QCT, LLC et al v. Redapt, Inc.

Petitioner: QCH, Inc. and QCT, LLC
Respondent: Redapt, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv02808
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Joseph C Spero
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09:1
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by QCH, Inc., QCT, LLC (Saenz, Nicolas) (Filed on 6/18/2019)
May 23, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Redapt, Inc.. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2019)
May 23, 2019 Filing 7 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/16/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/23/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2019)
May 23, 2019 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by QCH, Inc., QCT, LLC.. (Saenz, Nicolas) (Filed on 5/23/2019)
May 23, 2019 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 6/6/2019. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2019)
May 22, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement and Certification of Interested Entities by QCT, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Quanta Computer Inc. for QCT, LLC. (Saenz, Nicolas) (Filed on 5/22/2019) Modified on 5/23/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
May 22, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement and Certification of Interested Entities by QCH, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Quanta Computer Inc. for QCH, Inc.. (Saenz, Nicolas) (Filed on 5/22/2019) Modified on 5/23/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
May 22, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Saenz, Nicolas) (Filed on 5/22/2019)
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION to Confirm Arbitration Award and for Entry of Judgment Thereon against Redapt, Inc. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number 0971-13371605). Filed by QCT, LLC, QCH, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Brian Lee in Support of Petitioners QCT, LLC and QCH, Inc.s Petition for Order to Confirm Arbitration Award and Judgment Thereon, #2 Exhibit A to the Declaration of Brian Lee - Confirmation of Arbitration, #3 Exhibit B to the Declaration of Brian Lee - Arbitration Award, #4 Proposed Order, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (Saenz, Nicolas) (Filed on 5/22/2019) Modified on 5/23/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: QCT, LLC et al v. Redapt, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: QCH, Inc.
Represented By: Nicolas V. Saenz
Represented By: Brian Yung-Yen Lee
Represented By: Paul Timothy Llewellyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: QCT, LLC
Represented By: Nicolas V. Saenz
Represented By: Brian Yung-Yen Lee
Represented By: Paul Timothy Llewellyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Redapt, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?