VII Peaks Co-Optivist Income BDC II, Inc. v. Ansgar Media, LLC
Plaintiff: VII Peaks Co-Optivist Income BDC II, Inc.
Defendant: Ansgar Media, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv01962
Filed: April 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edward M Chen
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by VII Peaks Co-Optivist Income BDC II, Inc. re Civil Standing Orders - USDC Judge Edward M. Chen (Maxwell, K.C.) (Filed on 7/10/2019)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER IN REASSIGNED CASE: Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/12/2019 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor. Joint Case Management Statement due by 9/5/2019. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/17/2019. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2019)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Edward M. Chen for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 6/14/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 13, 2019 Filing 14 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2019)
June 12, 2019 Filing 13 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Ansgar Media, LLC.. (Ngo, Tina) (Filed on 6/12/2019)
June 12, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Tina Vy Ngo on behalf of Ansgar Media, LLC (Ngo, Tina) (Filed on 6/12/2019)
June 12, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATION Extending Time to Respond to Complaint Pursuant to CR 6-1 filed by Ansgar Media, LLC. (Rice, Tania) (Filed on 6/12/2019)
June 12, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Tania L. Rice on behalf of Ansgar Media, LLC (Rice, Tania) (Filed on 6/12/2019)
June 12, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Acker Shapiro on behalf of Ansgar Media, LLC (Shapiro, Jonathan) (Filed on 6/12/2019)
May 29, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by VII Peaks Co-Optivist Income BDC II, Inc. re #1 Complaint, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Certificate of Interested Entities (Wakukawa, David) (Filed on 5/29/2019)
April 24, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by VII Peaks Co-Optivist Income BDC II, Inc... (Maxwell, K.C.) (Filed on 4/24/2019)
April 15, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Ansgar Media, LLC. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2019)
April 15, 2019 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/4/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/11/2019 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2019)
April 12, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/26/2019. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2019)
April 11, 2019 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by VII Peaks Co-Optivist Income BDC II, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent VII Peaks Co-Optivist Income BDC II, Inc. for VII Peaks Co-Optivist Income BDC II, Inc.. (Wakukawa, David) (Filed on 4/11/2019)
April 11, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Wakukawa, David) (Filed on 4/11/2019)
April 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ansgar Media, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13253935.). Filed byVII Peaks Co-Optivist Income BDC II, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wakukawa, David) (Filed on 4/11/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: VII Peaks Co-Optivist Income BDC II, Inc. v. Ansgar Media, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ansgar Media, LLC
Represented By: Tania L. Rice
Represented By: Jonathan Acker Shapiro
Represented By: Tina Vy Ngo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VII Peaks Co-Optivist Income BDC II, Inc.
Represented By: David Seiyei Wakukawa
Represented By: K.C. Maxwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?