Side, Inc. v. Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America
Plaintiff: Side, Inc., a Delaware corporation and Side, Inc.
Defendant: Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America
Case Number: 3:2019cv02661
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: James Donato
Referring Judge: Joseph C Spero
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER. The initial case management conference scheduled for August 22, 2019, is continued to September 5, 2019, at 10:00 a.m. A joint case management statement is due by August 29, 2019. Signed by Judge James Donato on 6/28/2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2019)
June 25, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation To Continue Case Management Conference Date (Proposed) Order Thereon filed by Side, Inc.. (Wopschall, Allison) (Filed on 6/25/2019)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/22/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 8/15/2019. Signed by Judge James Donato on 5/30/19. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2019)
May 30, 2019 Filing 9 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Side, Inc.. (Wopschall, Allison) (Filed on 5/30/2019)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER, Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge James Donato for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by The Clerk on 5/29/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2019)
May 29, 2019 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2019)
May 28, 2019 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America.. (Murphy, Edward) (Filed on 5/28/2019)
May 20, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America re #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Certificate of Interested Entities, (Murphy, Edward) (Filed on 5/20/2019)
May 17, 2019 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/9/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/16/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2019)
May 16, 2019 Answer to Removed Complaint (See Doc No. #1 -1) by Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2019)
May 16, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/30/2019. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2019)
May 16, 2019 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America identifying Corporate Parent Travelers Casualty and Surety Company, Travelers Insurance Group Holdings, Inc., Travelers Property Casualty Corp., The Travelers Companies, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, (Murphy, Edward) (Filed on 5/16/2019) Modified on 5/17/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Francisco County Superior. Their case number is CGC-19-575348. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number 0971-13355716). Filed by Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Murphy, Edward) (Filed on 5/16/2019) Modified on 5/17/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Side, Inc. v. Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Side, Inc., a Delaware corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Side, Inc.
Represented By: Allison Kop Wopschall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Edward P. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?