Uniloc 2017 LLC v. Apple Inc.
Plaintiff: Uniloc 2017 LLC
Defendant: Apple, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv01905
Filed: April 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: James Donato
Referring Judge: Elizabeth D Laporte
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Filing 59 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Pieja, Michael) (Filed on 6/28/2019)
June 24, 2019 Filing 58 NOTICE of Appearance by James J. Foster (Foster, James) (Filed on 6/24/2019)
June 18, 2019 Filing 57 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Jacobs, Aaron) (Filed on 6/18/2019)
May 24, 2019 Filing 56 Answer to Amended Complaint #28 Amended Complaint byApple, Inc.. (Pieja, Michael) (Filed on 5/24/2019)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO RELATE. Signed by Judge Alsup on 5/24/2019. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2019)
May 23, 2019 Filing 54 Refund Status re #53 Application for Refund APPROVED. (rghS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2019)
May 22, 2019 Filing 53 Application for Refund, Receipt Number 0971-13353260 by Apple, Inc.. (Littmann, Alan) (Filed on 5/22/2019)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 52 Order by Judge James Donato granting #47 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Lauren Abendshien. (tmiS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2019)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 Order by Judge James Donato granting #46 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Emma Ross. (tmiS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2019)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 Order by Judge James Donato granting #45 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to A. Littmann. (tmiS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2019)
May 16, 2019 Filing 49 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Michael Thomas Pieja of John Michael Guaragna (Pieja, Michael) (Filed on 5/16/2019)
May 16, 2019 Filing 48 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Michael Thomas Pieja of Brian K. Erickson (Pieja, Michael) (Filed on 5/16/2019)
May 16, 2019 Filing 47 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13353348.) filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Abendshien, Lauren) (Filed on 5/16/2019)
May 16, 2019 Filing 46 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13353330.) filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Ross, Emma) (Filed on 5/16/2019)
May 16, 2019 Filing 45 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13353308.) filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Littmann, Alan) (Filed on 5/16/2019)
May 16, 2019 Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth Frederick Baum (Baum, Kenneth) (Filed on 5/16/2019)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/18/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 7/11/2019. Signed by Judge James Donato on 4/25/19. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2019)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge James Donato for all further proceedings. Judge Susan Illston no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 4/24/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2019)
April 23, 2019 Filing 41 Certificate of Interested Entities by Apple, Inc. (Pieja, Michael) (Filed on 4/23/2019)
April 22, 2019 Filing 40 STIPULATION Joint Stipulation Regarding Responsive Pleading filed by Apple, Inc. and Uniloc 2017 LLC. (Pieja, Michael) (Filed on 4/22/2019) Modified on 4/22/2019 (amgS, COURT STAFF).
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 4/19/19. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2019)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Susan Illston for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte no longer assigned to case,. Signed by Clerk on 4/18/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2019)
April 17, 2019 Filing 37 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2019)
April 17, 2019 Filing 36 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Apple, Inc... (Pieja, Michael) (Filed on 4/17/2019)
April 10, 2019 Filing 35 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs/Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 4/24/2019. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2019)
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/2/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/9/2019 10:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 4/9/19. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2019)
April 9, 2019 Filing 33 Case transferred in from District of Texas Western; Case Number 1:18-cv-00989. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Modified on 4/10/2019 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER GRANTING Defendant's #24 Motion to Transfer Venue and TRANSFERRING this cause to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California. ORDER DISMISSING without prejudice Defendant's #21 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (lt)
March 1, 2019 Filing 31 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Apple Inc., re #24 MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to 28 USC Sec. 1404(a) filed by Defendant Apple Inc. (Attachments: #1 Guaragna Decl., #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8)(Guaragna, John)
February 15, 2019 Filing 30 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Uniloc 2017 LLC, re #24 MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to 28 USC Sec. 1404(a) filed by Defendant Apple Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kevin Gannon, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Exhibit R, #20 Exhibit S, #21 Exhibit T, #22 Exhibit U, #23 Exhibit V, #24 Exhibit W, #25 Exhibit X, #26 Exhibit Y, #27 Exhibit Z, #28 Exhibit AA, #29 Exhibit BB, #30 Exhibit CC, #31 Exhibit DD, #32 Exhibit EE, #33 Exhibit FF, #34 Exhibit GG, #35 Exhibit HH, #36 Exhibit II, #37 Exhibit JJ, #38 Exhibit KK, #39 Declaration of James J. Foster, #40 Proposed Order)(Gannon, Kevin)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Granting Joint Stipulation Setting Deadlines. ORDER continuing Initial Pretrial Conference until further notice. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (lt)
January 8, 2019 Filing 28 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Apple Inc. amending, filed by Uniloc 2017 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Gannon, Kevin)
January 2, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE Regarding Apple Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(B)(6) by Uniloc 2017 LLC (Gannon, Kevin)
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER SETTING Initial Pretrial Conference for 2/1/2019 at 02:00 PM before Judge Lee Yeakel. IN ALL OTHER RESPECTS this action is STAYED, pending further order of the Court. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (lt)
December 27, 2018 Filing 25 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #24 MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to 28 USC Sec. 1404(a) by Uniloc 2017 LLC. (Gannon, Kevin)
December 21, 2018 Filing 24 MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to 28 USC Sec. 1404(a) by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Jaynes Decl., #2 Guaragna Decl., #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Proposed Order)(Guaragna, John)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER GRANTING Apple Inc.'s #20 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (lt)
December 19, 2018 Filing 22 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Apple Inc.. (Guaragna, John)
December 18, 2018 Filing 21 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Abendshien Decl., #2 Exhibit 1)(Guaragna, John)
December 18, 2018 Filing 20 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation (Motion to Transfer Venue) by Apple Inc.. (Guaragna, John)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING #14 Motion for Doug Winnard to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Apple Inc. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (lt)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING #13 Motion for Emma C. Ross to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Apple Inc. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (lt)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING #12 Motion for Michael Pieja to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Apple Inc. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (lt)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING #11 Motion for Alan Littmann to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Apple Inc. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (lt)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING #10 Motion for Lauren Abendshien to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Apple Inc. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (lt)
December 14, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John Michael Guaragna for Doug Winnard ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-11558771) by on behalf of Apple Inc.. (Guaragna, John)
December 14, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John Michael Guaragna for Emma C. Ross ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-11558753) by on behalf of Apple Inc.. (Guaragna, John)
December 14, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John Michael Guaragna for Michael Pieja ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-11558727) by on behalf of Apple Inc.. (Guaragna, John)
December 14, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John Michael Guaragna for Alan Lilttmann ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-11558689) by on behalf of Apple Inc.. (Guaragna, John)
December 14, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John Michael Guaragna for Lauren Abendshien ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-11558589) by on behalf of Apple Inc.. (Guaragna, John)
December 14, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Michael Guaragna on behalf of Apple Inc.. Attorney John Michael Guaragna added to party Apple Inc.(pty:dft) (Guaragna, John)
November 19, 2018 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Apple Inc. (lt)
November 19, 2018 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Uniloc 2017 LLC. (Latchford, Shawn) (Main Document 7 replaced on 11/19/2018 to flatten form) (lt).
November 19, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Shawn A. Latchford on behalf of Uniloc 2017 LLC (Latchford, Shawn)
November 19, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kevin Gannon on behalf of Uniloc 2017 LLC (Gannon, Kevin)
November 19, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Aaron S. Jacobs on behalf of Uniloc 2017 LLC (Jacobs, Aaron)
November 19, 2018 Filing 3 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Uniloc 2017 LLC. (Jacobs, Aaron)
November 19, 2018 Filing 2 Report on Patent/Trademark sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office with copy of Complaint. (afd)
November 17, 2018 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Uniloc 2017 LLC. (afd)
November 17, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (afd)
November 17, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-11468199). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Uniloc 2017 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A (U.S. Patent No. 6,856,616))(Jacobs, Aaron) (Attachment 1 replaced on 11/19/2018 to flatten image) (afd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Uniloc 2017 LLC v. Apple Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Pieja
Represented By: Doug Winnard
Represented By: Emma C. Ross
Represented By: Alan Littmann
Represented By: Brian K. Erickson
Represented By: Lauren Abendshien
Represented By: John Michael Guaragna
Represented By: Michael Thomas Pieja
Represented By: Emma Christine Ross
Represented By: Kenneth Frederick Baum
Represented By: Alan E. Littmann
Represented By: Lauren C Abendshien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Uniloc 2017 LLC
Represented By: Aaron S. Jacobs
Represented By: Kevin Gannon
Represented By: Edward Nelson, III
Represented By: Shawn A Latchford
Represented By: James J. Foster
Represented By: Aaron Seth Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?