(PC) Quair v. CDCR - Office of Internal Affairs et al

Plaintiff: David S. Quair, III
Defendant: Prison Law Offices, Timonthy M. Lockwood, CDCR - Office of Inmate Appeals and CDCR - Office of Internal Affairs
Case Number: 3:2019cv03136
Filed: June 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: James Donato
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2019 Filing 7 Case transferred in from District of California Eastern; Case Number 2:19-cv-00971. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
June 3, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #6 Order served on David S. Quair III. (Henshaw, R)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 6/3/2019 ORDERING CASE TRANSFERRED to the U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California. (Henshaw, R)
May 30, 2019 Filing 5 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by David S. Quair, III (Benson, A.)
May 29, 2019 Filing 4 CLERKS NOTICE: The Clerk of Court is in receipt of a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is DIRECTED to submit a Certified Prison Trust account statement for David S. Quair, III, CDC BG-0478 to the Clerks Office within 72 business hours of this notification. The Prison Trust Account statement must reflect the activity for the last six months. Please email the certified prison trust account statement in pdf format to FilingsSacramento@caed.uscourts.gov with the case number in the subject line as reflected on this notification. (TEXT ONLY) (Plummer, M)
May 29, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on David S. Quair III. (Kastilahn, A)
May 29, 2019 Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 7/1/2019 (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Kastilahn, A)
May 28, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by David S. Quair, III. (Kastilahn, A) Modified on 5/30/2019 (Plummer, M).
May 28, 2019 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against All Defendants by David S. Quair, III.(Kastilahn, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Quair v. CDCR - Office of Internal Affairs et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prison Law Offices
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timonthy M. Lockwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CDCR - Office of Inmate Appeals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CDCR - Office of Internal Affairs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David S. Quair, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?