Conyers et al v. Monsanto Company et al

Plaintiff: Richard A. Pena, Jimmie Fulcher, Jesus Rodriguez Morillo, Richard Logemann, Mimia W. Conyers, Kathy K. Lee, Lisa M. Vale-Lang, Chandra Ruano, Sidney Whitehouse and Eugene Weslow
Defendant: Monsanto Company, Wilbur-Ellis Company, LLC and Wilbur-Ellis Feed, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv02001
Filed: April 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1446pl
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 157: GRANTING MOTIONS TO REMAND TO ALAMEDA COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 7/9/2019. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2019)
May 28, 2019 Filing 17 Transcript of Proceedings held on 5/22/19, before Judge Vince Chhabria. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Powell Sullivan, Official Reporter, Katherine_Sullivan@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (3877 in 3:16-md-02741-VC) Transcript Order, (3882 in 3:16-md-02741-VC) Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/26/2019. (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 5/28/2019)
May 22, 2019 Filing 16 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Vince Chhabria: Motion Hearing held on 5/22/2019 - Re (17 in 3:19-cv-01018-VC) MOTION to Remand the Case to the Superior Court of the State of California, County of Alameda, Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1447(c) filed by Lee Alan Rosichan, Steven Oliveira, James Eric Nelson, Lawrence Krupinski, Jose Ochoa, Brynda Dunbar, Joseph Calhoun, Robert Geoffrey Smith, Michael D. Winch, Jr., Bruce Lowe, Jeffrey D. Baum, Charles Crouse, Kenneth Grisler, John Kalfayan, Kathryn Dufore, Emilio Cavazos, Terrence M. O'Neill, Norman J. Flinn, Anita Richardson, Keith Davie, (14 in 3:18-cv-07558-VC) Amended MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice (Eighth Amended) filed by Monsanto Company, (26 in 3:18-cv-00815-VC) Amended MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice (Ninth Amended) filed by Monsanto Company, (11 in 3:19-cv-02001-VC) MOTION to Remand the Case to the Superior Court of the State of California, County of Alameda, Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1447(c) filed by Sidney Whitehouse, Richard A. Pena, Chandra Ruano, Kathy K. Lee, Jesus Rodriguez Morillo, Lisa M. Vale-Lang, Eugene Weslow, Mimia W. Conyers, Richard Logemann, Jimmie Fulcher, (15 in 3:18-cv-00993-VC) Amended MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice (Ninth Amended) filed by Monsanto Company, (39 in 3:18-cv-03363-VC) Amended MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice (Ninth Amended) filed by Monsanto Company, (16 in 3:17-cv-07365-VC) Amended MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice (Ninth Amended) filed by Monsanto Company, (15 in 3:17-cv-05547-VC) Amended MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice (Ninth Amended) filed by Monsanto Company, (16 in 3:19-cv-01031-VC) MOTION to Remand the Case to the Superior Court of the State of California, County of Alameda, Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1447(c) filed by Max Coleman, Don Leonard, Eveline Paris, Brad Perrault, Charles Kast, Laurene Miller, Lourdes Valle, Bobby Sheldon, Benjamin Cable, Brent Carr, (19 in 3:17-cv-06902-VC) Amended MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice (Ninth Amended) filed by Monsanto Company, (52 in 3:17-cv-02142-VC) Amended MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice (Ninth Amended) filed by Monsanto Company, (16 in 3:19-cv-01030-VC) MOTION to Remand the Case to the Superior Court of the State of California, County of Alameda, Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1447(c) filed by Patricia Salgado, Anthony Smith, Dan King, Jose Aguilera, Samantha Taylor, Nola Garcia, Joseph Rykert, Denise Berger, David Mobley, Michael Ferguson, (12 in 3:18-cv-03558-VC) Amended MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice (Eighth Amended) filed by Monsanto Company, (16 in 3:19-cv-01020-VC) MOTION to Remand the Case to the Superior Court of the State of California, County of Alameda, Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1447(c) filed by Steven Kist, Frances Gonzalez, Shanda Salim, Bobby Newton, Laurie Loomis, Steven Welch, Raymond Peck, James Nelson, Syble Gobron, Mike Mostipak, (16 in 3:19-cv-01023-VC) MOTION to Remand the Case to the Superior Court of the State of California, County of Alameda, Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1447(c) filed by Jodi Horyna, Michael Rietzke, Camilla Kennedy, Phyllis Bobrow, John Rabbers, Joshua Freitas, Dan Sellers, Marques Jones, (20 in 3:18-cv-03959-VC) Amended MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice (Eighth Amended) filed by Monsanto Company, (16 in 3:19-cv-01024-VC) MOTION to Remand the Case to the Superior Court of the State of California, County of Alameda, Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1447(c) filed by Laura Shoebel, Rand Stammen, Reynaldo Rivas, Jo Ann Carter, Janet Herdt, Evelyn Ruley, Robert Howe, Robert Hernandez, Robert Burg, (13 in 3:18-cv-06551-VC) Amended MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice (Eighth Amended) filed by Monsanto Company, (13 in 3:19-cv-01289-VC) MOTION to Remand All Plaintiffs filed by Craig Ataide, (11 in 3:19-cv-01717-VC) MOTION to Remand the Case to the Superior Court of the State of California, County of Alameda, Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1447(c) filed by Lorna Kidwell, Dennis Yonemura, Larry Dancer, Renee Franklin, Gary P. Archambault, Raymond Pruitt Jr., Karen Duncan, Ronald A. Kalayta, Lacy Caroline Stormes, Todd Chandler, (30 in 3:17-cv-02142-VC) First MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Vicki Rapp, Bobby Joe Jones, Shawn Murphy, Joseph Mulholland, Estel Butterfield, Timothy Nowicki, Donald Smith, James Sheldon, Phyllis Reith, Anne Mitchell, Joseph Johnson, Sharon McClurg, Carol Sorensen, Janet Porteous, Suzanne Norgren, Rebecca Neuzil, Patricia Reynolds, Fredrick Smith, Melvin Costa, Larry Richards, Daryl Ogden, Janie Narczewski, Dean Rasmussen, Michael Price, Stacy Peperoni, Warren Proctor, Kristina Moore, Marion Nottingham, Marcia McCray, Loretta Price, James David, Rachel Randolph, James Palmer, Deanna Nelson, Patricia Pfister, Larry Niederer, Earl Nelson, Spirit Connell, Dennis Pfister, Sami Mohammad, John Schoonover, Edward Reynolds, Wanda Parker, John A. Meeks, Mark Pollum, Lisa Mulholland, Rexford Martin, Cyril Neuzil, Royal Mathis, Cynthia Ortiz, Christopher Luetcke, James Narczewski, Melvin Popinga, Marty Pinkard, Jay Borum, Davien McCarty, Sharon Rezendes, Katholyn Jean Mathis, Linda Moore, Dale Rapp, John Novak, Gordon Muller, Reginald Liggins, Becky Miller, Ida Popinga, David King, Brandy Merrell, Vickie Neal, Mark McCowen, Barbara Nowicki, Greg Randolph, Douglas Moss, Richard Reith, Virgil Rizzo, John Parker, Terence Moore, James Aultman, Anthony Rezendes, Lorne Miller, Andrew Gordon, Ronald Matheny, Alan Gniadek, Daniel Redding, Mary Ortiz, Henry Moore, Stan Gerlach, Robert Porteous, John Otts, Shalisha Robinson, Martha Whitford, Sherry Lynn Matheny, Debraa McCowen, Donald Nelson, Jayne Niederer, Eileen Means, Paul Neumeyer, Emma Otts, David Nisbet, Jack Watson, Robert Mitchell, Donna Rizzo, Patrick Martin, Robert Hoffman, Richard Niewiadomski, Eugene Merrell, Guy Pritchard, Ron Peperoni, Jr., Donald Richardson, (12 in 3:19-cv-01589-VC) MOTION to Remand filed by George Chupa, (14 in 3:18-cv-01085-VC) Amended MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice (Ninth Amended) filed by Monsanto Company, (14 in 3:18-cv-05495-VC) Amended MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice (Ninth Amended) filed by Monsanto Company, (11 in 3:19-cv-01587-VC) MOTION to Remand the Case to the Superior Court of the State of California, County of Alameda, Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1447(c) filed by Maryann Cima, Kip S. Henderson, Stefani Wilcoxen, Frank Lombano, Marie A. Guzman, Dawn E. Lowrey, Darlene David, Julie R. Rodrigues, Rob O. Abreu, (17 in 3:18-cv-04552-VC) Amended MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice (Ninth Amended) filed by Monsanto Company, (16 in 3:17-cv-05161-VC) Amended MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice (Ninth Amended) filed by Monsanto Co. Trial set for C16-2341 VC for February 10, 2020 at 8:30 a.m. Jury Selection set for February 5, 2020 at 8:30 a.m. (Total Time in Court: 2 Hours and 40 Minutes) Court Reporter: Katherine Sullivan. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/22/2019)
May 14, 2019 Filing 15 REPLY (re #11 MOTION to Remand the Case to the Superior Court of the State of California, County of Alameda, Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1447(c) ) filed byMimia W. Conyers, Jimmie Fulcher, Kathy K. Lee, Richard Logemann, Richard A. Pena, Jesus Rodriguez Morillo, Chandra Ruano, Lisa M. Vale-Lang, Eugene Weslow, Sidney Whitehouse. (Greenwald, Robin) (Filed on 5/14/2019)
May 7, 2019 Filing 14 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #11 MOTION to Remand the Case to the Superior Court of the State of California, County of Alameda, Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1447(c) ) filed byMonsanto Company. (Attachments: #1 Defendant Monsanto Company's Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand, #2 Exhibit 1 to Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Exhibit 2 to Request for Judicial Notice, #4 Exhibit 3 to Request for Judicial Notice, #5 Exhibit 4 to Request for Judicial Notice, #6 Exhibit 5 to Request for Judicial Notice, #7 Exhibit 6 to Request for Judicial Notice, #8 Exhibit 7 to Request for Judicial Notice, #9 Exhibit 8 to Request for Judicial Notice, #10 Exhibit 9 to Request for Judicial Notice, #11 Declaration of Martin Calhoun in Support of Defendant Monsanto Company's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand (with Exhibit 1))(Lasker, Eric) (Filed on 5/7/2019)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 142: SCHEDULING FOR PENDING MOTIONS TO REMAND. Motion Hearing set for 5/22/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor before Judge Vince Chhabria.. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 4/24/2019. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2019)
April 23, 2019 Filing 12 Brief re #11 MOTION to Remand the Case to the Superior Court of the State of California, County of Alameda, Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1447(c) filed byMimia W. Conyers, Jimmie Fulcher, Kathy K. Lee, Richard Logemann, Richard A. Pena, Jesus Rodriguez Morillo, Chandra Ruano, Lisa M. Vale-Lang, Eugene Weslow, Sidney Whitehouse. (Related document(s) #11 ) (Greenwald, Robin) (Filed on 4/23/2019)
April 23, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Remand the Case to the Superior Court of the State of California, County of Alameda, Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1447(c) filed by Mimia W. Conyers, Jimmie Fulcher, Kathy K. Lee, Richard Logemann, Richard A. Pena, Jesus Rodriguez Morillo, Chandra Ruano, Lisa M. Vale-Lang, Eugene Weslow, Sidney Whitehouse. Motion Hearing set for 5/30/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor before Judge Vince Chhabria. Responses due by 5/7/2019. Replies due by 5/14/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Robin Greenwald in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand, #2 Exhibit 1 Conyers Complaint Filed, #3 Exhibit 2 Notice of Addition of Case to JCCP and Stay, #4 Exhibit 3 Plaintiffs' Motion for Bellwether Selection Process, #5 Exhibit 4 JCCP Case Management Order 1-25-2019, #6 Exhibit 5 JCCP Master Long Form Complaint Draft)(Greenwald, Robin) (Filed on 4/23/2019)
April 22, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byWilbur-Ellis Company, LLC, Wilbur-Ellis Feed, LLC. (Hollingsworth, Joe) (Filed on 4/22/2019)
April 22, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wilbur-Ellis Company, LLC, Wilbur-Ellis Feed, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Wilbur-Ellis Holdings II, Inc, Corporate Parent Wilbur-Ellis Holdings, Inc for Wilbur-Ellis Company, LLC, Wilbur-Ellis Feed, LLC. (Hollingsworth, Joe) (Filed on 4/22/2019)
April 22, 2019 Filing 8 Certificate of Interested Entities by Wilbur-Ellis Company, LLC, Wilbur-Ellis Feed, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Wilbur-Ellis Holdings II, Inc, Corporate Parent Wilbur-Ellis Holdings, Inc for Wilbur-Ellis Company, LLC, Wilbur-Ellis Feed, LLC. (Hollingsworth, Joe) (Filed on 4/22/2019)
April 16, 2019 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Conyers v. Monsanto Company, Opened in California Northern District as 3:19-cv-02001 VC cc: JPMDL (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2019)
April 15, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Monsanto Company re #6 Answer to Complaint (Fayne, Samuel) (Filed on 4/15/2019)
April 15, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byMonsanto Company. (Fayne, Samuel) (Filed on 4/15/2019)
April 15, 2019 Filing 5 Case assigned to Judge Vince Chhabria. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2019)
April 15, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Monsanto Company (Fayne, Samuel) (Filed on 4/15/2019)
April 15, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Monsanto Company identifying Corporate Parent Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. (Fayne, Samuel) (Filed on 4/15/2019)
April 15, 2019 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Monsanto Company identifying Corporate Parent Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. (Fayne, Samuel) (Filed on 4/15/2019)
April 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Francisco Superior Court. Their case number is CGC-19-572706. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-13259775). Filed byMonsanto Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fayne, Samuel) (Filed on 4/15/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Conyers et al v. Monsanto Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard A. Pena
Represented By: Devin Lynn Bolton
Represented By: Robin Lynn Greenwald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmie Fulcher
Represented By: Devin Lynn Bolton
Represented By: Robin Lynn Greenwald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesus Rodriguez Morillo
Represented By: Devin Lynn Bolton
Represented By: Robin Lynn Greenwald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Logemann
Represented By: Devin Lynn Bolton
Represented By: Robin Lynn Greenwald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mimia W. Conyers
Represented By: Devin Lynn Bolton
Represented By: Robin Lynn Greenwald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathy K. Lee
Represented By: Devin Lynn Bolton
Represented By: Robin Lynn Greenwald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa M. Vale-Lang
Represented By: Devin Lynn Bolton
Represented By: Robin Lynn Greenwald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chandra Ruano
Represented By: Devin Lynn Bolton
Represented By: Robin Lynn Greenwald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sidney Whitehouse
Represented By: Devin Lynn Bolton
Represented By: Robin Lynn Greenwald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eugene Weslow
Represented By: Devin Lynn Bolton
Represented By: Robin Lynn Greenwald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Represented By: Samuel Zachary Fayne
Represented By: Eric Gordon Lasker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilbur-Ellis Company, LLC
Represented By: Joe G. Hollingsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilbur-Ellis Feed, LLC
Represented By: Joe G. Hollingsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?