Tierney et al v. Monsanto Company et al

Plaintiff: Patrick Leonard Tierney and Christy Anna Tierney
Defendant: Bayer Corporation, Bayer A.G. and Monsanto Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv01937
Filed: April 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 8, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Change of Address by Corrie Johnson Yackulic (Yackulic, Corrie) (Filed on 5/8/2019)
May 2, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byMonsanto Company. (Hollingsworth, Joe) (Filed on 5/2/2019)
May 2, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Monsanto Company identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. (Hollingsworth, Joe) (Filed on 5/2/2019)
May 2, 2019 Filing 5 Certificate of Interested Entities by Monsanto Company identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. (Hollingsworth, Joe) (Filed on 5/2/2019)
April 11, 2019 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Western District of Washington (Seattle), 2:19-cv-00245 TSZ, Tiemey v. Monsanto Company, Opened in California Northern District as 3:19-cv-01937 VC pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 127 cc: JPMDL (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2019)
April 11, 2019 Filing 4 Case transferred in from District of Washington Western; Case Number 2:19-cv-00245. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
April 8, 2019 Filing 3 MDL 2741 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO 127); in re Roundup Products Liability Litigation; Northern District of California; assigned to Judge Honorable Vince Chhabria. (TH)
February 21, 2019 Filing 2 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Bayer Corporation, Monsanto Company (Attachments: #1 Summons)(SNP)
February 21, 2019 Judge Thomas S. Zilly added. (SNP)
February 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-5657067) Attorney Corrie Johnson Yackulic added to party Christy Anna Tierney(pty:pla), Attorney Corrie Johnson Yackulic added to party Patrick Leonard Tierney(pty:pla), filed by Patrick Leonard Tierney, Christy Anna Tierney. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Yackulic, Corrie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tierney et al v. Monsanto Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Leonard Tierney
Represented By: Darrin E Bailey
Represented By: Corrie Johnson Yackulic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christy Anna Tierney
Represented By: Darrin E Bailey
Represented By: Corrie Johnson Yackulic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer A.G.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Represented By: Joe G. Hollingsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?