Smart Authentication IP, LLC v. Electronic Arts Inc.
Plaintiff: Smart Authentication IP, LLC
Defendant: Electronic Arts Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv01994
Filed: April 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Filing 29 CLERK'S NOTICE. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) Case Management Statement due by 8/2/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/12/19 has been continued to 8/9/2019 02:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 01, 17th Floor. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2019)
July 2, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE by Smart Authentication IP, LLC re #25 Opposition/Response to Motion of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Vyas, Shekhar) (Filed on 7/2/2019)
July 2, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE by Electronic Arts Inc. re #21 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Supplemental Authority in Support of Motion to Dismiss (Morgan, Christine) (Filed on 7/2/2019)
June 28, 2019 Filing 26 REPLY (re #21 MOTION to Dismiss ) Reply Brief in Support of Defendant Electronic Arts Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Under Fed. Rule of Civ. Proc. 12(b)(6) filed byElectronic Arts Inc.. (Morgan, Christine) (Filed on 6/28/2019)
June 21, 2019 Filing 25 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #21 MOTION to Dismiss ) filed bySmart Authentication IP, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Shekhar Vyas, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Vyas, Shekhar) (Filed on 6/21/2019)
June 21, 2019 Filing 24 Certificate of Interested Entities by Electronic Arts Inc. (Morgan, Christine) (Filed on 6/21/2019)
June 21, 2019 Filing 23 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Morgan, Christine) (Filed on 6/21/2019)
June 11, 2019 Filing 22 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Vyas, Shekhar) (Filed on 6/11/2019)
June 7, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Electronic Arts Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 8/9/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 01, 17th Floor before Judge Susan Illston. Responses due by 6/21/2019. Replies due by 6/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Defendant Electronic Arts Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss)(Morgan, Christine) (Filed on 6/7/2019)
June 4, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Mohammed Osman (Osman, Mohammed) (Filed on 6/4/2019)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting #17 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Gerard Donovan. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2019)
April 29, 2019 Filing 18 Certificate of Service by Smart Authentication IP, LLC of Service (Vyas, Shekhar) (Filed on 4/29/2019) Modified on 4/30/2019 (amgS, COURT STAFF).
April 29, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Gerard Donovan ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13301333.) filed by Electronic Arts Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Donovan, Gerard) (Filed on 4/29/2019)
April 26, 2019 Filing 16 CLERK'S NOTICE Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/12/2019 02:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 01, 17th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Standing Order, #3 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording) (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2019)
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Susan Illston for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 4/26/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2019)
April 26, 2019 Filing 14 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2019)
April 25, 2019 Filing 13 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, to Extend Time to Respond filed by Electronic Arts Inc.. (Morgan, Christine) (Filed on 4/25/2019)
April 25, 2019 Filing 12 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Electronic Arts Inc... (Morgan, Christine) (Filed on 4/25/2019)
April 25, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Christine Marie Morgan (Morgan, Christine) (Filed on 4/25/2019)
April 25, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by John P. Bovich (Bovich, John) (Filed on 4/25/2019)
April 17, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Smart Authentication IP, LLC. Electronic Arts Inc. served on 4/17/2019, answer due 5/8/2019. (Vyas, Shekhar) (Filed on 4/17/2019)
April 16, 2019 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Smart Authentication IP, LLC.. (Vyas, Shekhar) (Filed on 4/16/2019)
April 15, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Electronic Arts Inc.. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2019)
April 15, 2019 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/4/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/11/2019 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2019)
April 12, 2019 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/26/2019. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2019)
April 12, 2019 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Entities by Smart Authentication IP, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Monument Patent Holdings, LLC for Smart Authentication IP, LLC. (Vyas, Shekhar) (Filed on 4/12/2019)
April 12, 2019 Filing 3 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding US 8,082,213 B2 (cc: form mailed to register). (Vyas, Shekhar) (Filed on 4/12/2019)
April 12, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Vyas, Shekhar) (Filed on 4/12/2019)
April 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Electronic Arts Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13258445.). Filed bySmart Authentication IP, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Vyas, Shekhar) (Filed on 4/12/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smart Authentication IP, LLC v. Electronic Arts Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Smart Authentication IP, LLC
Represented By: Shekhar Vyas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Electronic Arts Inc.
Represented By: Christine Marie Morgan
Represented By: John P. Bovich
Represented By: Mohammed Osman
Represented By: Gerard M. Donovan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?