Winet Labs LLC v. Apple Inc
Plaintiff: Winet Labs LLC
Defendant: Apple Inc
Case Number: 3:2019cv02248
Filed: April 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:1126
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING INITIAL CASE MMANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Due to the Court's unavailability, the initial case management set for 7/25/2019 is continued to 8/1/2019 at 1:30 p.m. in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. The joint case management conference shall be filed by 7/25/2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2019)
May 29, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Winet Labs LLC. Service waived by Apple Inc waiver sent on 5/24/2019, answer due 7/23/2019. (Atkins, Todd) (Filed on 5/29/2019)
May 29, 2019 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Winet Labs LLC.. (Atkins, Todd) (Filed on 5/29/2019)
May 17, 2019 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 5/31/2019. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2019)
May 1, 2019 Filing 7 REPORT on the filing of an action regarding Patent infringement (cc: form mailed to register). (Atkins, Todd) (Filed on 5/1/2019)
April 26, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Apple Inc. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2019)
April 26, 2019 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/18/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/25/2019 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2019)
April 25, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/9/2019. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2019)
April 25, 2019 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Winet Labs LLC identifying Other Affiliate Dynamic IP Deals LLC for Winet Labs LLC. (Atkins, Todd) (Filed on 4/25/2019)
April 25, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Atkins, Todd) (Filed on 4/25/2019)
April 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Apple Inc (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13290405). Filed by Winet Labs LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Atkins, Todd) (Filed on 4/25/2019) Modified on 4/26/2019 (slhS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Winet Labs LLC v. Apple Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Winet Labs LLC
Represented By: Todd Christopher Atkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?