Hayes v. Facebook
Plaintiff: Thomas Hayes
Defendant: Facebook
Case Number: 3:2019cv02106
Filed: April 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Thomas S Hixson
Referring Judge: Elizabeth D Laporte
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND SCREENING COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1915(E). Signed by Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 7/3/2019. (tshlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2019) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/5/2019: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (cdnS, COURT STAFF).
May 13, 2019 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Thomas Hayes. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2019) (hdjS, COURT STAFF).
May 6, 2019 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE: Directing Plaintiff to file consent or declination to Magistrate Jurisdiction. Consent or Declination due by: May 17, 2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2019)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER consolidating cases and requesting clarification by 5/23/2019. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 5/6/2019. (tshlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2019) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/6/2019: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (rmm2S, COURT STAFF).
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte no longer assigned to case,. Signed by Clerk on 4/29/19. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2019)
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Transferring Case by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. The deputy clerk hereby certifies that on 4/26/2019 a copy of this order was served by sending it via first-class mail to the address of each non-CM/ECF user listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2019)
April 18, 2019 Filing 3 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN DISTRICT COURT WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COST; BY Thomas Hayes. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2019)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/23/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/30/2019 10:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 4/18/19. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2019)
April 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; (NO PROCESS);(IFP PENDING); against Facebook. Filed byThomas Hayes. Consent/Declination due by 5/2/2019. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2019) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/19/2019: #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (aaaS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hayes v. Facebook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?