Bruinsma et al v. Monsanto Company

Plaintiff: Sjoerd Bruinsma and Brook Bruinsma
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv01931
Filed: April 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2019 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Western District of Michigan (Southern Division 1), 1:19-cv-00217 PLM PJG, Bruinsma v. Monsanto Company, Opened in California Northern District as 3:19-cv-01931 VC pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 127 cc: JPMDL (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2019)
April 11, 2019 Filing 7 Case transferred in from District of Michigan Western; Case Number 1:19-cv-00217. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
April 9, 2019 Filing 6 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation; certified copy received from Northern District of California; case transferred to Northern District of California under MDL No. 2741, In Re: Roundup Products Liability Litigation (pjw)
April 8, 2019 Filing 5 COPY of CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation directed to the Northern District of California regarding case to be transferred to the Multidistrict Litigation Panel under MDL No. 2741, In Re: Roundup Products Liability Litigation (pjw)
March 25, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant Monsanto Company (pjw)
March 22, 2019 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiffs Brook Bruinsma, Sjoerd Bruinsma in the amount of $400, receipt number 0646-4394604 (Doyle, Brion)
March 22, 2019 SUMMONS NOT ISSUED as to defendant Monsanto Company (fee due) (pjw)
March 22, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Paul L. Maloney ; with NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re filing fee (pjw)
March 21, 2019 Filing 2 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Doyle, Brion)
March 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Monsanto Company filed by Sjoerd Bruinsma, Brook Bruinsma (Doyle, Brion)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bruinsma et al v. Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sjoerd Bruinsma
Represented By: Brion B Doyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brook Bruinsma
Represented By: Brion B Doyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?