Barajas et al v. Carriage Cemetery Services of California, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Nachae Williams, Yoshira Barajas, Buriel Denise Williams Davis and Henry Grant
Defendant: Carriage Cemetery Services of California, Inc., Carriage Funeral Services of California, Inc. and Carriage Services, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv02035
Filed: April 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edward M Chen
Referring Judge: Elizabeth D Laporte
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Filing 32 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Plaintiffs' Case Management Statement filed by Yoshira Barajas, Henry Grant, Nachae Williams, Buriel Denise Williams Davis. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Allyssa Villanueva, Esq re Plaintiffs' CMC Statement)(Benjamin, Na'il) (Filed on 7/9/2019)
July 9, 2019 Filing 31 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options re Yoshira Barajas (Benjamin, Na'il) (Filed on 7/9/2019)
July 9, 2019 Filing 30 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options re Henry Grant (Benjamin, Na'il) (Filed on 7/9/2019)
July 9, 2019 Filing 29 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options re Nachae Williams (Benjamin, Na'il) (Filed on 7/9/2019)
July 9, 2019 Filing 28 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options re Buriel Denise Williams Davis (Benjamin, Na'il) (Filed on 7/9/2019)
July 9, 2019 Filing 27 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Carriage Cemetery Services of California, Inc., Carriage Funeral Services of California, Inc., Carriage Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Jason M. Richardson, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3)(Richardson, Jason) (Filed on 7/9/2019)
July 2, 2019 Filing 26 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Chang, Andrew) (Filed on 7/2/2019)
July 2, 2019 Filing 25 Certificate of Interested Entities by Yoshira Barajas, Henry Grant, Nachae Williams, Buriel Denise Williams Davis Plaintiffs' Certification of No Interested Parties (Benjamin, Na'il) (Filed on 7/2/2019)
June 26, 2019 Filing 24 ADR Clerks Notice re: Non-Compliance with Court Order. The parties have failed to file an ADR Certification as required by the Initial Case Management Scheduling Order. Counsel shall comply promptly with the requirements of ADR L.R. 3-5(b) and shall file the ADR Certification. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(cmfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2019)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Denying #10 Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/17/2019. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2019)
June 13, 2019 Filing 22 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Edward M. Chen: Motion Hearing held on 6/13/2019 re #10 MOTION to Remand Action to Alameda County Superior Court filed by Buriel Denise Williams Davis, Henry Grant, Yoshira Barajas, Nachae Williams ; denying #10 Motion to Remand. Initial Case Management Conference and Motion Hearing re: #15 Motion to Dismiss specially set for 7/16/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. Joint Case Management Statement due by 7/9/2019. Total Time in Court: 39 Minutes. Court Reporter: Katherine Sullivan. Plaintiff Attorney: Na'il Benjamin. Defendant Attorney: Andrew Chang. Attachment: Minute Order. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/13/2019)
June 13, 2019 Filing 21 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 06/13/19 before Judge Edward M. Chen by Carriage Cemetery Services of California, Inc., Carriage Funeral Services of California, Inc., Carriage Services, Inc., for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Chang, Andrew) (Filed on 6/13/2019)
June 13, 2019 Filing 20 *** DISREGARD - FILED IN ERROR (SEE DOCKET #21 ) *** TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 06/13/19 before Judge Edward M. Chen by Carriage Cemetery Services of California, Inc., Carriage Funeral Services of California, Inc., Carriage Services, Inc., for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Chang, Andrew) (Filed on 6/13/2019) Modified on 6/14/2019 (rjdS, COURT STAFF).
May 31, 2019 Filing 19 REPLY BRIEF in Support (re #15 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint or, in the Alternative, Motion for a More Definite Statement) filed by Carriage Cemetery Services of California, Inc., Carriage Funeral Services of California, Inc., Carriage Services, Inc.. (Chang, Andrew) (Filed on 5/31/2019)
May 24, 2019 Filing 18 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #15 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint or, in the Alternative, Motion for a More Definite Statement) filed by Yoshira Barajas, Henry Grant, Nachae Williams, Buriel Denise Williams Davis. (Benjamin, Na'il) (Filed on 5/24/2019) Modified on 5/29/2019 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
May 17, 2019 Filing 17 REPLY in Support (re #10 MOTION to Remand Action to Alameda County Superior Court) filed by Yoshira Barajas, Henry Grant, Nachae Williams, Buriel Denise Williams Davis. (Benjamin, Na'il) (Filed on 5/17/2019) Modified on 5/20/2019 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
May 15, 2019 Filing 16 CLERK'S NOTICE. The hearing on #15 Defendants' motion to dismiss is temporarily vacated so that the Court may address first #10 Plaintiffs' motion to remand. Although the Court is temporarily vacating the hearing on the motion to dismiss, briefing on the motion to dismiss should still proceed (i.e., the opposition shall be filed by 05/24/2019 and the reply on 05/31/2019). (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2019)
May 10, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint or, in the Alternative, Motion for a More Definite Statement filed by Carriage Cemetery Services of California, Inc., Carriage Funeral Services of California, Inc., Carriage Services, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 6/20/2019 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 5/24/2019. Replies due by 5/31/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Chang, Andrew) (Filed on 5/10/2019)
May 10, 2019 Filing 14 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #10 MOTION to Remand Action to Alameda County Superior Court ) filed byCarriage Cemetery Services of California, Inc., Carriage Funeral Services of California, Inc., Carriage Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Andrew Chang ISO, #2 Exhibit 1 to Chang Decl., #3 Exhibit 2 to Chang Decl., #4 Declaration of Michael Elliott ISO, #5 Declaration of Christine Ngo ISO, #6 Proposed Order)(Chang, Andrew) (Filed on 5/10/2019)
May 2, 2019 Filing 13 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint filed by Carriage Cemetery Services of California, Inc., Carriage Funeral Services of California, Inc., Carriage Services, Inc.. (Chang, Andrew) (Filed on 5/2/2019)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO RELATE TO 4:17-CV-04424 JSW. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 4/30/19. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2019)
April 30, 2019 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE: Due to the Court's uavailability, motion hearing re #10 MOTION to Remand Action to Alameda County Superior Court is RESCHEDULED for 6/13/2019 at 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. Parties are advised to confirm Court's unavailability prior to setting motion hearing. Briefing remains unchanged. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2019)
April 26, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Remand Action to Alameda County Superior Court filed by Yoshira Barajas, Henry Grant, Nachae Williams, Buriel Denise Williams Davis. Motion Hearing set for 6/6/2019 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 5/10/2019. Replies due by 5/17/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Allyssa Villanueva iso Plaintiff's Motion to Remand Action to Alameda County Superior Court, #2 Proposed Order proposed Order)(Benjamin, Na'il) (Filed on 4/26/2019)
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER, Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Edward M. Chen for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Judge The Clerk on 4/19/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2019)
April 18, 2019 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2019)
April 17, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Yoshira Barajas, Henry Grant, Nachae Williams, Buriel Denise Williams Davis.. (Benjamin, Na'il) (Filed on 4/17/2019)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Pilot Program for Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due b y 7/23/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/30/2019 10:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 4/16/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility)(aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2019)
April 16, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE by Carriage Cemetery Services of California, Inc., Carriage Funeral Services of California, Inc., Carriage Services, Inc. to the United States District Court that Notice of Removal of Action Has Been Filed in State Court (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Notice to State Court and Plaintiffs of Filing Notice of Removal)(Chang, Andrew) (Filed on 4/16/2019)
April 16, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Carriage Cemetery Services of California, Inc., Carriage Funeral Services of California, Inc., Carriage Services, Inc. re #2 Certificate of Interested Entities, 3 Case Assigned by Intake,,, #1 Notice of Removal,, (Chang, Andrew) (Filed on 4/16/2019)
April 16, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/30/2019. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2019)
April 16, 2019 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Carriage Cemetery Services of California, Inc., Carriage Funeral Services of California, Inc., Carriage Services, Inc. (Chang, Andrew) (Filed on 4/16/2019)
April 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL and Demand for Jury Trial:(NO PROCESS); from Alameda County Superior Court. Their case number is RG19010306. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-13264611). Filed byCarriage Funeral Services of California, Inc., Carriage Services, Inc., Carriage Cemetery Services of California, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal - Complaint, #3 Exhibit B to Notice of Removal - First Amended Complaint, #4 Declaration of Andrew L. Chang, #5 Exhibit 1 to Andrew L. Chang Declaration, #6 Exhibit 2 to Andrew L. Chang Declaration)(Chang, Andrew) (Filed on 4/16/2019) Modified on 4/17/2019 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barajas et al v. Carriage Cemetery Services of California, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nachae Williams
Represented By: Na'il Benjamin
Represented By: Allyssa Briana Villanueva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yoshira Barajas
Represented By: Na'il Benjamin
Represented By: Allyssa Briana Villanueva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Buriel Denise Williams Davis
Represented By: Na'il Benjamin
Represented By: Allyssa Briana Villanueva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry Grant
Represented By: Na'il Benjamin
Represented By: Allyssa Briana Villanueva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carriage Cemetery Services of California, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew L. Chang
Represented By: Jason Matthew Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carriage Funeral Services of California, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew L. Chang
Represented By: Jason Matthew Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carriage Services, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew L. Chang
Represented By: Jason Matthew Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?