/10/2019 is vacated and ADVANCED to 10/8/2019 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. Joint Status Report due by 10/1/2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2019)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER FOR JURY TRIAL: Motion Hearing set for 6/18/2020 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. Discovery due by 3/26/2020. Motions due by 5/14/2020. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/1/2020 02:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor. Jury Trial/Jury Selection set for 9/28/2020 08:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. Further Jury Trial set for 9/29/2020, 9/30/2020, 10/2/2020, 10/5/2020 08:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/16/2019. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2019)
July 16, 2019 Filing 26 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Edward M. Chen: Initial Case Management Conference held on 7/16/2019. Joint Status Report due by 10/3/2019. Status Conference set for 10/10/2019 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. Jury Trial/Jury Selection set for 9/28/2020 at 8:30 a.m. Scheduling Order to issue. Total Time in Court: 13 Minutes. Court Reporter: Not Reported. Plaintiff Attorney: Anh Ngyuen. Defendant Attorney: Charles Harlow. Attachment: Minute Order. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/16/2019)
July 9, 2019 Filing 25 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Ford Motor Company. (Harlow, Charles) (Filed on 7/9/2019)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Denying #13 Plaintiff's Motion to Remand. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2019)
June 27, 2019 Filing 23 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Edward M. Chen: Motion Hearing held on 6/27/2019; taking under submission #13 Motion to Remand. Total Time in Court: 28 Minutes. Court Reporter: Katherine Sullivan. Plaintiff Attorney: Anh Nguyen. Defendant Attorney: Stephen Dye. Attachment: Minute Order. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/27/2019)
June 25, 2019 Filing 22 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Harlow, Charles) (Filed on 6/25/2019)
June 25, 2019 Filing 21 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Nguyen, Anh) (Filed on 6/25/2019)
June 19, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION to Appear by Telephone at Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion to Remand filed by Alexis Covarrubias. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Nguyen, Anh) (Filed on 6/19/2019)
June 7, 2019 Filing 19 CLERK'S NOTICE ADVANCING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Due to Court unavailability, Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/18/2019 is ADVANCED to 7/16/2019 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor. Joint Case Management Statement due by 7/9/2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2019)
June 7, 2019 Filing 18 CLERK'S NOTICE: Due to unavailability, Motion Hearing re #13 MOTION to Remand Case to Santa Clara Superior Court set for 6/13/2019 is VACATED and RESCHEDULED for 6/27/2019 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. Briefing remains unchanged. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2019)
June 6, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Appear by Telephone on Plaintiff's Motion to Remand filed by Alexis Covarrubias. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Nguyen, Anh) (Filed on 6/6/2019)
May 30, 2019 Filing 16 REPLY in Support (re #13 MOTION to Remand Case to Santa Clara Superior Court) filed by Alexis Covarrubias. (Nguyen, Anh) (Filed on 5/30/2019)
May 24, 2019 Filing 15 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #13 MOTION to Remand Case to Santa Clara Superior Court ) filed byFord Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Counsel, #2 Exhibits 1-3 to Declaration of Counsel)(Harlow, Charles) (Filed on 5/24/2019)
May 23, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE by Citrus Motors Ontario, Inc., Ford Motor Company to Withdraw an Attorney from Record (Harlow, Charles) (Filed on 5/23/2019)
May 10, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Remand Case to Santa Clara Superior Court filed by Alexis Covarrubias. Motion Hearing set for 6/13/2019 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 5/24/2019. Replies due by 5/31/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Anh Nguyen, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Proposed Order)(Nguyen, Anh) (Filed on 5/10/2019)
May 9, 2019 #Electronic filing error Re: #12 MOTION to Remand case to Santa Clara Superior Court filed by Alexis Covarrubias. Incorrect PDF attached. [err201]/document filed in wrong case. [err401] This filing will not be processed. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2019)
May 6, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Remand case to Santa Clara Superior Court filed by Alexis Covarrubias. Motion Hearing set for 6/13/2019 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 5/20/2019. Replies due by 5/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Anh Nguyen, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Proposed Order)(Nguyen, Anh) (Filed on 5/6/2019)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER IN REASSIGNED CASE: Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/18/2019 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor. Joint Case Management Statement due by 7/11/2019. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/17/2019. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2019)
April 16, 2019 Filing 10 Case REASSIGNED to Judge Edward M. Chen. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Susan Van Keulen no longer assigned to case. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording) (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2019)
April 16, 2019 Filing 9 This case will be randomly reassigned to a District Judge outside the San Jose Division pursuant to the Caseload Rebalancing Pilot Program approved by the Court effective March 1, 2018. For information, visit our web page at #http://cand.uscourts.gov/news/225. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2019)
April 16, 2019 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned.

April 15, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Anh X Nguyen for Plaintiff, Alexis Covarrubias (Nguyen, Anh) (Filed on 4/15/2019)
April 8, 2019 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Citrus Motors Ontario, Inc., Ford Motor Company.. (Subramanian, Vikram) (Filed on 4/8/2019)
April 8, 2019 Filing 5 Certificate of Interested Entities by Citrus Motors Ontario, Inc., Ford Motor Company identifying Other Affiliate Black Rock, Inc, Other Affiliate The Vanguard Group, Other Affiliate State Street Corp., Other Affiliate Evercore Trust Co., N.A. for Ford Motor Company. re #2 Certificate of Interested Entities (Subramanian, Vikram) (Filed on 4/8/2019)
April 5, 2019 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/2/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/9/2019 09:30 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2019)
April 5, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/19/2019. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2019)
April 5, 2019 Filing 1 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) byCitrus Motors Ontario, Inc., Ford Motor Company. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2019)
April 5, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Filer did not add all interested parties when prompted. Re-file this document in its entirety and when prompted, enter all affiliates or corporate parents .Please re-file in its entirety. Re: #2 Certificate of Interested Entities filed by Citrus Motors Ontario, Inc., Ford Motor Company (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2019)
April 4, 2019 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Citrus Motors Ontario, Inc., Ford Motor Company (Subramanian, Vikram) (Filed on 4/4/2019)
April 4, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Santa Clara Superior Court. Their case number is 19CV343748. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-13234241). Filed byCitrus Motors Ontario, Inc., Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-B, #2 Declaration of Counsel, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Subramanian, Vikram) (Filed on 4/4/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Covarrubias v. Ford Motor Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexis Covarrubias
Represented By: Anh X Nguyen
Represented By: Tionna Grace Dolin
Represented By: Daniel A. Law
Represented By: Gregory Sogoyan
Represented By: Jacob William Cutler
Represented By: Jason Patrick Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citrus Motors Ontario, Inc.
Represented By: Vikram Subramanian
Represented By: Charles Frederick Harlow, Jr.
Represented By: Stephen H. Dye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Vikram Subramanian
Represented By: Charles Frederick Harlow, Jr.
Represented By: Stephen H. Dye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?