Davis v. Element Services LLC et al

Plaintiff: Christina Davis
Defendant: Josephine Mendoza and Element Services LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv02685
Filed: May 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Sallie Kim
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:227
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Christina Davis. Element Services LLC served on 7/8/2019, answer due 7/29/2019. (Javitch, Mark) (Filed on 7/8/2019)
June 21, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Defendant Element Services LLC. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2019)
June 20, 2019 Filing 5 Proposed Summons. (Javitch, Mark) (Filed on 6/20/2019)
May 20, 2019 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Joint Case Management Statement due by 8/12/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/19/2019 at 1:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2019)
May 17, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/31/2019. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2019)
May 17, 2019 Filing 2 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge filed by Christina Davis. (Javitch, Mark) (Filed on 5/17/2019)
May 17, 2019 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT; Jury Trial Demanded against All Defendants, (Filing Fee: $400.00, receipt number 0971-13358755). Filed by Christina Davis. (Attachments: #(1) Civil Cover Sheet)(Javitch, Mark) (Filed on 5/17/2019) Modified on 5/20/2019 (tnS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Element Services LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Josephine Mendoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Element Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina Davis
Represented By: Mark Louis Javitch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?