Levensohn Vineyards, LLC v. Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Levensohn Vineyards, LLC
Defendant: Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv02611
Filed: May 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: William H Orrick
Referring Judge: Donna M Ryu
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Levensohn Vineyards, LLC re #10 Case Management Scheduling Order, (Blue, Gregory) (Filed on 6/11/2019)
June 10, 2019 Filing 12 Certificate of Interested Entities by Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company for Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company. re #11 Answer to Complaint (Pardini, Julian) (Filed on 6/10/2019)
June 10, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand; by Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company. (Pardini, Julian) (Filed on 6/10/2019) Modified on 6/11/2019 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER - Case Management Conference set for 9/10/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 9/3/2019. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 06/10/2019. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2019)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge William H. Orrick for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 05/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2019)
May 29, 2019 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2019)
May 28, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company.. (Liberatore, Stephen) (Filed on 5/28/2019)
May 28, 2019 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Levensohn Vineyards, LLC.. (Blue, Gregory) (Filed on 5/28/2019)
May 14, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2019)
May 14, 2019 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/14/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/21/2019 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2019)
May 14, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/28/2019. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2019)
May 14, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Blue, Gregory) (Filed on 5/14/2019)
May 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13346888.). Filed by Levensohn Vineyards, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Blue, Gregory) (Filed on 5/14/2019) Modified on 5/14/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Levensohn Vineyards, LLC v. Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company
Represented By: Julian John Pardini
Represented By: Stephen James Liberatore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Levensohn Vineyards, LLC
Represented By: Gregory A Blue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?