Cameron et al v. Apple Inc.

Plaintiff: Donald R. Cameron and Pure Sweat Basketball, Inc.
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv03074
Filed: June 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Referring Judge: Donna M Ryu
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:2
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Filing 28 STIPULATION for Extension of Time for Defendant Apple Inc. to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint filed by Apple Inc., Pure Sweat Basketball, Inc. and Donald R. Cameron. (Doren, Richard) (Filed on 7/3/2019) Modified on 7/5/2019 (amgS, COURT STAFF).
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER by Judge William Alsup granting #26 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Cynthia E. Richman. (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2019)
June 27, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice corrected version of Dkt. #23 ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13465673.) Filing fee previously paid on 6/25/19 filed by Apple Inc.. (Richman, Cynthia) (Filed on 6/27/2019)
June 27, 2019 Filing 25 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Donald R. Cameron, Pure Sweat Basketball, Inc.. Apple Inc. served on 6/13/2019, answer due 7/5/2019. (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 6/27/2019)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER by Judge William Alsup denying #23 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Cynthia E. Richman. (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2019)
June 25, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13465673.) filed by Apple Inc.. (Richman, Cynthia) (Filed on 6/25/2019)
June 24, 2019 Filing 22 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Apple Inc. Pursuant to FED. R. CIV. P. 7.1 and Certificate of Interested Entities or Persons Pursuant to Civil L.R. 3-15/ Correction to ECF No. 18 (Doren, Richard) (Filed on 6/24/2019)
June 24, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard Joseph Doren Correction to ECF No. 15 (Doren, Richard) (Filed on 6/24/2019)
June 24, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Glen Swanson Correction to ECF No. 16 (Swanson, Daniel) (Filed on 6/24/2019)
June 24, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa Phan Correction to ECF No. 17 (Phan, Melissa) (Filed on 6/24/2019)
June 24, 2019 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Apple Inc. and Certificate of Interested Entities or Persons (Swanson, Daniel) (Filed on 6/24/2019)
June 24, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Glen Swanson Notice of Appearance of Melissa Phan (Swanson, Daniel) (Filed on 6/24/2019)
June 24, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Glen Swanson (Swanson, Daniel) (Filed on 6/24/2019)
June 24, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Glen Swanson Notice of Appearance of Richard J. Doren (Swanson, Daniel) (Filed on 6/24/2019)
June 24, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Glen Swanson Notice of Appearance of Theodore J. Boutrous, Jr. (Swanson, Daniel) (Filed on 6/24/2019)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Judge William Alsup granting #11 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Steve W. Berman. (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2019)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Judge William Alsup granting #10 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Robert L. Lopez. (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2019)
June 7, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Steve W. Berman ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13419310.) filed by Donald R. Cameron, Pure Sweat Basketball, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Berman, Steve) (Filed on 6/7/2019)
June 7, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Robert L. Lopez ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13419251.) filed by Donald R. Cameron, Pure Sweat Basketball, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Lopez, Robert) (Filed on 6/7/2019)
June 7, 2019 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE SCHEDULING CMC ON REASSIGNMENT: Case Management Statement due by 9/5/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/12/2019 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor. Standing orders can be downloaded from the Court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/whaorders. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2019)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge William Alsup for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by the Clerk on 06/07/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2019)
June 7, 2019 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (igS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2019)
June 5, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Apple Inc. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2019)
June 5, 2019 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/28/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/4/2019 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2019)
June 4, 2019 Filing 4 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Donald R. Cameron, Pure Sweat Basketball, Inc... (Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 6/4/2019)
June 4, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 6/18/2019. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2019)
June 4, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 6/4/2019)
June 4, 2019 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Apple Inc. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13404013.). Filed by Donald R. Cameron, Pure Sweat Basketball, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 6/4/2019) Modified on 6/5/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cameron et al v. Apple Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald R. Cameron
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert F Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pure Sweat Basketball, Inc.
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert F Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Represented By: Theodore J. Boutrous, Jr.
Represented By: Melissa Phan
Represented By: Richard Joseph Doren
Represented By: Cynthia Richman
Represented By: Daniel Glen Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?