Sayre v. Google, Inc.
Plaintiff: Paul Joseph Sayre
Defendant: Google Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv02247
Filed: April 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Referring Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:2
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2019 Filing 36 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #33 Order on Stipulation, #35 Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice: The deputy clerk hereby certifies that on 6/20/2019, a copy of this order was served by sending it via first-class mail to the address of each non-CM/ECF user listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing. This is a text only docket entry. There is no document associated with this entry. (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2019)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER by Judge William Alsup granting #34 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Hector Torres. (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2019)
June 17, 2019 Filing 34 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13431770.) Filing fee previously paid on 6/12/2019 filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Torres, Hector) (Filed on 6/17/2019)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER GRANTING #30 AS MODIFIED STIPULATED REQUEST RE FILING OF AMENDED COMPLAINT, DEFENDANT'S TIME TO RESPOND, AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge William Alsup. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2019)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER by Judge William Alsup denying #31 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Hector Torres. The deputy clerk hereby certifies that on 6/14/2019, a copy of this order was served by sending it via first-class mail to the address of each non-CM/ECF user listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing. (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 12, 2019 Filing 31 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13431770.) filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Torres, Hector) (Filed on 6/12/2019)
June 11, 2019 Filing 30 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Re: Filing Of Amended Complaint, Defendant's Time To Respond To Complaint, And Briefing Schedule On Motion To Dismiss filed by Google Inc. and Paul Joseph Sayre. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Of Lyn R. Agre In Support Of The Parties Stipulation And [Proposed] Order, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Agre, Lyn) (Filed on 6/11/2019) Modified on 6/12/2019 (amgS, COURT STAFF).
May 20, 2019 Filing 29 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #28 Order on Stipulation: The deputy clerk hereby certifies that on 5/20/2019, a copy of this order was served by sending it via first-class mail to the address of each non-CM/ECF user listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing. This is a text only docket entry. There is no document associated with this entry. (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2019)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER GRANTING #27 STIPULATED REQUEST TO CONTINUE INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (AS MODIFIED) by Judge William Alsup. Case Management Statement due by 7/18/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/1/2019 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2019)
May 16, 2019 Filing 27 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 25 Clerk's Notice,, filed by Google Inc. and Paul Joseph Sayre. (Agre, Lyn) (Filed on 5/16/2019) Modified on 5/17/2019 (amgS, COURT STAFF).
May 16, 2019 Filing 26 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Google Inc. re 25 Clerk's Notice,, #17 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines, #24 Order,,, Case Assigned/Reassigned,, (Agre, Lyn) (Filed on 5/16/2019)
May 10, 2019 Filing 25 CLERK'S NOTICE SCHEDULING CMC ON REASSIGNMENT: Case Management Statement due by 5/23/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/30/2019 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor. Standing orders can be downloaded from the Court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/whaorders. The deputy clerk hereby certifies that on 5/10/2019, a copy of this order was served by sending it via first-class mail to the address of each non-CM/ECF user listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2019) Modified on 5/10/2019 (tlhS, COURT STAFF).
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER, Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge William Alsup for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by The Clerk on 5/10/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2019)
May 9, 2019 Filing 23 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2019)
May 9, 2019 Filing 22 Certificate of Interested Entities by Google Inc. identifying Corporate Parent XXVI Holdings Inc., Holding Company of Google LLC, Corporate Parent Alphabet Inc., Holding Company of XXVI Holdings Inc for Google Inc.. (Agre, Lyn) (Filed on 5/9/2019)
May 9, 2019 Filing 21 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Google Inc... (Agre, Lyn) (Filed on 5/9/2019)
May 9, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Lyn Robyn Agre (Agre, Lyn) (Filed on 5/9/2019)
April 25, 2019 Filing 19 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs/Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 5/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2019)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE AND ORDER: The attached notice and order notifies the plaintiff of resources available, attaches the district's handbook for litigants who do not have a lawyer, includes a flyer for contacting the court's help desk and instructs the plaintiff about serving the defendants. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 04/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service, #2 Self Help Flyer, #3 Pro Se Handbook)(ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2019)
April 25, 2019 Filing 17 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/18/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/25/2019 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2019)
April 25, 2019 Filing 16 Case transferred in from District of Texas Eastern; Case Number 1:18-cv-00037. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #11 Motion to Change Venue; terminating #11 Motion to Dismiss pursuant to written order #15 .Signed by Magistrate Judge Keith F. Giblin on 3/25/2019. (kfg1, )
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Change Venue. The Clerk is ordered to transfer this civil action and all other relevant filings and pending motions to the United States District Court for the District of Northern California. All other pending motions are denied as moot, without prejudice to reassert in the transferee district. Signed by Magistrate Judge Keith F. Giblin on 2/22/2019. (bjc, )
June 18, 2018 Filing 14 RESPONSE to #11 MOTION to Change Venue Or MOTION to Dismiss The Complaint And Memorandum Of Law In Support Thereof filed by Paul Joseph Sayre. (mrp, )
June 12, 2018 Filing 13 REPLY to Response to Motion re #11 MOTION to Change Venue Or MOTION to Dismiss The Complaint And Memorandum Of Law In Support Thereof filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(Pamphilis, Constantine)
June 5, 2018 Filing 12 RESPONSE to #11 MOTION to Change Venue or to Dismiss The Complaint filed by Paul Joseph Sayre. (mrp, )
May 24, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION to Change Venue Or, MOTION to Dismiss The Complaint And Memorandum Of Law In Support Thereof by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Pamphilis, Constantine)
April 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time. Ordered that Defendant's deadline to file an answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint is extended to May 24, 2018, as requested. Signed by Magistrate Judge Keith F. Giblin on 4/30/2018. (bjc)
April 24, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Hector J. Torres on behalf of Google, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-6751260. (Torres, Hector)
April 23, 2018 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Google, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Alphabet Inc., Other Affiliate XXVI Holdings, Inc. for Google, Inc.. (Pamphilis, Constantine)
April 23, 2018 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint / Defendants Unopposed Motion To Extend Time To Respond To Plaintiffs Complaint And Motion For Expedited Consideration And Brief In Support by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Pamphilis, Constantine)
April 3, 2018 Filing 6 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by Paul Joseph Sayre on 3/28/18 of #4 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis,. (mrp, )
April 3, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued as to Google, Inc. and given to USM for service. (mrp, )
March 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis and Directing Service of Process. It is ordered that the Clerk of Court shall issue blank summons to the Plaintiff and he shall prepare summons and return them to the Clerk within 15 days of receipt. Signed by Magistrate Judge Keith F. Giblin on 3/23/18. (mrp, )
January 26, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment sent by US Mail to pro se plaintiff (aam, )
January 26, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Paul Joseph Sayre. (aam, )
January 26, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Keith F. Giblin pursuant to GO 05-07 (aam, )
January 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Google, Inc., filed by Paul Joseph Sayre. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Clerk Notes)(aam, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sayre v. Google, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Joseph Sayre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google Inc.
Represented By: Hector J. Torres
Represented By: Constantine Z Pamphilis
Represented By: Lyn Robyn Agre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?