State of California v. Azar et al
Plaintiff: State of California
Defendant: U.S. Department of Health and Human Services and Alex M. Azar
Amicus Curiae: Institute for Policy Integrity
Case Number: 3:2019cv02769
Filed: May 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Referring Judge: Joseph C Spero
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER GRANTING #43 STIPULATED REQUEST FOR RELIEF FROM AUTOMATIC REFERRAL TO THE ADR MULTI-OPTION PROGRAM by Judge William Alsup. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2019)
July 1, 2019 Filing 43 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER JOINT ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM AUTOMATIC REFERRAL TO THE ADR MULTI-OPTION PROGRAM filed by State of California, Alex M. Azar, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services and Institute for Policy Integrity. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Joint Admin. Motion)(Palma, Neli) (Filed on 7/1/2019) Modified on 7/2/2019 (amgS, COURT STAFF).
July 1, 2019 Set/Reset Hearing re (51 in 3:19-cv-02916-WHA) Order: Preliminary Injunction Hearing and Initial Case Management Conference VACATED (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2019)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER RE STIPULATED REQUEST AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Alsup on 7/1/2019. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2019)
June 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER RE (64) STIPULATED REQUEST by Judge William Alsup in case 3:19-cv-02405-WHA. Associated Cases: 3:19-cv-02769-WHA, 3:19-cv-02916-WHA (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2019)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER GRANTING (57) ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO ENLARGE PAGE LIMIT by Judge William Alsup in case 3:19-cv-02405-WHA. Associated Cases: 3:19-cv-02769-WHA, 3:19-cv-02916-WHA (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2019)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER GRANTING #38 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO ENLARGE TIME by Judge William Alsup. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2019)
June 27, 2019 Filing 38 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION (Unopposed) to Enlarge Time to File Response to the Complaint filed by Alex M. Azar, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services. Responses due by 7/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Takemoto, #2 Proposed Order)(Takemoto, Benjamin) (Filed on 6/27/2019)
June 27, 2019 Filing 37 ADR Clerks Notice re: Non-Compliance with Court Order. The parties have failed to file an ADR Certification as required by the Initial Case Management Scheduling Order. Counsel shall comply promptly with the requirements of ADR L.R. 3-5(b) and shall file the ADR Certification. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(cmfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2019)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER RE ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO ADJUST SCHEDULE (denying (50) in case 3:19-cv-02405-WHA; denying (34) in case 3:19-cv-02769-WHA; denying (45) in case 3:19-cv-02916-WHA) by Judge Alsup. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2019)
June 26, 2019 Filing 35 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #34 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Establish a Summary Judgment Briefing Schedule or, in the Alternative, to Enlarge Time to File Preliminary Injunction Opposition ) filed byState of California. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Neli Palma, #2 Proposed Order Denying Admin Mot)(Palma, Neli) (Filed on 6/26/2019)
June 25, 2019 Filing 34 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Establish a Summary Judgment Briefing Schedule or, in the Alternative, to Enlarge Time to File Preliminary Injunction Opposition filed by Alex M. Azar, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services. Responses due by 7/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Takemoto, #2 Proposed Order)(Takemoto, Benjamin) (Filed on 6/25/2019)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO FILE AMICUS CURIAE by Judge William Alsup (granting (41) in case 3:19-cv-02405-WHA, granting (31) in case 3:19-cv-02769-WHA, and granting (42) in case 3:19-cv-02405-WHA). (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2019)
June 21, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Denise Antonia Grab (Grab, Denise) (Filed on 6/21/2019)
June 21, 2019 Filing 31 Consent MOTION to File Amicus Curiae Brief filed by Institute for Policy Integrity. Responses due by 7/5/2019. Replies due by 7/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Amicus Brief, #2 Proposed Order)(Grab, Denise) (Filed on 6/21/2019)
June 19, 2019 Filing 30 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by State of California (Palma, Neli) (Filed on 6/19/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 29 CLERK'S NOTICE SCHEDULING CMC ON REASSIGNMENT: Case Management Statement due by 7/10/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/17/2019 08:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor. Standing orders can be downloaded from the Court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/whaorders. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON MOTIONS FOR PROVISIONAL RELIEF AND SETTING HEARING FOR 7/17/2019 08:00 AM. Signed by Judge Alsup on 6/14/2019. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge William Alsup for all further proceedings. Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 6/13/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2019)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Order relating Case Numbers C-19-2405 JCS, C-19-02769 HSG and C-19-2916 NC. All three cases shall be randomly assigned to a district judge. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on June 13, 2019. (jcslc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2019)
June 11, 2019 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by State of California (Palma, Neli) (Filed on 6/11/2019)
June 10, 2019 #Electronic filing error. No title Page. Certificate of Service e-filed separately and not as an attachment, require a title page. Please refer to Civil Local Rules 3-4 re garding first page requirement. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Please re-file in its entirety. Re: #23 Certificate of Service filed by State of California (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2019)
June 10, 2019 Filing 24 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Alex M. Azar, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services.. (Takemoto, Benjamin) (Filed on 6/10/2019)
June 7, 2019 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by State of California (Palma, Neli) (Filed on 6/7/2019)
June 6, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin Thomas Takemoto (Takemoto, Benjamin) (Filed on 6/6/2019)
June 5, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect filing procedure regarding #12 UNOPPOSED ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION For Leave to Exceed Page Limit, #13 Declaration in Support, #14 Proposed Or der, #16 MOTION to Shorten Time to Hear Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #17 Declaration in Support, and #18 Proposed Order.When filing a motion, the declaration and proposed order should be attachments to the motion, not filed separately. For future filings, please comply. No further action is necessary. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2019)
June 5, 2019 Filing 21 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE. Notice is hereby given that a Case Management Conference has been set for August 27, 2019, before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m., in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA. Case Management Statement due by August 20, 2019. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. All future filings should reflect the case number as 4:19-cv-02769-HSG. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2019)
June 5, 2019 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by State of California. U.S. Department of Health and Human Services served on 5/28/2019, answer due 6/18/2019. (Yu, Stephanie) (Filed on 6/5/2019)
June 5, 2019 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by State of California. Alex M. Azar served on 5/28/2019, answer due 6/18/2019. (Yu, Stephanie) (Filed on 6/5/2019)
June 4, 2019 Filing 18 [Proposed] Order Granting Plaintiff State of California's Administrative Motion to Shorten Time to Hear Plaintiff's Motion For Preliminary Inunction by State of California. (Yu, Stephanie) (Filed on 6/4/2019) Modified on 6/5/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).
June 4, 2019 Filing 17 Declaration of Stephanie Yu in Support of Plaintiff State of California's Administrative Motion to Shorten Time to Hear Plaintiff's Motion For Preliminary Injunction filed byState of California. (Yu, Stephanie) (Filed on 6/4/2019) Modified on 6/5/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).
June 4, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Shorten Time to Hear Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by State of California. (Yu, Stephanie) (Filed on 6/4/2019) Modified on 6/5/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).
June 4, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Rebecca M. Kopplin (Kopplin, Rebecca) (Filed on 6/4/2019)
June 4, 2019 Filing 14 Proposed Order Granting Unopposed Administrative Motion For Leave to Exceed Page Limit For Plaintiff State of California's Motion For Preliminary Injunction by State of California. (Yu, Stephanie) (Filed on 6/4/2019)
June 4, 2019 Filing 13 DECLARATION of Stephanie Yu in Support of #12 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Exceed Page Limit For Plaintiff State of California's Motion For Preliminary Injunction filed byState of California. (Related document(s) #12 ) (Yu, Stephanie) (Filed on 6/4/2019) Modified on 6/5/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).
June 4, 2019 Filing 12 UNOPPOSED ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION For Leave to Exceed Page Limit For Plaintiff State of California's Motion For Preliminary Injunction filed by State of California. Responses due by 6/10/2019. (Yu, Stephanie) (Filed on 6/4/2019) Modified on 6/5/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF). .
June 4, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by State of California. Motion Hearing set for 10/10/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S Gilliam Jr.. Responses due by 6/18/2019. Replies due by 6/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Declaration, #3 Declaration, #4 Declaration, #5 Declaration, #6 Declaration, #7 Declaration, #8 Declaration, #9 Declaration, #10 Declaration, #11 Declaration, #12 Declaration, #13 Declaration, #14 Declaration, #15 Declaration, #16 Declaration, #17 Declaration, #18 Proposed Order)(Palma, Neli) (Filed on 6/4/2019)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to case. Signed by the Clerk on 6/4/19. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2019)
June 3, 2019 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2019)
May 30, 2019 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by State of California.. (Palma, Neli) (Filed on 5/30/2019)
May 23, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Alex M. Azar, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2019)
May 23, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie Tao-Hsin Yu Notice of Appearance of Counsel (Yu, Stephanie) (Filed on 5/23/2019)
May 23, 2019 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/16/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/23/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2019)
May 23, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Karli Ann Eisenberg (Eisenberg, Karli) (Filed on 5/23/2019)
May 21, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 6/4/2019. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2019)
May 21, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Palma, Neli) (Filed on 5/21/2019)
May 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against Alex M. Azar, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services (Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number 0971-13367820.). Filed by State of California. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Palma, Neli) (Filed on 5/21/2019) Modified on 5/23/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State of California v. Azar et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Health and Human Services
Represented By: Rebecca M. Kopplin
Represented By: Benjamin Thomas Takemoto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex M. Azar
Represented By: Rebecca M. Kopplin
Represented By: Benjamin Thomas Takemoto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of California
Represented By: Neli Nima Palma
Represented By: Kathleen Boergers
Represented By: Michael Louis Newman
Represented By: Karli Ann Eisenberg
Represented By: Stephanie Tao-Hsin Yu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Institute for Policy Integrity
Represented By: Denise Antonia Grab
Represented By: Anna Augusta Moody
Represented By: Shannon Rose Selden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?