Ford v. City of Santa Rosa et al
Plaintiff: Andy Ford
Defendant: Ronald Nelson, Robert Moore, David Marconi, Thomas Walsh, City of Petaluma, City of Santa Rosa, John Whitten, David Linscomb, Summer Black, Matthew Rooney, Brenda Harrington, Steven Pehlke, Justin Farrington, David Lamb and John Silva
Case Number: 3:2019cv02741
Filed: May 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2019 Filing 16 REPLY (re #9 MOTION to Dismiss ) filed byCity of Petaluma, John Silva. (Gilbert, Kevin) (Filed on 7/17/2019)
July 10, 2019 Filing 15 Request for Judicial Notice re #9 MOTION to Dismiss , #14 Opposition/Response to Motion, Plaintiff's Request for Judicial Notice in Support of His Opposition to Defendants City of Petaluma's and John Silva's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed byAndy Ford. (Related document(s) #9 , #14 ) (de Vries, Lizabeth) (Filed on 7/10/2019)
July 10, 2019 Filing 14 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #9 MOTION to Dismiss ) Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants City of Petaluma's and John Silva's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed byAndy Ford. (de Vries, Lizabeth) (Filed on 7/10/2019)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER DENYING #12 STIPULATION TO CONTINUE BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND HEARING DATE. By Judge Alsup. (whalc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2019)
July 9, 2019 Filing 12 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #9 MOTION to Dismiss , #11 Order on Stipulation, to Further Change Briefing and Hearing Schedule filed by City of Petaluma, John Silva. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gilbert, Kevin) (Filed on 7/9/2019)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING #10 STIPULATION IN PART. By Judge Alsup. Replies due by 7/17/2019. Responses due by 7/10/2019. Motion Hearing set for 8/8/2019 08:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor before Judge William Alsup. (whalc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2019)
June 28, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #9 MOTION to Dismiss STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO CHANGE BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND HEARING DATE ON DEFENDANTS CITY OF PETALUMAS AND JOHN SILVAS MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT filed by Andy Ford, City of Petaluma, John Silva, City of Santa Rosa, John Whitten, Justin Farrington, Thomas Walsh, David Lamb, Brenda Harrington, Steven Pehlke, Matthew Rooney, David Linscomb, Summer Gloeckner (erroneously sued as Summer Black), Robert Moore, David Marconi, and Ronald Nelson . (de Vries, Lizabeth) (Filed on 6/28/2019) Modified on 6/28/2019 (amgS, COURT STAFF).
June 19, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by City of Petaluma, John Silva. Motion Hearing set for 8/1/2019 08:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor before Judge William Alsup. Responses due by 7/3/2019. Replies due by 7/10/2019. (Gilbert, Kevin) (Filed on 6/19/2019)
June 19, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Summer Black, City of Santa Rosa, Justin Farrington, Brenda Harrington, David Lamb, David Linscomb, David Marconi, Robert Moore, Ronald Nelson, Steven Pehlke, Matthew Rooney, Thomas Walsh, John Whitten. (Abel, Adam) (Filed on 6/19/2019) Modified on 6/19/2019 (amgS, COURT STAFF).
May 30, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Andy Ford. All Defendants. (Scott, John) (Filed on 5/30/2019)
May 21, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Summer Black, City of Petaluma, City of Santa Rosa, Justin Farrington, Brenda Harrington, David Lamb, David Linscomb, David Marconi, Robert Moore, Ronald Nelson, Steven Pehlke, Matthew Rooney, John Silva, Thomas Walsh, John Whitten. (amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2019)
May 21, 2019 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/15/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/22/2019 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Standing Order)(amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2019) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/22/2019: #3 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording) (amgS, COURT STAFF).
May 21, 2019 Filing 4 Civil Cover Sheet by Andy Ford . (Scott, John) (Filed on 5/21/2019)
May 21, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Judge William Alsup. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2019)
May 20, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Scott, John) (Filed on 5/20/2019)
May 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damages and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13363950.). Filed byAndy Ford. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Scott, John) (Filed on 5/20/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ford v. City of Santa Rosa et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Nelson
Represented By: Adam S Abel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Moore
Represented By: Adam S Abel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Marconi
Represented By: Adam S Abel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Walsh
Represented By: Adam S Abel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Petaluma
Represented By: Kevin E. Gilbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Santa Rosa
Represented By: Adam S Abel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Whitten
Represented By: Adam S Abel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Linscomb
Represented By: Adam S Abel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Summer Black
Represented By: Adam S Abel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Rooney
Represented By: Adam S Abel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenda Harrington
Represented By: Adam S Abel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Pehlke
Represented By: Adam S Abel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Farrington
Represented By: Adam S Abel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Lamb
Represented By: Adam S Abel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Silva
Represented By: Kevin E. Gilbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andy Ford
Represented By: John Houston Scott
Represented By: Izaak David Schwaiger
Represented By: Lizabeth N. de Vries
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?