State of California by and through Attorney General Xavier Becerra et al v. Azar
Plaintiff: Commonwealth of Massachusetts, State of Connecticut, State of California by and through Attorney General Xavier Becerra, Kate Brown, State of Washington and State of Oregon
Defendant: Alex M. Azar, II, Eric Wright, Bettina Joyner, Jennifer Mendivil, Elesha Martin, Marck Juvonen, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, Linda Murphy, Elnaz Toussi, Michaela Bruckshaw, Sandra Sumner and Richard Velador
Intervenor Plaintiff: Service Employees International Union Local 503, Kay Wright, Ed Solseng, Debra Howze, Rebecca Sandoval, Camille Christian, Eleni Syrpis, Lesley Forsythe, Sherleen Bright, United Domestic Workers AFSCME Local 3930 and Virginia Grant
Case Number: 3:2019cv02552
Filed: May 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Referring Judge: Thomas S Hixson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2019 Filing 65 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #53 MOTION to Intervene ) filed byCommonwealth of Massachusetts, Kate Brown, State of California by and through Attorney General Xavier Becerra, State of Connecticut, State of Oregon, State of Washington. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Declaration, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2)(Rich, Anna) (Filed on 7/11/2019)
July 11, 2019 Filing 64 Proposed Order re #63 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION for Leave to File Declarations re #53 MOTION to Intervene by Michaela Bruckshaw, et al. by Sherleen Bright, Camille Christian, Lesley Forsythe, Virginia Grant, Debra Howze, Rebecca Sandoval, Service Employees International Union Local 503, Ed Solseng, Eleni Syrpis, United Domestic Workers AFSCME Local 3930, Kay Wright. (Leyton, Stacey) (Filed on 7/11/2019)
July 11, 2019 Filing 63 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION for Leave to File Declarations re #53 MOTION to Intervene by Michaela Bruckshaw, et al. filed by Sherleen Bright, Camille Christian, Lesley Forsythe, Virginia Grant, Debra Howze, Rebecca Sandoval, Service Employees International Union Local 503, Ed Solseng, Eleni Syrpis, United Domestic Workers AFSCME Local 3930, Kay Wright. Responses due by 7/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Melissa Unger, #2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Melissa Unger, #3 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Melissa Unger, #4 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Melissa Unger, #5 Exhibit 4 to Declaration of Melissa Unger, #6 Exhibit 5 to Declaration of Melissa Unger, #7 Exhibit 6 to Declaration of Melissa Unger, #8 Exhibit 7 to Declaration of Melissa Unger, #9 Exhibit 8 to Declaration of Melissa Unger, #10 Exhibit 9 to Declaration of Melissa Unger, #11 Exhibit 10 to Declaration of Melissa Unger, #12 Exhibit 11 to Declaration of Melissa Unger, #13 Exhibit 12 to Declaration of Melissa Unger, #14 Exhibit 13 to Declaration of Melissa Unger, #15 Exhibit 14 to Declaration of Melissa Unger, #16 Declaration of Adam Glickman, #17 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Adam Glickman, #18 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Adam Glickman, #19 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Adam Glickman, #20 Exhibit 4 to Declaration of Adam Glickman)(Leyton, Stacey) (Filed on 7/11/2019)
July 11, 2019 Filing 62 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #53 MOTION to Intervene ) filed byAlex M. Azar, II, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services. (Kaiser, Sophie) (Filed on 7/11/2019)
July 5, 2019 Reset Deadlines as to #53 MOTION to Intervene . Responses due by 7/11/2019. Replies due by 7/18/2019. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2019)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 61 Order by Judge Vince Chhabria granting #60 Stipulation Extending Response Deadline.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2019)
July 1, 2019 Filing 60 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #53 MOTION to Intervene STIPULATED REQUEST FOR ORDER EXTENDING RESPONSE DEADLINE; [PROPOSED] ORDER filed by State of California by and through Attorney General Xavier Becerra. (Rich, Anna) (Filed on 7/1/2019)
June 25, 2019 Filing 59 CLERK'S NOTICE RESCHEDULING THE HEARING FROM 7/18/2019 TO 8/1/2019 RE #8 SEIU's MOTION to Intervene . Motion Hearing set for 8/1/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor before Judge Vince Chhabria. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2019)
June 25, 2019 Reset Hearing as to #53 MOTION to Intervene , per "re-notice" of hearing filed by Bruckshaw, et al. Motion Hearing set for 8/1/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor before Judge Vince Chhabria. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2019)
June 24, 2019 Filing 58 Renotice motion hearing re #53 MOTION to Intervene filed byMichaela Bruckshaw, Bettina Joyner, Marck Juvonen, Elesha Martin, Jennifer Mendivil, Linda Murphy, Sandra Sumner, Elnaz Toussi, Richard Velador, Eric Wright. (Related document(s) #53 ) (Millard, Rebekah) (Filed on 6/24/2019)
June 24, 2019 Set Hearing as to #8 SEUI's MOTION to Intervene , per "re-notice" of motion hearing at dkt. no. #57 . Motion Hearing set for 7/18/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor before Judge Vince Chhabria. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2019)
June 21, 2019 Filing 57 Renotice motion hearing re #8 MOTION to Intervene filed bySherleen Bright, Camille Christian, Lesley Forsythe, Virginia Grant, Debra Howze, Rebecca Sandoval, Service Employees International Union Local 503, Ed Solseng, Eleni Syrpis, United Domestic Workers AFSCME Local 3930, Kay Wright. (Related document(s) #8 ) (Pitts, Patrick) (Filed on 6/21/2019)
June 21, 2019 Filing 56 ERRONEOUSLY E-FILED, DISREGARD - SEE DOC #57 NOTICE by Sherleen Bright, Camille Christian, Lesley Forsythe, Virginia Grant, Debra Howze, Rebecca Sandoval, Service Employees International Union Local 503, Ed Solseng, Eleni Syrpis, United Domestic Workers AFSCME Local 3930, Kay Wright re #8 MOTION to Intervene , #36 Reply to Opposition/Response, #15 Declaration in Support,, #16 Declaration in Support, (Pitts, Patrick) (Filed on 6/21/2019) Modified on 6/25/2019 (fabS, COURT STAFF).
June 21, 2019 Filing 55 REASSIGNED CASE - NOTICE OF NEW HEARING DATE: You are notified that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference before Judge Vince Chhabria upon reassignment. For a copy of Judge Chhabria's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov. All pending motions will be taken off the previously assigned judge's calendar and must be re-noticed by the moving party for a new hearing according to Judge Chhabria's available dates, which are listed on his webpage under the section "Scheduling Notes." The new hearing date must be at least five weeks from the date the motion was filed and at least three weeks from the date the re-notice is filed. The due date for any opposition or reply papers not yet filed shall be calculated in accordance with Civil Local Rule 7-3. Case Management Statement due by 8/14/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/21/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2019)
June 20, 2019 Filing 54 Case reassigned to Judge Vince Chhabria per related case order. Judge William Alsup no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2019)
June 20, 2019 Filing 53 MOTION to Intervene filed by Michaela Bruckshaw, Bettina Joyner, Marck Juvonen, Elesha Martin, Jennifer Mendivil, Elnaz Toussi, Richard Velador, Eric Wright, Sandra Sumner, Linda Murphy. Motion Hearing set for 7/25/2019 08:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor before Judge William Alsup. Responses due by 7/5/2019. Replies due by 7/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Declaration, #3 Declaration, #4 Declaration, #5 Declaration, #6 Declaration, #7 Declaration, #8 Declaration, #9 Declaration, #10 Declaration, #11 Declaration, #12 Proposed Order)(Millard, Rebekah) (Filed on 6/20/2019)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER RELATING CASES 19-cv-00426-VC, Aliser v. SEIU California, and 19-cv-02552-WHA, California v. Azar. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 6/20/2019. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2019)
June 20, 2019 Filing 51 Refund Status re #50 Application for Refund APPROVED. (rghS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 50 Application for Refund, Receipt Number 0971-13398910 by Service Employees International Union Local 503. (Gerni, Renee) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 13, 2019 Filing 49 Refund Status re #44 Application for Refund DECLINED. (rghS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2019)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER by Judge William Alsup granting #45 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to attorney J. Paul DesJardien. (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2019)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER by Judge William Alsup granting #43 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Margaret Q. Chapple. (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2019)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER by Judge William Alsup granting #42 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Fernando Colon. (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2019)
June 12, 2019 Filing 45 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13429440.) filed by State of Washington. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(DesJardien, John) (Filed on 6/12/2019)
June 11, 2019 Filing 44 Application for Refund, Receipt Number 0971-13398910 by Service Employees International Union Local 503. (Gerni, Renee) (Filed on 6/11/2019)
June 10, 2019 Filing 43 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13406183.) Filing fee previously paid on 6/4/2019 filed by State of Connecticut. (Chapple, Margaret) (Filed on 6/10/2019)
June 7, 2019 Filing 42 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13419056.) filed by United Domestic Workers AFSCME Local 3930. (Colon, Fernando) (Filed on 6/7/2019)
June 7, 2019 Filing 41 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING MOTION HEARING: Motion Hearing re #8 MOTION to Intervene previously set for 6/20/2019 08:00 AM is rescheduled to 7/3/2019 08:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor before Judge William Alsup. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2019)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER by Judge William Alsup granting #35 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Cynthia Mark. (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2019)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER by Judge William Alsup granting #34 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Judith Rivlin. (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2019)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER by Judge William Alsup granting #33 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Renee Gerni. (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2019)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER by Judge William Alsup granting #32 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Alicia O. Young. (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2019)
June 5, 2019 Filing 36 REPLY (re #8 MOTION to Intervene ) filed by Sherleen Bright, Camille Christian, Lesley Forsythe, Virginia Grant, Debra Howze, Rebecca Sandoval, Service Employees International Union Local 503, Ed Solseng, United Domestic Workers AFSCME Local 3930, Kay Wright. (Leyton, Stacey) (Filed on 6/5/2019) Modified on 6/6/2019 (amgS, COURT STAFF).
June 5, 2019 Filing 35 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13391771.) Filing fee previously paid on 5/30/2019 filed by Commonwealth of Massachusetts. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit #1 (Certificate of Good Standing))(Mark, Cynthia) (Filed on 6/5/2019)
June 5, 2019 Filing 34 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13400774.) Filing fee previously paid on 6/3/19 filed by United Domestic Workers AFSCME Local 3930. (Rivlin, Judith) (Filed on 6/5/2019)
June 5, 2019 Filing 33 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13398939.) Filing fee previously paid on 5/31/19 filed by Service Employees International Union Local 503. (Gerni, Renee) (Filed on 6/5/2019)
June 5, 2019 Filing 32 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13389586.) Filing fee previously paid on 5/29/19 filed by State of Washington. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Young, Alicia) (Filed on 6/5/2019)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER by Judge William Alsup denying #26 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Margaret Q. Chapple. (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2019)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER by Judge William Alsup denying #25 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Judith Rivlin. (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2019)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER by Judge William Alsup denying #24 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Renee Gerni. (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2019)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER by Judge William Alsup denying #22 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Cynthia Mark. (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2019)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER by Judge William Alsup denying #21 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Alicia O. Young. (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2019)
June 4, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13406183.) filed by State of Connecticut. (Chapple, Margaret) (Filed on 6/4/2019)
June 3, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13400774.) filed by United Domestic Workers AFSCME Local 3930. (Rivlin, Judith) (Filed on 6/3/2019)
May 31, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13398939.) filed by Service Employees International Union Local 503. (Gerni, Renee) (Filed on 5/31/2019)
May 30, 2019 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by State of California by and through Attorney General Xavier Becerra re #1 Complaint, COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF (Rich, Anna) (Filed on 5/30/2019)
May 30, 2019 Filing 22 First MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice , First MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13391771.) filed by Commonwealth of Massachusetts. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit #1 (Certificate of Good Standing))(Mark, Cynthia) (Filed on 5/30/2019)
May 29, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13389586.) filed by State of Washington. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Young, Alicia) (Filed on 5/29/2019)
May 29, 2019 Filing 20 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #8 MOTION to Intervene ) filed byAlex M. Azar, II, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services. (Kaiser, Sophie) (Filed on 5/29/2019)
May 29, 2019 Filing 19 RESPONSE (re #8 MOTION to Intervene ) STATEMENT OF NONOPPOSITION filed by State of California by and through Attorney General Xavier Becerra. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service POS)(Rich, Anna) (Filed on 5/29/2019) Modified on 5/29/2019 (amgS, COURT STAFF).
May 29, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Sophie Kaiser on behalf of Defendants Alex M. Azar II and U.S. Department of Health and Human Services (Kaiser, Sophie) (Filed on 5/29/2019)
May 24, 2019 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sherleen Bright, Camille Christian, Lesley Forsythe, Virginia Grant, Debra Howze, Rebecca Sandoval, Service Employees International Union Local 503, Ed Solseng, Eleni Syrpis, United Domestic Workers AFSCME Local 3930, Kay Wright re #15 Declaration in Support,, #16 Declaration in Support, (Leyton, Stacey) (Filed on 5/24/2019)
May 24, 2019 Filing 16 Declaration of Melissa Unger CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 8-9 filed bySherleen Bright, Camille Christian, Lesley Forsythe, Virginia Grant, Debra Howze, Rebecca Sandoval, Service Employees International Union Local 503, Ed Solseng, Eleni Syrpis, United Domestic Workers AFSCME Local 3930, Kay Wright. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Leyton, Stacey) (Filed on 5/24/2019)
May 24, 2019 Filing 15 Declaration of Stefanie Wilson CORRECTION OF DOCKET #8-13 TO #8-30 filed bySherleen Bright, Camille Christian, Lesley Forsythe, Virginia Grant, Debra Howze, Rebecca Sandoval, Service Employees International Union Local 503, Ed Solseng, Eleni Syrpis, United Domestic Workers AFSCME Local 3930, Kay Wright. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16)(Leyton, Stacey) (Filed on 5/24/2019)
May 22, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Teague Pryde Paterson (Paterson, Teague) (Filed on 5/22/2019)
May 21, 2019 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to Alex M. Azar, II. (amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2019)
May 21, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Stefanie Lorraine Wilson on behalf of proposed Plaintiff-Intervenors SEIU Local 503, United Domestic Workers AFSCME Local 3930, Sherleen Bright, Camille Christian, Lesley Forsythe, Virginia Grant, Debra Howze, Rebecca Sandoval, Ed Solseng, Eleni Syrpis, and Kay Wright (Wilson, Stefanie) (Filed on 5/21/2019)
May 21, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick Casey Pitts on behalf of proposed Plaintiff-Intervenors SEIU Local 503, United Domestic Workers AFSCME Local 3930, Sherleen Bright, Camille Christian, Lesley Forsythe, Virginia Grant, Debra Howze, Rebecca Sandoval, Ed Solseng, Eleni Syrpis, and Kay Wright (Pitts, Patrick) (Filed on 5/21/2019)
May 17, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sherleen Bright, Camille Christian, Lesley Forsythe, Virginia Grant, Debra Howze, Rebecca Sandoval, Service Employees International Union Local 503, Ed Solseng, Eleni Syrpis, United Domestic Workers AFSCME Local 3930, Kay Wright re #8 MOTION to Intervene (Leyton, Stacey) (Filed on 5/17/2019)
May 16, 2019 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE SCHEDULING CMC ON REASSIGNMENT: Case Management Statement due by 8/15/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/22/2019 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor. Standing orders can be downloaded from the Court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/whaorders. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2019)
May 15, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Intervene filed by United Domestic Workers AFSCME Local 3930, Sherleen Bright, Camille Christian, Lesley Forsythe, Virginia Grant, Debra Howze, Rebecca Sandoval, Ed Solseng, Eleni Syrpis, Kay Wright, Service Employees International Union Local 503. Motion Hearing set for 6/20/2019 08:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor before Judge William Alsup. Responses due by 5/29/2019. Replies due by 6/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint-In-Intervention By Service Employees International Union Local 503, United Domestic Workers AFSCME Local 3930, Sherleen Bright, Camille Christian, Lesley Forsythe, Virginia Grant, Debra Howze, Rebecca Sandoval, Ed Solseng, Eleni Syrpis, and Kay Wright, #2 Declaration of Camille Christian in Support of Motion to Intervene, #3 Declaration of Debra Howze in Support of Motion to Intervene, #4 Declaration of Ed Solseng in Support of Motion to Intervene, #5 Declaration of Eleni Syrpis in Support of Motion to Intervene, #6 Declaration of Kay Wright in Support of Motion to Intervene, #7 Declaration of Lesley Forsythe in Support of Motion to Intervene, #8 Declaration of Matthew Maldonado in Support of Motion to Intervene, #9 *** ERROR IN FILING. SEE CORRECTION AT #16 *** Declaration of Melissa Unger in Support of Motion to Intervene, #10 Declaration of Rebecca Sandoval in Support of Motion to Intervene, #11 Declaration of Sherleen Bright in Support of Motion to Intervene, #12 Declaration of Virginia Grant in Support of Motion to Intervene, #13 *** ERROR IN FILING. SEE CORRECTION AT #15 *** Declaration of Stefanie Wilson in Support of Motion to Intervene, #14 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Stefanie Wilson, #15 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Stefanie Wilson, #16 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Stefanie Wilson, #17 Exhibit 4 to Declaration of Stefanie Wilson, #18 Exhibit 5 to Declaration of Stefanie Wilson, #19 Exhibit 6 to Declaration of Stefanie Wilson, #20 Exhibit 7 to Declaration of Stefanie Wilson, #21 Exhibit 8 to Declaration of Stefanie Wilson, #22 Exhibit 9 to Declaration of Stefanie Wilson, #23 Exhibit 10 to Declaration of Stefanie Wilson, #24 Exhibit 11 to Declaration of Stefanie Wilson, #25 Exhibit 12 to Declaration of Stefanie Wilson, #26 Exhibit 13 to Declaration of Stefanie Wilson, #27 Exhibit 14 to Declaration of Stefanie Wilson, #28 Exhibit 15 to Declaration of Stefanie Wilson, #29 Exhibit 16 to Declaration of Stefanie Wilson, #30 Exhibit 17 to Declaration of Stefanie Wilson, #31 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Intervene)(Leyton, Stacey) (Filed on 5/15/2019) Modified on 5/24/2019 (amgS, COURT STAFF).
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER, Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge William Alsup for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by The Clerk on 5/14/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2019)
May 13, 2019 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2019)
May 13, 2019 Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by State of California by and through Attorney General Xavier Becerra.. (Rich, Anna) (Filed on 5/13/2019)
May 13, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/28/2019. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2019)
May 13, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by State of California by and through Attorney General Xavier Becerra re #1 Complaint, (Rich, Anna) (Filed on 5/13/2019)
May 13, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Rich, Anna) (Filed on 5/13/2019)
May 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against Alex M. Azar, II ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13341617.). Filed byState of California by and through Attorney General Xavier Becerra. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rich, Anna) (Filed on 5/13/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State of California by and through Attorney General Xavier Becerra et al v. Azar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex M. Azar, II
Represented By: Sophie Kaiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Wright
Represented By: Rebekah Millard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bettina Joyner
Represented By: Rebekah Millard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Mendivil
Represented By: Rebekah Millard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elesha Martin
Represented By: Rebekah Millard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marck Juvonen
Represented By: Rebekah Millard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Health and Human Services
Represented By: Sophie Kaiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Murphy
Represented By: Rebekah Millard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elnaz Toussi
Represented By: Rebekah Millard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michaela Bruckshaw
Represented By: Rebekah Millard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra Sumner
Represented By: Rebekah Millard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Velador
Represented By: Rebekah Millard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Commonwealth of Massachusetts
Represented By: Cynthia Mark
Represented By: Maura Healey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Connecticut
Represented By: William Tong
Represented By: Margaret Q Chapple
Represented By: Margaret Chapple
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of California by and through Attorney General Xavier Becerra
Represented By: Anna Margaret Rich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kate Brown
Represented By: Jeanne Nicole DeFever
Represented By: Ellen F Rosenblum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Washington
Represented By: J Paul DesJardien
Represented By: Alicia Young
Represented By: Alicia O Young
Represented By: John Paul DesJardien
Represented By: Robert W Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Oregon
Represented By: Jeanne Nicole DeFever
Represented By: Ellen F Rosenblum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Service Employees International Union Local 503
Represented By: Renee M Gerni
Represented By: Stacey M. Leyton
Represented By: Stefanie Lorraine Wilson
Represented By: Patrick Casey Pitts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Kay Wright
Represented By: Stacey M. Leyton
Represented By: Stefanie Lorraine Wilson
Represented By: Patrick Casey Pitts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Ed Solseng
Represented By: Stacey M. Leyton
Represented By: Stefanie Lorraine Wilson
Represented By: Patrick Casey Pitts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Debra Howze
Represented By: Stacey M. Leyton
Represented By: Stefanie Lorraine Wilson
Represented By: Patrick Casey Pitts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Rebecca Sandoval
Represented By: Stacey M. Leyton
Represented By: Stefanie Lorraine Wilson
Represented By: Patrick Casey Pitts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Camille Christian
Represented By: Stacey M. Leyton
Represented By: Stefanie Lorraine Wilson
Represented By: Patrick Casey Pitts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Eleni Syrpis
Represented By: Stacey M. Leyton
Represented By: Stefanie Lorraine Wilson
Represented By: Patrick Casey Pitts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Lesley Forsythe
Represented By: Stacey M. Leyton
Represented By: Stefanie Lorraine Wilson
Represented By: Patrick Casey Pitts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Sherleen Bright
Represented By: Stacey M. Leyton
Represented By: Stefanie Lorraine Wilson
Represented By: Patrick Casey Pitts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: United Domestic Workers AFSCME Local 3930
Represented By: Judith E Rivlin
Represented By: Teague Pryde Paterson
Represented By: Stacey M. Leyton
Represented By: Fernando R Colon
Represented By: Stefanie Lorraine Wilson
Represented By: Patrick Casey Pitts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Virginia Grant
Represented By: Stacey M. Leyton
Represented By: Stefanie Lorraine Wilson
Represented By: Patrick Casey Pitts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?