TD Ameritrade, Inc. v. El Capitan Limited Corporation

Petitioner: TD Ameritrade, Inc.
Respondent: El Capitan Limited Corporation
Case Number: 3:2019cv02493
Filed: May 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Joseph C Spero
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2019 Filing 13 Clerk's Notice ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to defendant El Capitan Limited Corporation on June 25, 2019. (Related documents(s) #12 ) (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2019)
June 21, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Entry of Default of Defendant El Capitan Limited Corporation filed by TD Ameritrade, Inc.. (Schaefer, Austin) (Filed on 6/21/2019) Modified on 6/25/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
June 19, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Austin Dow Schaefer (Schaefer, Austin) (Filed on 6/19/2019)
June 11, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by TD Ameritrade, Inc. re #6 Summons Issued, 3 Case Assigned by Intake,,, #4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines, #1 Petition, (Turner, William) (Filed on 6/11/2019)
June 11, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by TD Ameritrade, Inc. re #6 Summons Issued, 3 Case Assigned by Intake,,, #4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines, #1 Petition, (Turner, William) (Filed on 6/11/2019)
May 30, 2019 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by TD Ameritrade, Inc... (Turner, William) (Filed on 5/30/2019)
May 28, 2019 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 6/11/2019. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2019)
May 14, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to El Capitan Limited Corporation. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2019)
May 14, 2019 Filing 5 Proposed Summons. (Turner, William) (Filed on 5/14/2019)
May 10, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Re: #2 Proposed Summons filed by TD Ameritrade, Inc. The Court will not issue multiple summons for the same party with different addresses. Please submit one proposed summons for issuance. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Please re-file in its entirety. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2019)
May 9, 2019 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/2/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/9/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2019)
May 8, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/22/2019. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2019)
May 8, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Turner, William) (Filed on 5/8/2019)
May 8, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION to Confirm Arbitration Award and Incorporated Memorandum of Law against El Capitan Limited Corporation (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number 0971-13330089). Filed by TD Ameritrade, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Turner, William) (Filed on 5/8/2019) Modified on 5/9/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TD Ameritrade, Inc. v. El Capitan Limited Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: El Capitan Limited Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: TD Ameritrade, Inc.
Represented By: William Marlin Turner
Represented By: Austin Dow Schaefer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?