Martel v. Hearst Communications, Inc.

Plaintiff: Paul Martel
Defendant: Hearst Communications, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv02715
Filed: May 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2019 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Hearst Communications, Inc. (Supplemental Order to Order Setting Initial Case Management Conference in Civil Cases Before Judge William Alsup) (Boyer, Nathaniel) (Filed on 6/18/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 21 CLERK'S NOTICE SCHEDULING CMC ON REASSIGNMENT: Case Management Statement due by 8/15/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/22/2019 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor. Standing orders can be downloaded from the Court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/whaorders. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge William Alsup for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 6/14/19. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 13, 2019 Filing 19 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2019)
June 13, 2019 Filing 18 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Paul Martel.. (Weisenberg, Benjamin) (Filed on 6/13/2019)
June 11, 2019 Filing 17 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Hearst Communications, Inc... (Boyer, Nathaniel) (Filed on 6/11/2019)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting #9 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Jonathan Donnellan. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2019)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting #5 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Nathaniel Boyer. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2019)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting #4 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Ravi Sitwala. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2019)
June 3, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Hearst Communications, Inc.. (Lebel, Philippe) (Filed on 6/3/2019) Modified on 6/4/2019 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
May 28, 2019 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff and Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 6/11/2019. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2019)
May 24, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Hearst Communications, Inc.. (Lebel, Philippe) (Filed on 5/24/2019)
May 23, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Hearst Communications, Inc. Supplementary Documents (Lebel, Philippe) (Filed on 5/23/2019)
May 22, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13370846.) filed by Hearst Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Donnellan, Jonathan) (Filed on 5/22/2019)
May 21, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Hearst Communications, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, Certificate of Service of Notice of Removal to Superior Court Clerk (Lebel, Philippe) (Filed on 5/21/2019)
May 20, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Hearst Communications, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, Certificate of Service of Notice of Removal to Adverse Party (Lebel, Philippe) (Filed on 5/20/2019)
May 20, 2019 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/8/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/15/2019 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. This case may fall within the Pilot Program for Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2019)
May 20, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13363625.) filed by Hearst Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Boyer, Nathaniel) (Filed on 5/20/2019)
May 20, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13363591.) filed by Hearst Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Sitwala, Ravi) (Filed on 5/20/2019)
May 20, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 6/3/2019. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2019)
May 17, 2019 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Hearst Communications, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, (Lebel, Philippe) (Filed on 5/17/2019)
May 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Alameda Superior Court. Their case number is HG19015428. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-13360798). Filed byHearst Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Nathaniel S. Boyer in Support of Removal, #2 Exhibit A to Nathaniel S. Boyer Declaration in Support of Removal, #3 Exhibit B to Nathaniel S. Boyer Declaration in Support of Removal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lebel, Philippe) (Filed on 5/17/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martel v. Hearst Communications, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hearst Communications, Inc.
Represented By: Philippe Alexandre Lebel
Represented By: Nathaniel Scott Boyer
Represented By: Ravi Sitwala
Represented By: Jonathan R. Donnellan
Represented By: Anthony J. Oncidi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Martel
Represented By: Benjamin D Weisenberg
Represented By: Benjamin D. Weisenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?