Garcia v. Harley-Davidson Motor Company, Inc.

Plaintiff: Ronald Garcia
Defendant: Harley-Davidson Motor Company, Inc. and Harley-Davidson Motor Company Group, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv02054
Filed: April 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Joseph C Spero
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Order, signed as modified on 7/9/19, by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #27 Stipulation Extending Time to Respond to First Amended Complaint and Setting Briefing Schedule for Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint. Motions due by 7/15/2019. Replies due by 9/13/2019. Responses due by 8/23/2019. Motion Hearing set for 9/27/2019 at 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2019)
June 28, 2019 Filing 29 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Todzo, Mark) (Filed on 6/28/2019)
June 27, 2019 Filing 28 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Harley-Davidson Motor Company Group, LLC (Preciado, Michael) (Filed on 6/27/2019)
June 21, 2019 Filing 27 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Harley-Davidson Motor Company Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Re Extension of Time and Briefing Schedule Re FAC)(Thomas, John) (Filed on 6/21/2019)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER, signed 6/19/19, by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #24 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Garrett Owens. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2019)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Order, signed 6/19/19, by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #23 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Jacob Tubbs.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13439527.) filed by Ronald Garcia. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Good Standing)(Todzo, Mark) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13439468.) filed by Ronald Garcia. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Todzo, Mark) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by John Mark Thomas (Thomas, John) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Abirami Gnanadesigan (Gnanadesigan, Abirami) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Order by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero denying as moot #9 Motion to Dismiss. The hearing set for June 28, 2019 is VACATED. (jcslc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2019)
June 10, 2019 Filing 19 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Harley-Davidson Motor Company, Inc.. Filed by Ronald Garcia. (Armstrong, Nicholas) (Filed on 6/10/2019) Modified on 6/10/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Order, signed 6/4/19, by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #14 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Samantha Duke.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2019)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Order, signed 6t/4/19, by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #13 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Ernest Hadley Eubanks Jr.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2019)
June 3, 2019 Filing 16 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Harley-Davidson Motor Company, Inc... (Preciado, Michael) (Filed on 6/3/2019)
May 28, 2019 Filing 15 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendant Harley Davidson shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 6/4/2019. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2019)
May 24, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Samantha Crawford Duke ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13381338.) filed by Harley-Davidson Motor Company, Inc.. (Preciado, Michael) (Filed on 5/24/2019)
May 24, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Ernest Hadley Eubanks, Jr. ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13381335.) filed by Harley-Davidson Motor Company, Inc.. (Preciado, Michael) (Filed on 5/24/2019)
May 24, 2019 Filing 12 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Harley-Davidson Motor Company, Inc.. (Preciado, Michael) (Filed on 5/24/2019)
May 24, 2019 Filing 11 Certificate of Interested Entities by Harley-Davidson Motor Company, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Harley-Davidson Motor Company Operations, Inc., Other Affiliate Buell Motorcycle Company, LLC, Other Affiliate H-D Livewire Labs, LLC, Other Affiliate HDWA, LLC for Harley-Davidson Motor Company, Inc.. re #9 MOTION to Dismiss (Preciado, Michael) (Filed on 5/24/2019)
May 24, 2019 Filing 10 Request for Judicial Notice re #9 MOTION to Dismiss filed byHarley-Davidson Motor Company, Inc.. (Related document(s) #9 ) (Preciado, Michael) (Filed on 5/24/2019)
May 24, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Harley-Davidson Motor Company, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 6/28/2019 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Responses due by 6/7/2019. Replies due by 6/14/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael A. Preciado, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Proposed Order)(Preciado, Michael) (Filed on 5/24/2019)
May 21, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ronald Garcia (Todzo, Mark) (Filed on 5/21/2019)
April 30, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Ronald Garcia.. (Todzo, Mark) (Filed on 4/30/2019)
April 24, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Harley-Davidson Motor Company, Inc.. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2019)
April 24, 2019 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/12/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/19/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2019)
April 17, 2019 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Entities by Ronald Garcia (Williams, Lucas) (Filed on 4/17/2019)
April 16, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/30/2019. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2019)
April 16, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Todzo, Mark) (Filed on 4/16/2019)
April 16, 2019 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT; Demand for Jury Trial against Harley-Davidson Motor Company, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number 0971-13265913.). Filed by Ronald Garcia. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Todzo, Mark) (Filed on 4/16/2019) Modified on 4/24/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garcia v. Harley-Davidson Motor Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harley-Davidson Motor Company, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Alan Preciado
Represented By: Ernest Hadley Eubanks, Jr.
Represented By: Samantha Crawford Duke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harley-Davidson Motor Company Group, LLC
Represented By: John Mark Thomas
Represented By: Michael Alan Preciado
Represented By: Abirami Gnanadesigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Garcia
Represented By: Mark N. Todzo
Represented By: Jacob Tubbs
Represented By: Nicholas W. Armstrong
Represented By: Garrett Owens
Represented By: Lucas Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?