Jaco Electronics Incorporated et al v. Nippon Chemi-Con Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Vermont Street Acquisition LLC and Jaco Electronics Incorporated
Defendant: Nichicon Corporation, Matsuo Electric Company Limited, United Chemi-Con Incorporated, Taitsu Corporation, Toshin Kogyo Company Limited, Hitachi AIC Incorporated, Nissei Electric Company Limited, Taitsu America Incorporated, Shinyei Technology Company Limited, Hitachi Chemical Company Limited, Hitachi Chemical Company America Limited, Nichicon (America) Corporation, Rubycon America Incorporated, Shinyei Capacitor Company Limited, ELNA Company Limited, ELNA America Incorporated, Soshin Electronics of America Incorporated, Shinyei Kaisha, Nippon Chemi-con Corporation, Soshin Electric Company Limited, Rubycon Corporation and Shinyei Corporation of America Incorporated
Case Number: 3:2019cv01902
Filed: April 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: James Donato
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 17, 2020 Filing 37 Transcript of Zoom Video Conference Proceedings held on 4-16-2020, before Judge James Donato. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra L. Pas, CRR, telephone number (415) 431-1477/Email: Debra_Pas@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (1278 in 3:17-md-02801-JD) Transcript Order, (1280 in 3:17-md-02801-JD) Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/16/2020. (Pas, Debra) (Filed on 4/17/2020)
April 17, 2020 Filing 36 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James Donato: Status Conference held on 4/16/2020. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/17/2020)
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER. The status conference set for April 16, 2020, at 11 a.m., will be held by Zoom Webinar. Each party group should designate a lead counsel to speak at the hearing by emailing the name and email address of their lead counsel to Judge Donato's Courtroom Deputy, Ms. Lisa Clark, at # jdcrd@cand.uscourts.gov by April 15, 2020, at 4:00 p.m., California time. The email addresses for counsel are needed for the appropriate Z oom link, which Ms. Clark will circulate by email prior to the conference. All lead counsel must call in fifteen minutes before the hearing to test internet, video, and audio capabilities. Other attorneys on the case who will not be speaking, and members of the press and public, may view the webinar as attendees at the following link: #https://zoom.us/j/98659502400?pwd=L1gvYlg5c0p5UmxkWkJLNVF2VGJzZ z09 Webinar ID: 986 5950 2400 Password: 858633 Or iPhone one-tap : US: +12532158782,,98659502400# or +13017158592,,98659502400# Or Telephone: Dial (for higher quality, dial a number based on your current location): US: +1 253 215 8782 or +1 301 715 8592 or +1 312 626 6799 or +1 346 248 7799 or +1 669 900 6833 or +1 929 205 6099International numbers available: #https://zoom.us/u/auEUH85xn < br
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER. The Court sets a telephonic status conference for April 16, 2020, at 11:00 a.m. for the following DAP cases: Case Nos. 17-7046, 17-7047, 18-2657, 19-1902, and 19-3296. The status conference will be held on the Court's conference call line. The dial-in number is 1-877-402-9753, and the access code is 5266369. The parties are requested to dial in from a landline if at all possible, and to mute themselves whenever they are not speaking. Signed by Judge James Donato on 4/1/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2020)
March 30, 2020 Filing 33 Letter from Certain DAPs Requesting Telephonic Status Conference . (Turken, Robert) (Filed on 3/30/2020)
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER RE FIFTH AMENDMENT ASSERTIONS. Signed by Judge James Donato on 1/15/2020. (jdlc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2020)
January 13, 2020 Filing 31 REPLY (re #29 For An Order (I) Allowing Noriaki Kakizaki To Testify Substantively At Trial And (Ii) Precluding Plaintiffs From Offering Evidence Of Mr. Kakizakis Prior Invocation Of His Fifth Amendment Rights At An Earlier Deposition) filed by Nippon Chemi-con Corporation, United Chemi-Con Incorporated. (Kaufhold, Steven) (Filed on 1/13/2020) Modified on 1/14/2020 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
January 6, 2020 Filing 30 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #29 MOTION For An Order (I) Allowing Noriaki Kakizaki To Testify Substantively At Trial And (Ii) Precluding Plaintiffs From Offering Evidence Of Mr. Kakizakis Prior Invocation Of His Fifth Amendment Rights At An Earlier Deposition) on Behalf of DAPs filed by Jaco Electronics Incorporated, Vermont Street Acquisition LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support of Opposition, #2 Exhibit A)(Turken, Robert) (Filed on 1/6/2020) Modified on 1/14/2020 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
December 23, 2019 Filing 29 MOTION For An Order (I) Allowing Noriaki Kakizaki To Testify Substantively At Trial And (Ii) Precluding Plaintiffs From Offering Evidence Of Mr. Kakizakis Prior Invocation Of His Fifth Amendment Rights At An Earlier Deposition filed by Nippon Chemi-con Corporation, United Chemi-Con Incorporated. Motion Hearing set for 1/30/2020 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 1/6/2020. Replies due by 1/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Berse, #3 Exhibit 1 to Berse Decl., #4 Exhibit 2 to Berse Decl., #5 Exhibit 3 to Berse Decl., #6 Exhibit 4 to Berse Decl., #7 Exhibit 5 to Berse Decl., #8 Exhibit 6 to Berse Decl., #9 Exhibit 7 to Berse Decl., #10 Exhibit 8 to Berse Decl., #11 Exhibit 9 to Berse Decl., #12 Exhibit 10 to Berse Decl., #13 Exhibit 11 to Berse Decl., #14 Exhibit 12 to Berse Decl.)(Kaufhold, Steven) (Filed on 12/23/2019) Modified on 12/26/2019 (amgS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 1/14/2020 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting Stipulation re Revised Jaco-Specific Schedule. MDL Dkt. No. 728. Signed by Judge James Donato on 7/15/2019. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2019)
July 9, 2019 Filing 27 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Revised Jaco-Specific Schedule filed by Jaco Electronics Incorporated, Vermont Street Acquisition LLC. (Wagner, Scott) (Filed on 7/9/2019)
June 28, 2019 Filing 26 ANSWER to Complaint byELNA America Incorporated, ELNA Company Limited. (Nyong'o, Heather) (Filed on 6/28/2019)
June 28, 2019 Filing 25 ANSWER to Complaint DEFENDANTS HITACHI CHEMICAL CO., LTD., HITACHI AIC INC., AND HITACHI CHEMICAL CO. AMERICA, LTD.'S ANSWER TO JACO ELECTRONICS, INC. AND VERMONT STREET ACQUISITION, LLC'S COMPLAINT byHitachi AIC Incorporated, Hitachi Chemical Company America Limited, Hitachi Chemical Company Limited. (Pak, Chul) (Filed on 6/28/2019)
June 28, 2019 Filing 24 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byShinyei Capacitor Company Limited, Shinyei Corporation of America Incorporated, Shinyei Kaisha, Shinyei Technology Company Limited. (Maddox, Claire) (Filed on 6/28/2019)
June 28, 2019 Filing 23 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byNippon Chemi-con Corporation. (Kaufhold, Steven) (Filed on 6/28/2019)
June 28, 2019 Filing 22 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byUnited Chemi-Con Incorporated. (Kaufhold, Steven) (Filed on 6/28/2019)
June 28, 2019 Filing 21 Certificate of Interested Entities by Nippon Chemi-con Corporation (Kaufhold, Steven) (Filed on 6/28/2019)
June 28, 2019 Filing 20 Certificate of Interested Entities by United Chemi-Con Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent Chemi-Con Americas Holding, Inc. for United Chemi-Con Incorporated. (Kaufhold, Steven) (Filed on 6/28/2019)
June 28, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven Shea Kaufhold for Nippon Chemi-Con Corporation and United Chemi-Con, Inc. (Kaufhold, Steven) (Filed on 6/28/2019)
June 28, 2019 Filing 18 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byMatsuo Electric Company Limited. (Lau, Bonnie) (Filed on 6/28/2019)
June 28, 2019 Filing 17 ANSWER to Complaint bySoshin Electric Company Limited, Soshin Electronics of America Incorporated. (Fornaciari, John) (Filed on 6/28/2019)
June 28, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byRubycon America Incorporated, Rubycon Corporation. (Petkoski, Djordje) (Filed on 6/28/2019)
June 28, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by John F. Cove, Jr for Rubycon Corporation and Rubycon America Inc. (Cove, John) (Filed on 6/28/2019)
June 28, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Djordje Petkoski for Rubycon Corporation and Rubycon America Inc. (Petkoski, Djordje) (Filed on 6/28/2019)
June 28, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint byNichicon (America) Corporation, Nichicon Corporation. (Fox, Daniel) (Filed on 6/28/2019)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION AND ORDER re: Regarding Waiver of Service and Extension of Time for Defendants to Respond to Complaint, Motions terminated: (608 in 3:17-md-02801-JD) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Vermont Street Acquisition LLC, Jaco Electronics Incorporated, (11 in 3:19-cv-01902-JD) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Waiver of Service and Extension of Time for Defendants to Respond to Complaint filed by Vermont Street Acquisition LLC, Jaco Electronics Incorporated. Signed by Judge James Donato on 6/19/19. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2019)
June 3, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Waiver of Service and Extension of Time for Defendants to Respond to Complaint filed by Jaco Electronics Incorporated, Vermont Street Acquisition LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Turken, Robert) (Filed on 6/3/2019)
April 10, 2019 Filing 10 Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:19-cv-01705. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
April 5, 2019 Remark: Case Transferred to the Northern District of California via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
April 5, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFIED MDL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-3) Transferring Case to the Northern District of California Re MDL-2801. (MAP)
March 22, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motion granted for Shalia Marie Sakona on behalf of plaintiff. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. ORDERED that Plaintiffs serve a copy of this Order upon Defendants and file a notice of service. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 3/14/2019. (LFIG)
March 13, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Related Case by Jaco Electronics Incorporated, Vermont Street Acquisition LLC. (Abdo, Amy) (MCO)
March 13, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to ELNA America Incorporated, ELNA Company Limited, Hitachi AIC Incorporated, Hitachi Chemical Company America Limited, Hitachi Chemical Company Limited, Matsuo Electric Company Limited, Nichicon (America) Corporation, Nichicon Corporation, Nippon Chemi-Con Corporation, Nissei Electric Company Limited, Rubycon America Incorporated, Rubycon Corporation, Shinyei Capacitor Company Limited, Shinyei Corporation of America Incorporated, Shinyei Kaisha, Shinyei Technology Company Limited, Soshin Electric Company Limited, Soshin Electronics of America Incorporated, Taitsu America Incorporated, Taitsu Corporation, Toshin Kogyo Company Limited, United Chemi-Con Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons, #14 Summons, #15 Summons, #16 Summons, #17 Summons, #18 Summons, #19 Summons, #20 Summons, #21 Summons)(MCO). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
March 13, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (MCO)
March 13, 2019 Filing 4 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16647589. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Diane J Humetewa. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-1705-PHX-DJH. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MCO)
March 13, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Submitted by Jaco Electronics Incorporated, Vermont Street Acquisition LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons, #14 Summons, #15 Summons, #16 Summons, #17 Summons, #18 Summons, #19 Summons, #20 Summons, #21 Summons)(MCO)
March 13, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Jaco Electronics Incorporated, Vermont Street Acquisition LLC. (Abdo, Amy) (Attachments: #1 Corporate Disclosure Statement)(MCO)
March 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16647589 filed by Vermont Street Acquisition LLC, Jaco Electronics Incorporated. (Abdo, Amy) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MCO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jaco Electronics Incorporated et al v. Nippon Chemi-Con Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nichicon Corporation
Represented By: Daniel William Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matsuo Electric Company Limited
Represented By: Bonnie Lau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Chemi-Con Incorporated
Represented By: Steven Shea Kaufhold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taitsu Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toshin Kogyo Company Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hitachi AIC Incorporated
Represented By: Chul Pak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nissei Electric Company Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taitsu America Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shinyei Technology Company Limited
Represented By: Claire M Maddox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hitachi Chemical Company Limited
Represented By: Chul Pak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hitachi Chemical Company America Limited
Represented By: Chul Pak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nichicon (America) Corporation
Represented By: Daniel William Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rubycon America Incorporated
Represented By: Djordje Petkoski
Represented By: John F. Cove, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shinyei Capacitor Company Limited
Represented By: Claire M Maddox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELNA Company Limited
Represented By: Heather S. Nyong'o
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELNA America Incorporated
Represented By: Heather S. Nyong'o
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Soshin Electronics of America Incorporated
Represented By: John R Fornaciari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shinyei Kaisha
Represented By: Claire M Maddox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nippon Chemi-con Corporation
Represented By: Steven Shea Kaufhold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Soshin Electric Company Limited
Represented By: John R Fornaciari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rubycon Corporation
Represented By: Djordje Petkoski
Represented By: John F. Cove, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shinyei Corporation of America Incorporated
Represented By: Claire M Maddox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vermont Street Acquisition LLC
Represented By: Shalia S Sakona
Represented By: Justin Robert DePaul
Represented By: Amy Abdo
Represented By: Robert W Turken
Represented By: Lori P. Lustrin
Represented By: Scott N. Wagner
Represented By: Jerry Goldsmith
Represented By: Ilana A. Drescher
Represented By: Robert William Turken
Represented By: Jerry Robert Goldsmith
Represented By: Ilana Arnowitz Drescher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaco Electronics Incorporated
Represented By: Shalia S Sakona
Represented By: Justin Robert DePaul
Represented By: Amy Abdo
Represented By: Robert W Turken
Represented By: Lori P. Lustrin
Represented By: Scott N. Wagner
Represented By: Jerry Goldsmith
Represented By: Ilana A. Drescher
Represented By: Robert William Turken
Represented By: Jerry Robert Goldsmith
Represented By: Ilana Arnowitz Drescher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?