Uberti v. Sonoma County Board of Supervisors et al
Plaintiff: George Uberti
Defendant: Sonoma County Auditor-Controller-Treasurer-Tax Collector and Sonoma County Board of Supervisors
Case Number: 3:2019cv02338
Filed: April 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: False Claims Act
Cause of Action: 31:3729
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2019 Filing 14 Receipt from Superior Court of CA County of Sonoma. (amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2019)
June 12, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #11 Order: The deputy clerk hereby certifies that on 6/12/2019, a copy of this order was served by sending it via first-class mail to the address of each non-CM/ECF user listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing.This is a text only docket entry. There is no document associated with this entry. (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2019)
June 10, 2019 Filing 12 Remark: Case remanded to Sonoma County Superior Court (amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2019)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REMANDING ACTION TO SONOMA COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT [re #6 Terminate Hearings,, Report and Recommendations,, Terminate Motions, #10 Objection filed by George Uberti]. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 6/10/2019. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2019)
May 22, 2019 Filing 10 OBJECTIONS to re #6 Terminate Hearings,, Report and Recommendations,, Terminate Motions, by George Uberti. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service, #3 Envelope)(amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2019)
May 17, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Permission for Electronic Case Filing filed by George Uberti. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Envelope)(amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2019)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER, Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge William Alsup for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by The Clerk on 5/10/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2019)
May 9, 2019 Filing 7 ASSOCIATION of Counsel by Sonoma County Auditor-Controller-Treasurer-Tax Collector, Sonoma County Board of Supervisors. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Myers, Joshua) (Filed on 5/9/2019)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT AND REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION FOR REMAND re #1 Notice of Removal filed by George Uberti. The #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is granted. The #3 MOTION for Permission for Electronic Case Filing is denied without prejudice. Objections due by 5/23/2019.Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 5/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2019)
May 7, 2019 Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge filed by George Uberti. (Attachments: #(1) Envelope) (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2019)
April 29, 2019 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Joint Case Management Statement due by 7/22/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/29/2019 at 1:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2019)
April 29, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Permission for Electronic Case Filing filed by George Uberti. (Attachments: #(1) [Proposed] Order) (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2019)
April 29, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by George Uberti. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2019)
April 29, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Sonoma County Superior Court. Their Case Number is SCV-263917, (Filing Fee: Ifpp Entered on 4/29/2019). Filed by George Uberti. Consent/Declination due by 5/13/2019. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit A, #(2) Exhibit B, #(3) Civil Cover Sheet, #(4) Envelope) (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Uberti v. Sonoma County Board of Supervisors et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sonoma County Auditor-Controller-Treasurer-Tax Collector
Represented By: Joshua A Myers
Represented By: Bruce David Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sonoma County Board of Supervisors
Represented By: Joshua A Myers
Represented By: Bruce David Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Uberti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?