Hilton v. Pagani Worldwide LLC et al
Plaintiff: James Hilton, Jr. and James Sheldon Hilton, Jr.
Defendant: Pagani Worldwide LLC and Francesco Zappacosta
Case Number: 3:2019cv01848
Filed: April 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Alex Geller AS COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT PAGANI WORLDWIDE LLC (Geller, Jason) (Filed on 7/12/2019)
July 12, 2019 Filing 32 MOTION for Entry of Default filed by James Sheldon Hilton, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Service)(Hilton, James) (Filed on 7/12/2019)
July 5, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101] In the future, choose a MOTION event for filing Motions. Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #31 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by James Sheldon Hilton, Jr. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2019)
July 3, 2019 Filing 31 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by James Sheldon Hilton, Jr. (Hilton, James) (Filed on 7/3/2019) Modified on 7/5/2019 (fabS, COURT STAFF).
July 1, 2019 Filing 30 MOTION for Sanctions filed by James Sheldon Hilton, Jr. Responses due by 7/15/2019. Replies due by 7/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Declaration Declaration)(Hilton, James) (Filed on 7/1/2019)
June 25, 2019 Filing 29 CLERK'S NOTICE RESCHEDULING THE INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TO A DATE AFTER THE HEARING ON THE MOTION TO DISMISS. The administrative motion to continue the case management conference is deemed moot. Case Management Statement due by 7/31/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/7/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2019)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Order by Judge Vince Chhabria denying #24 Motion for Sanctions.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2019)
June 21, 2019 Filing 27 REPLY (re #17 MOTION to Dismiss PURSUANT TO FRCP 12(b)(6) ) filed byPagani Worldwide LLC. (Adams, Vincent) (Filed on 6/21/2019)
June 20, 2019 Filing 26 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by James Sheldon Hilton, Jr Certificate of Service Franceso Zappacosta (Hilton, James) (Filed on 6/20/2019)
June 19, 2019 Filing 25 ADR Clerks Notice re: Non-Compliance with Court Order. The parties have failed to file an ADR Certification as required by the Initial Case Management Scheduling Order. Parties and counsel shall comply promptly with the requirements of ADR L.R. 3-5(b) and shall file the ADR Certification. (cmfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2019)
June 19, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION for Sanctions Contempt of Court filed by James Sheldon Hilton, Jr. Responses due by 7/3/2019. Replies due by 7/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Declaration Declaration)(Hilton, James) (Filed on 6/19/2019)
June 18, 2019 Filing 23 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION To Continue Initial Case Management Conference and ADR Deadlines filed by Pagani Worldwide LLC. Responses due by 6/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Vincent J. Adams, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Vincent J. Adams, #3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Vincent J. Adams, #4 Exhibit C to Declaration of Vincent J. Adams, #5 Proposed Order)(Adams, Vincent) (Filed on 6/18/2019)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Order by Judge Vince Chhabria denying #21 Motion for Hearing.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 5, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION for Hearing re #17 MOTION to Dismiss PURSUANT TO FRCP 12(b)(6) Hearing Challenge Motion to Dismiss filed by James Sheldon Hilton, Jr. (Hilton, James) (Filed on 6/5/2019)
June 1, 2019 Filing 20 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #17 MOTION to Dismiss PURSUANT TO FRCP 12(b)(6) ) Response Motion to Dismiss filed byJames Sheldon Hilton, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Supporting Affidavit)(Hilton, James) (Filed on 6/1/2019)
May 31, 2019 Filing 19 Certificate of Interested Entities by Pagani Worldwide LLC identifying Corporate Parent Pagani Automobili S.p.A., Other Affiliate Pagani Worldwide LLC, Other Affiliate Francesco Zappacosta for Pagani Worldwide LLC. (Adams, Vincent) (Filed on 5/31/2019)
May 31, 2019 Filing 18 Request for Judicial Notice re #17 MOTION to Dismiss PURSUANT TO FRCP 12(b)(6) filed byPagani Worldwide LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #17 ) (Adams, Vincent) (Filed on 5/31/2019)
May 31, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss PURSUANT TO FRCP 12(b)(6) filed by Pagani Worldwide LLC. Motion Hearing set for 7/18/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor before Judge Vince Chhabria. Responses due by 6/14/2019. Replies due by 6/21/2019. (Adams, Vincent) (Filed on 5/31/2019)
May 20, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE by James Sheldon Hilton, Jr Notice for Personal Service Office (Hilton, James) (Filed on 5/20/2019)
May 17, 2019 Filing 15 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Francesco Zappacosta. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2019)
May 17, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed Pagani Worldwide LLC served on 5/10/2019, answer due 5/31/2019. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2019)
May 15, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE by James Sheldon Hilton, Jr Notice of Correction (Attachments: #1 Errata Annotation USM 285)(Hilton, James) (Filed on 5/15/2019)
May 14, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE by James Sheldon Hilton, Jr Notice Of Electronic Filing (Hilton, James) (Filed on 5/14/2019)
May 9, 2019 *** Copy of #11 Order sent to PACER Service Center *** (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2019)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order by Judge Vince Chhabria granting #7 Motion for Permission for Electronic Case Filing and #9 Motion for a PACER Fee Waiver. The deputy clerk hereby certifies that on 5/7/2019 a copy of this order was served by sending it via first-class mail to the address of each non-CM/ECF user listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2019)
May 1, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to waive PACER fees filed by James Hilton, Jr. Responses due by 5/15/2019. Replies due by 5/22/2019. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2019)
April 30, 2019 Filing 10 Acknowledgment of Receipt received from the USMS re summons. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2019)
April 22, 2019 Filing 8 Received Document: USM 285 by James Hilton, Jr. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2019)
April 18, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Permission for Electronic Case Filing filed by James Hilton, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2019)
April 18, 2019 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by James Hilton, Jr.. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2019)
April 18, 2019 ***Delivered service packet to the U.S. Marshal Service Post Box in the Clerk's Office mailroom*** (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2019)
April 18, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Pagani Worldwide LLC, Francesco Zappacosta. (Attachments: #1 USM 285, #2 USM 285)(fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2019)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order by Judge Vince Chhabria granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The complaint having been found to comply with Title 28 USC 1915, IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk issue summons, and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the U.S. Marshal for the Northern District of California serve, without prepayment of fees, a copy of the complaint, any amendments, attachments, scheduling orders and other documents specified by the Clerk, plaintiff's affidavit and this order upon the defendant(s). The deputy clerk hereby certifies that on 4/15/2019 a copy of this order was served by sending it via first-class mail to the address of each non-CM/ECF user listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2019)
April 5, 2019 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. This case may fall within the Pilot Program for Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review G eneral Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 7/2/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/9/2019 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2019)
April 4, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by James Hilton, Jr. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2019)
April 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Pagani Worldwide LLC, Francesco Zappacosta. Filed byJames Hilton, Jr. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hilton v. Pagani Worldwide LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pagani Worldwide LLC
Represented By: Jason Alex Geller
Represented By: Vincent Joseph Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Francesco Zappacosta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Hilton, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Sheldon Hilton, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?