Operating Engineers Health And Welfare Trust Fund For Northern California et al v. Caltest Construction Services, LLC,

Plaintiff: Operating Engineers Local Union No. 3 Vacation, Holiday and Sick Pay Trust Fund, Operating Engineers Health And Welfare Trust Fund For Northern California, Operating Engineers And Participating Employers Pre-Apprentice, Apprentice And Journeymen Affirmative Action Training Fund, Pensioned Operating Engineers Health And Welfare Trust Fund, James E. Murray, Operating Engineers Local Union No. 3 of the International Union of Operating Engineers, AFL-CIO, Heavy and Highway Committee, Pension Trust Fund For Operating Engineers, Russell E. Burns and Operating Engineers Local Union 3 of the International Union of Operating Engineers, AFL-CIO
Defendant: Caltest Construction Services, LLC,
Case Number: 3:2019cv02712
Filed: May 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: James Donato
Referring Judge: Donna M Ryu
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 08:1260
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2019 Filing 13 STIPULATION to Extend Time for Defendent CalTest Construction Services, LLC to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Caltest Construction Services, LLC,. (Crutcher, David) (Filed on 6/27/2019)
June 19, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Russell E. Burns, Pensioned Operating Engineers Health And Welfare Trust Fund, James E. Murray, Operating Engineers Local Union 3 of the International Union of Operating Engineers, AFL-CIO, Pension Trust Fund For Operating Engineers, Heavy and Highway Committee, Operating Engineers And Participating Employers Pre-Apprentice, Apprentice And Journeymen Affirmative Action Training Fund, Operating Engineers Health And Welfare Trust Fund For Northern California, Operating Engineers Local Union No. 3 Vacation, Holiday and Sick Pay Trust Fund. (Minser, Matthew) (Filed on 6/19/2019)
June 19, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Russell E. Burns, Pensioned Operating Engineers Health And Welfare Trust Fund, James E. Murray, Operating Engineers Local Union 3 of the International Union of Operating Engineers, AFL-CIO, Pension Trust Fund For Operating Engineers, Heavy and Highway Committee, Operating Engineers And Participating Employers Pre-Apprentice, Apprentice And Journeymen Affirmative Action Training Fund, Operating Engineers Health And Welfare Trust Fund For Northern California, Operating Engineers Local Union No. 3 Vacation, Holiday and Sick Pay Trust Fund. Caltest Construction Services, LLC, served on 6/9/2019, answer due 7/1/2019. (Minser, Matthew) (Filed on 6/19/2019)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/5/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 8/29/2019. Signed by Judge James Donato on 5/23/19. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2019)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge James Donato for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 05/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2019)
May 22, 2019 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2019)
May 21, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Russell E. Burns, Heavy and Highway Committee, James E. Murray, Operating Engineers And Participating Employers Pre-Apprentice, Apprentice And Journeymen Affirmative Action Training Fund, Operating Engineers Health And Welfare Trust Fund For Northern California, Operating Engineers Local Union 3 of the International Union of Operating Engineers, AFL-CIO, Operating Engineers Local Union No. 3 Vacation, Holiday and Sick Pay Trust Fund, Pension Trust Fund For Operating Engineers, Pensioned Operating Engineers Health And Welfare Trust Fund.. (Minser, Matthew) (Filed on 5/21/2019)
May 20, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Caltest Construction Services, LLC,. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2019)
May 20, 2019 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/14/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/21/2019 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2019)
May 17, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/31/2019. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2019)
May 17, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Minser, Matthew) (Filed on 5/17/2019)
May 17, 2019 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Russell E. Burns, Heavy and Highway Committee, James E. Murray, Operating Engineers And Participating Employers Pre-Apprentice, Apprentice And Journeymen Affirmative Action Training Fund, Operating Engineers Health And Welfare Trust Fund For Northern California, Operating Engineers Local Union No. 3 Vacation, Holiday and Sick Pay Trust Fund, Operating Engineers Local Union No. 3 of the International Union of Operating Engineers, AFL-CIO, Pension Trust Fund For Operating Engineers, Pensioned Operating Engineers Health And Welfare Trust Fund re #1 Complaint,,, (Minser, Matthew) (Filed on 5/17/2019)
May 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Caltest Construction Services, LLC, ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13360440.). Filed byRussell E. Burns, Pensioned Operating Engineers Health And Welfare Trust Fund, James E. Murray, Operating Engineers Local Union No. 3 of the International Union of Operating Engineers, AFL-CIO, Pension Trust Fund For Operating Engineers, Heavy and Highway Committee, Operating Engineers And Participating Employers Pre-Apprentice, Apprentice And Journeymen Affirmative Action Training Fund, Operating Engineers Health And Welfare Trust Fund For Northern California, Operating Engineers Local Union No. 3 Vacation, Holiday and Sick Pay Trust Fund. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Minser, Matthew) (Filed on 5/17/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Operating Engineers Health And Welfare Trust Fund For Northern California et al v. Caltest Construction Services, LLC,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Operating Engineers Local Union No. 3 Vacation, Holiday and Sick Pay Trust Fund
Represented By: Matthew Parsa Minser
Represented By: Michele R. Stafford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Operating Engineers Health And Welfare Trust Fund For Northern California
Represented By: Matthew Parsa Minser
Represented By: Michele R. Stafford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Operating Engineers And Participating Employers Pre-Apprentice, Apprentice And Journeymen Affirmative Action Training Fund
Represented By: Matthew Parsa Minser
Represented By: Michele R. Stafford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pensioned Operating Engineers Health And Welfare Trust Fund
Represented By: Matthew Parsa Minser
Represented By: Michele R. Stafford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James E. Murray
Represented By: Matthew Parsa Minser
Represented By: Michele R. Stafford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Operating Engineers Local Union No. 3 of the International Union of Operating Engineers, AFL-CIO
Represented By: Matthew Parsa Minser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heavy and Highway Committee
Represented By: Matthew Parsa Minser
Represented By: Michele R. Stafford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pension Trust Fund For Operating Engineers
Represented By: Matthew Parsa Minser
Represented By: Michele R. Stafford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russell E. Burns
Represented By: Matthew Parsa Minser
Represented By: Michele R. Stafford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Operating Engineers Local Union 3 of the International Union of Operating Engineers, AFL-CIO
Represented By: Matthew Parsa Minser
Represented By: Michele R. Stafford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caltest Construction Services, LLC,
Represented By: David Franklin Crutcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?