Templeton v. Amazon.com Inc. et al
Plaintiff: John William Templeton
Defendant: Thriftbooks LLC, Google LLC and Amazon.com Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv02894
Filed: May 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Sallie Kim
Nature of Suit: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Cause of Action: 15:0045
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2019 Filing 20 Statement Scheduling Meet and Confer on July 25, 26 or 29 by John William Templeton. (Templeton, John) (Filed on 7/22/2019)
July 22, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance John William Templeton Notice of Hearing and Deadline for Response (Templeton, John) (Filed on 7/22/2019)
July 18, 2019 Filing 18 Acknowledgment of Receipt by United States Marshals Service of summons and complaint. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2019)
July 15, 2019 Filing 17 Amended MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, Memorandum of Points and Authorities, and [Proposed] Order filed by John William Templeton. Motion Hearing set for 8/19/2019 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom A, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Responses due by 7/29/2019. Replies due by 8/5/2019. (Attachments: #(1) Declaration Plaintiff's Declaration of Owned, Earned Media)(Templeton, John) (Filed on 7/15/2019)
July 12, 2019 Filing 16 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Memorandum of Authorities, Proposed Order filed by John William Templeton. Motion Hearing set for 8/19/2019 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Responses due by 7/26/2019. Replies due by 8/2/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Plaintiff's Declaration of Owned, Earned Media)(Templeton, John) (Filed on 7/12/2019) Modified on 7/16/2019 (tnS, COURT STAFF).
July 3, 2019 service packet delivered to the United States Marshals Service Post Box in the Clerk's Office mailroom. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2019)
July 3, 2019 Filing 15 Summons Issued as to Defendants Google LLC, John William Templeton & Thriftbooks LLC. (Attachments: #(1) USM Form 285) (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2019)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 AMENDED ORDER REGARDING SERVICE OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 7/2/2019. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2019)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REGARDING SERVICE OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 6/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2019)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim denying #11 Motion for Preliminary Injunction without prejudice. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2019)
June 24, 2019 Filing 11 FIRST AMENDED MOTION for Preliminary Injunctive Relief filed by John William Templeton. Responses due by 7/8/2019. Replies due by 7/15/2019. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2019)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting #7 Motion for Permission for Electronic Case Filing. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2019)
June 21, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Relief filed by John William Templeton. Responses due by 7/5/2019. Replies due by 7/12/2019. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2019)
June 17, 2019 Filing 8 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Amazon.com Inc., Google LLC, Thriftbooks LLC. Filed by John William Templeton. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2019)
June 17, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Permission for Electronic Case Filing filed by John William Templeton. (Attachments: #(1) [Proposed] Order) (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2019)
June 3, 2019 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge filed by John William Templeton. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2019)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCREENING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. The #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is granted. The #3 Motion for Permission for Electronic Case Filing is denied. Amended Complaint due by 7/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2019)
May 24, 2019 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Joint Case Management Statement due by 8/19/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/26/2019 at 1:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (Attachments: #(1) Standing Order for Mag. Judge Sallie Kim, #(2) Standing Order for All Judges) (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2019)
May 24, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Permission for Electronic Case Filing filed by John William Templeton. (Attachments: #(1) [Proposed] Order) (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2019)
May 24, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by John William Templeton. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2019)
May 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT; Demand for Jury Trial against Amazon.com Inc., Google LLC & Thriftbooks LLC, (Filing Fee: Ifpp entered on 5/24/2019). Filed byJohn William Templeton. Consent/Declination due by 6/7/2019. (Attachments: #(1) Civil Cover Sheet) (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Templeton v. Amazon.com Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John William Templeton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thriftbooks LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.com Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?