Huang v. Wells Fargo & Company
Plaintiff: Xiaohua Huang
Defendant: Wells Fargo & Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv01857
Filed: April 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:1126
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 9, 2019 Filing 15 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent (cc: form mailed to register). (Attachments: #1 order, #2 complaint)(fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2019)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting #13 Motion to Dismiss. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2019)
May 5, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss , MOTION to Withdraw filed by Xiaohua Huang. Responses due by 5/20/2019. Replies due by 5/28/2019. (Huang, Xiaohua) (Filed on 5/5/2019)
May 2, 2019 Filing 12 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Wells Fargo & Company.. (Bloch, David) (Filed on 5/2/2019)
April 22, 2019 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 5/6/2019. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2019)
April 20, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Xiaohua Huang (Huang, Xiaohua) (Filed on 4/20/2019)
April 20, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Xiaohua Huang. Filed byXiaohua Huang. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(Huang, Xiaohua) (Filed on 4/20/2019)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting #7 Motion for Permission for Electronic Case Filing. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2019)
April 16, 2019 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE AND ORDER:The attached notice and order notifies the plaintiff of resources available, attaches the district's handbook for litigants who do not have a lawyer, includes a flyer for contacting the court's help desk and instructs the plaintiff about serving the defendants. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service, #2 Self Help Flyer, #3 Pro Se Handbook) (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2019)
April 15, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Permission for Electronic Case Filing filed by Xiaohua Huang. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2019)
April 12, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Xiaohua Huang. Wells Fargo & Company served on 4/8/2019, answer due 4/29/2019. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2019)
April 9, 2019 Filing 4 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent (cc: form mailed to register). (Attachments: #1 complaint)(fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2019)
April 5, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Wells Fargo & Company. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2019)
April 5, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/4/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/11/2019 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2019)
April 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Wells Fargo & Company (Filing fee $ 400). DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL. Filed byXiaohua Huang. Consent/Declination due by 4/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 part 2, #2 part 3)(fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Huang v. Wells Fargo & Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Xiaohua Huang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo & Company
Represented By: David S. Bloch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?