Leanos v. Home Depot U.S.A., Inc

Plaintiff: Miguel Leanos
Defendant: Home Depot U.S.A., Inc
Case Number: 3:2019cv01950
Filed: April 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edward M Chen
Referring Judge: Virginia K DeMarchi
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Filing 17 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options ADR Certification (Griffith, Brent) (Filed on 6/28/2019)
June 27, 2019 Filing 16 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Tolson, Zachary) (Filed on 6/27/2019)
June 27, 2019 Filing 15 ADR Clerks Notice re: Non-Compliance with Court Order. The parties have failed to file an ADR Certification as required by the Initial Case Management Scheduling Order. Counsel shall comply promptly with the requirements of ADR L.R. 3-5(b) and shall file the ADR Certification. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(cmfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2019)
June 7, 2019 Filing 14 CLERK'S NOTICE ADVANCING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Due to Court unavailability, Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/18/2019 is ADVANCED to 7/17/2019 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor. Joint Case Management Statement due by 7/10/2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2019)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER IN REASSIGNED CASE: Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/18/2019 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor. Joint Case Management Statement due by 7/11/2019. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/6/2019. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2019)
May 3, 2019 Filing 12 Case REASSIGNED to Judge Edward M. Chen. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi no longer assigned to the case (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording) (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2019)
May 3, 2019 Filing 11 This case will be randomly reassigned to a District Judge outside the San Jose Division pursuant to the Caseload Rebalancing Pilot Program approved by the Court effective March 1, 2018. For information, visit our web page at #http://cand.uscourts.gov/news/225. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2019)
May 3, 2019 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (pmcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2019)
May 2, 2019 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. (Tolson, Zachary) (Filed on 5/2/2019)
May 2, 2019 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs/Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 5/16/2019. (pmcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2019)
April 12, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc re #6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines (Tolson, Zachary) (Filed on 4/12/2019)
April 11, 2019 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/9/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/16/2019 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 2, 5th Floor. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2019)
April 11, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc re #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Certificate of Interested Entities, #3 Certificate of Interested Entities (Tolson, Zachary) (Filed on 4/11/2019)
April 11, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/25/2019. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2019)
April 11, 2019 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc identifying Other Affiliate Home Depot U.S.A., Inc for Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. (Tolson, Zachary) (Filed on 4/11/2019)
April 11, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc identifying Corporate Parent The Home Depot, Inc. for Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. (Tolson, Zachary) (Filed on 4/11/2019)
April 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Santa Clara County Superior Court. Their case number is 19CV344268. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-13251781). Filed byHome Depot U.S.A., Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Tolson, Zachary) (Filed on 4/11/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leanos v. Home Depot U.S.A., Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home Depot U.S.A., Inc
Represented By: Joshua Seth Goodman
Represented By: Zachary S. Tolson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miguel Leanos
Represented By: Brent J. Griffith
Represented By: Ryan D. Harris
Represented By: Brent J. Griffith,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?