Liggins et al v. Monsanto Company et al

Plaintiff: Lester Liggins and Alexandra Kahnda Liggins
Defendant: Bayer Corporation, Bayer A.G. and Monsanto Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv01938
Filed: April 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2019 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Western District of Washington (Seattle), 2:19-cv-00264 RSL, Liggins v. Monsanto Company, Opened in California Northern District as 3:19-cv-01938 VC pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 127 cc: JPMDL (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2019)
April 11, 2019 Filing 7 Case transferred in from District of Washington Western; Case Number 2:19-cv-00264. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
April 8, 2019 Filing 6 MDL 2741 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO 127); in re Roundup Products Liability Litigation; Northern District of California; assigned to Judge Honorable Vince Chhabria. (TH)
April 2, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to party(s) Bayer AG and Bayer Corporation, filed by Plaintiffs Alexandra Kahnda Liggins, Lester Liggins. (Weymuller, Sims)
March 29, 2019 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re #3 , #4 Affidavit of Service of Summons and Complaint: Modified docket texts to correct dates of service (SWT)
March 29, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Bayer Corporation on 3/20/2019 3/21/2019, filed by Plaintiffs Alexandra Kahnda Liggins, Lester Liggins. (Weymuller, Sims) Modified docket text on 4/1/2019 to correct service date (SWT).
March 29, 2019 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Monsanto Company on 3/20/2019 3/21/2019, filed by Plaintiffs Alexandra Kahnda Liggins, Lester Liggins. (Weymuller, Sims) Modified docket text on 4/1/2019 to correct date of service (SWT).
February 25, 2019 Filing 2 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Bayer Corporation, Monsanto Company (Attachments: #1 Summons)(SNP)
February 25, 2019 Judge Robert S. Lasnik added. (SNP)
February 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damages against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-5661843) Attorney Elizabeth Jean McLafferty added to party Alexandra Kahnda Liggins(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Jean McLafferty added to party Lester Liggins(pty:pla), filed by Lester Liggins, Alexandra Kahnda Liggins. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Monsanto Company, #3 Summons Bayer Corporation)(McLafferty, Elizabeth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Liggins et al v. Monsanto Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lester Liggins
Represented By: Sims G Weymuller
Represented By: Elizabeth Jean McLafferty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexandra Kahnda Liggins
Represented By: Sims G Weymuller
Represented By: Elizabeth Jean McLafferty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer A.G.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?