Casillas et al v. Apple, Inc.
Plaintiff: Joseph Casillas and De'Jhontai Banks
Defendant: Apple, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv02455
Filed: May 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jon S Tigar
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 15:2301
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND TO EXTENDDEFENDANT APPLE INC.'S TIME TO RESPOND TO AMENDEDCOMPLAINT by Judge Jon S. Tigar. Amended Complaint due by 7/26/2019. Response to Amended Complaint due by 8/26/2019. Replies due by 10/14/2019. Responses due by 9/23/2019.(mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2019)
June 28, 2019 Filing 27 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER Granting Plaintiffs' Leave to File First Amended Complaint and to Extend Defendant Apple Inc.'s Time to Respond to Amended Complaint filed by Apple, Inc.. (Amezcua, Alexandria) (Filed on 6/28/2019)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #24 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Matthew Lanahan. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2019)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #23 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Andrea R. Gold. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2019)
June 20, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice, (Filing Fee: $310.00, receipt number 0971-13454425) filed by De'Jhontai Banks, Joseph Casillas. (Lanahan, Matthew) (Filed on 6/20/2019)
June 20, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice, (Filing Fee: $310.00, receipt number 0971-13454351) filed by De'Jhontai Banks, Joseph Casillas. (Gold, Andrea) (Filed on 6/20/2019)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #20 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Adam A. Edwards. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2019)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #19 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Gregory F. Coleman. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2019)
June 18, 2019 Filing 20 First MOTION for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice Adam A. Edwards, (Filing Fee: $310.00, receipt number 0971-13445528) filed by De'Jhontai Banks, Joseph Casillas. (Attachments: #(1) Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Good Standing)(Edwards, Adam) (Filed on 6/18/2019)
June 18, 2019 Filing 19 First MOTION for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice Gregory F. Coleman, (Filing Fee: $310.00, receipt number 0971-13445525) filed by De'Jhontai Banks, Joseph Casillas. (Attachments: #(1) Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Good Standing)(Coleman, Gregory) (Filed on 6/18/2019)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #17 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Jeffrey H. Glaspie. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 17 First MOTION for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice Jeffrey H. Glaspie, (Filing Fee: $310.00, receipt number 0971-13436921) filed by De'Jhontai Banks, Joseph Casillas. (Attachments: #(1) Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Good Standing)(Glaspie, Jeffrey) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
May 31, 2019 Filing 16 STIPULATION to Extend Defendant Apple Inc.'s Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Apple, Inc.. (Amezcua, Alexandria) (Filed on 5/31/2019)
May 31, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Leonard Robinson (Robinson, Christopher) (Filed on 5/31/2019)
May 31, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexandria Armida Amezcua (Amezcua, Alexandria) (Filed on 5/31/2019)
May 28, 2019 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Initiating Documents served on Apple Inc. on 05/10/2019, filed by De'Jhontai Banks, Joseph Casillas. (Zavareei, Hassan) (Filed on 5/28/2019)
May 22, 2019 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due 8/7/2019 by 5:00 PM. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/14/2019 2:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 09, 19th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Standing Order) (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2019)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jon S. Tigar for all further proceedings. Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 05/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2019)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 5/21/19. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2019)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER, Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by The Clerk on 5/21/19. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2019)
May 20, 2019 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2019)
May 20, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by De'Jhontai Banks, Joseph Casillas.. (Zavareei, Hassan) (Filed on 5/20/2019)
May 9, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Apple, Inc.. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2019)
May 9, 2019 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/2/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/9/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2019)
May 7, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/21/2019. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2019)
May 7, 2019 Filing 3 AMENDED Civil Cover Sheet by De'Jhontai Banks, Joseph Casillas (Zavareei, Hassan) (Filed on 5/7/2019) Modified on 5/9/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
May 6, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Zavareei, Hassan) (Filed on 5/6/2019)
May 6, 2019 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT; Demand for Jury Trial against Apple, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number 0971-13322838.). Filed by Joseph Casillas, De'Jhontai Banks. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Zavareei, Hassan) (Filed on 5/6/2019) Modified on 5/9/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Casillas et al v. Apple, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple, Inc.
Represented By: Alexandria Armida Amezcua
Represented By: Christopher Leonard Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Casillas
Represented By: Hassan Ali Zavareei
Represented By: Matthew David Schelkopf
Represented By: Adam A. Edwards
Represented By: Nick Suciu, III
Represented By: Jeffrey Glaspie
Represented By: Joseph Bryce Kenney
Represented By: Andrea R. Gold
Represented By: Annick Marie Persinger
Represented By: Joseph G. Sauder
Represented By: Gregory F. Coleman
Represented By: Matthew William Lanahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: De'Jhontai Banks
Represented By: Hassan Ali Zavareei
Represented By: Matthew David Schelkopf
Represented By: Adam A. Edwards
Represented By: Nick Suciu, III
Represented By: Jeffrey Glaspie
Represented By: Joseph Bryce Kenney
Represented By: Andrea R. Gold
Represented By: Annick Marie Persinger
Represented By: Joseph G. Sauder
Represented By: Gregory F. Coleman
Represented By: Matthew William Lanahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?