Henry v. Tyler et al
Plaintiff: Jean E. Henry
Defendant: McKesson Corporation, Susan R. Salka, Wayne A. Budd, Edward A. Mueller, Christine Jacobs, Alton F. Irby, III, Donald R. Knauss, Brian J. Tyler, Marjorie L. Knowles, David M. Lawrence, James Beer, N. Anthony Coles, Andy D. Bryant, John H. Hammergren, M. Christine Jacobs and Marie L. Knowles
Case Number: 3:2019cv02869
Filed: May 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Charles R Breyer
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE, Robin E. Wechkin by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting #34 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2019)
July 12, 2019 Filing 34 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Robin Wechkin ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13513825.) filed by McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Certificate of Good Standing)(Wechkin, Robin) (Filed on 7/12/2019)
June 17, 2019 Filing 33 CLERK'S NOTICE: A Joint Case Management Statement due by 9/20/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/27/2019 at 8:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2019)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Charles R. Breyer for all further proceedings. Judge Vince Chhabria no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 6/17/19. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2019)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 RELATED CASE ORDER. The following cases are related: C18-6525 CRB and C19-2869 VC. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 6/14/2019. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 10, 2019 Filing 30 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Jean E. Henry. Service waived by Brian J. Tyler waiver sent on 6/5/2019, answer due 8/5/2019. (Bonderoff, Samuel) (Filed on 6/10/2019)
June 10, 2019 Filing 29 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Jean E. Henry. Service waived by Susan R. Salka waiver sent on 6/5/2019, answer due 8/5/2019. (Bonderoff, Samuel) (Filed on 6/10/2019)
June 10, 2019 Filing 28 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Jean E. Henry. Service waived by Edward A. Mueller waiver sent on 6/5/2019, answer due 8/5/2019. (Bonderoff, Samuel) (Filed on 6/10/2019)
June 10, 2019 Filing 27 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Jean E. Henry. Service waived by McKesson Corporation waiver sent on 6/5/2019, answer due 8/5/2019. (Bonderoff, Samuel) (Filed on 6/10/2019)
June 10, 2019 Filing 26 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Jean E. Henry. Service waived by David M. Lawrence waiver sent on 6/5/2019, answer due 8/5/2019. (Bonderoff, Samuel) (Filed on 6/10/2019)
June 10, 2019 Filing 25 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Jean E. Henry. Service waived by Marie L. Knowles waiver sent on 6/5/2019, answer due 8/5/2019. (Bonderoff, Samuel) (Filed on 6/10/2019)
June 10, 2019 Filing 24 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Jean E. Henry. Service waived by Donald R. Knauss waiver sent on 6/5/2019, answer due 8/5/2019. (Bonderoff, Samuel) (Filed on 6/10/2019)
June 10, 2019 Filing 23 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Jean E. Henry. Service waived by M. Christine Jacobs waiver sent on 6/5/2019, answer due 8/5/2019. (Bonderoff, Samuel) (Filed on 6/10/2019)
June 10, 2019 Filing 22 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Jean E. Henry. Service waived by Alton F. Irby, III waiver sent on 6/5/2019, answer due 8/5/2019. (Bonderoff, Samuel) (Filed on 6/10/2019)
June 10, 2019 Filing 21 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Jean E. Henry. Service waived by John H. Hammergren waiver sent on 6/5/2019, answer due 8/5/2019. (Bonderoff, Samuel) (Filed on 6/10/2019)
June 10, 2019 Filing 20 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Jean E. Henry. Service waived by N. Anthony Coles waiver sent on 6/5/2019, answer due 8/5/2019. (Bonderoff, Samuel) (Filed on 6/10/2019)
June 10, 2019 Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Jean E. Henry. Service waived by Wayne A. Budd waiver sent on 6/5/2019, answer due 8/5/2019. (Bonderoff, Samuel) (Filed on 6/10/2019)
June 10, 2019 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Jean E. Henry. Service waived by Andy D. Bryant waiver sent on 6/5/2019, answer due 8/5/2019. (Bonderoff, Samuel) (Filed on 6/10/2019)
June 10, 2019 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Jean E. Henry. Service waived by James Beer waiver sent on 6/5/2019, answer due 8/5/2019. (Bonderoff, Samuel) (Filed on 6/10/2019)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Order by Judge Vince Chhabria granting #15 Motion for Pro Hac Vice - Bonderoff.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2019)
June 5, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Samuel Bonderoff ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13410183.) filed by Jean E. Henry. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Bonderoff, Samuel) (Filed on 6/5/2019)
June 3, 2019 Filing 14 REASSIGNED CASE - NOTICE OF NEW HEARING DATE: You are notified that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference before Judge Vince Chhabria upon reassignment. For a copy of Judge Chhabria's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov. Case Management Statement due by 8/21/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/28/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2019)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER, Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Vince Chhabria for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by The Clerk on 5/31/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2019)
May 30, 2019 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2019)
May 30, 2019 Filing 11 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by McKesson Corporation.. (Bartlett, Jaime) (Filed on 5/30/2019)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/16/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/23/2019 02:00 PM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 5/28/19. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2019)
May 28, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by McKesson Corporation re #8 Notice (Other) (Bartlett, Jaime) (Filed on 5/28/2019)
May 28, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE by McKesson Corporation Regarding Redacted Documents Filed with Court (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Bartlett, Jaime) (Filed on 5/28/2019)
May 28, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by McKesson Corporation re #1 Notice of Removal, #3 Certificate of Interested Entities, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, 6 Case Assigned by Intake,,, #5 Certificate of Service, #4 Certificate of Interested Entities, (Bartlett, Jaime) (Filed on 5/28/2019)
May 24, 2019 Filing 6 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 6/7/2019. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2019)
May 23, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #1 Notice of Removal, filed by McKesson Corporation Docket a new Civil Cover Sheet with Corrections. The Original is not acceptable (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2019) Modified on 5/29/2019 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
May 23, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #1 Notice of Removal, filed by McKesson Corporation Corrected Defendant Par ties Spelling. Christine Jacobs, Marjorie L. Knowles (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2019)
May 23, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by McKesson Corporation re #1 Notice of Removal, #3 Certificate of Interested Entities, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Certificate of Interested Entities, (Bartlett, Jaime) (Filed on 5/23/2019)
May 23, 2019 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Entities by McKesson Corporation identifying Corporate Parent McKesson Corporation for McKesson Corporation. re #1 Notice of Removal, #3 Certificate of Interested Entities, #2 Civil Cover Sheet (Bartlett, Jaime) (Filed on 5/23/2019)
May 23, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by McKesson Corporation identifying Corporate Parent McKesson Corporation for McKesson Corporation. re #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet (Bartlett, Jaime) (Filed on 5/23/2019)
May 23, 2019 Filing 2 ERRONEOUSLY E-FILED: PLEASE SEE ERROR MESSAGE DATED 05/23/19 Civil Cover Sheet by McKesson Corporation . (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1)(Bartlett, Jaime) (Filed on 5/23/2019) Modified on 5/29/2019 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
May 23, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF ACTION UNDER 28 U.S.C. SECTIONS 1332,1441 AND 1446; (NO PROCESS); from San Francisco Superior Court. Their case number is CGC-576119. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-13377461). Filed byMcKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Bartlett, Jaime) (Filed on 5/23/2019) Modified on 5/29/2019 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Henry v. Tyler et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Jaime Allyson Bartlett
Represented By: Robin Eve Wechkin
Represented By: Sara B. Brody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan R. Salka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne A. Budd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward A. Mueller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christine Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alton F. Irby, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald R. Knauss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian J. Tyler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marjorie L. Knowles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David M. Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Beer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N. Anthony Coles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andy D. Bryant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John H. Hammergren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Christine Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marie L. Knowles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jean E. Henry
Represented By: Christopher Daniel Sullivan
Represented By: Samuel Ethan Bonderoff
Represented By: Quentin Alexandre Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?