Boruta et al v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Mirek Boruta and Maria Boruta
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Quality Loan Service Corp., U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust and U.S. Bank Trust, N.A.
Case Number: 3:2019cv03164
Filed: June 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: William H Orrick
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2019 Filing 42 REPLY (re #27 MOTION to Remand ) to Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. Opposition filed byMaria Boruta, Mirek Boruta. (Estavillo, Jason) (Filed on 7/23/2019)
July 19, 2019 Filing 41 REPLY (re #20 MOTION to Dismiss ) filed byJPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Freed, John) (Filed on 7/19/2019)
July 17, 2019 Filing 40 REPLY (re #10 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint ) filed byQuality Loan Service Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Learned, Matthew) (Filed on 7/17/2019)
July 16, 2019 Filing 39 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #27 MOTION to Remand ) filed byJPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Freed, John) (Filed on 7/16/2019)
July 12, 2019 Filing 38 OBJECTIONS to JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.'s Request for Judicial Notice CORRECTION OF DOCUMENT #36 by Maria Boruta, Mirek Boruta. (Estavillo, Jason) (Filed on 7/12/2019)
July 12, 2019 Filing 37 Proposed Order Denying JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.'s Motion to Dismiss by Maria Boruta, Mirek Boruta. (Estavillo, Jason) (Filed on 7/12/2019)
July 12, 2019 Filing 36 ERRONEOUSLY E-FILED: PLEASE SEE DOCKET NUMBER #38 FOR THE CORRECIONRequest for Judicial Notice Objections to JPMorgan Chase Bank's Request for Judicial Notices filed byMaria Boruta, Mirek Boruta. (Estavillo, Jason) (Filed on 7/12/2019) Modified on 7/12/2019 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
July 12, 2019 Filing 35 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #20 MOTION to Dismiss ) of JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. filed byMaria Boruta, Mirek Boruta. (Estavillo, Jason) (Filed on 7/12/2019)
July 10, 2019 Filing 34 Proposed Order re #32 Opposition/Response to Motion, #33 Reply to Opposition/Response to Dismiss by Quality Loan Service Corp. by Maria Boruta, Mirek Boruta. (Estavillo, Jason) (Filed on 7/10/2019)
July 10, 2019 Filing 33 REPLY (re #10 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint ) Objections to Quality Loan's Request for Judicial Notice filed byMaria Boruta, Mirek Boruta. (Estavillo, Jason) (Filed on 7/10/2019)
July 10, 2019 Filing 32 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #10 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint ) by Quality Loan Service Corp. filed byMaria Boruta, Mirek Boruta. (Estavillo, Jason) (Filed on 7/10/2019)
July 8, 2019 Filing 31 CLERK'S NOTICE - Reset Hearing as to #27 MOTION to Remand. Motion Hearing reset for 8/21/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor before Judge William H. Orrick (to concur with hearing on other motions). (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2019)
July 5, 2019 Filing 30 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice filed by U.S. Bank Trust, N.A.. (Magid, James) (Filed on 7/5/2019)
July 3, 2019 Filing 29 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice filed by U.S. Bank Trust, N.A.. (Magid, James) (Filed on 7/3/2019)
July 2, 2019 Filing 28 Request for Judicial Notice re #27 MOTION to Remand filed byMaria Boruta, Mirek Boruta. (Related document(s) #27 ) (Estavillo, Jason) (Filed on 7/2/2019)
July 2, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION to Remand filed by Maria Boruta, Mirek Boruta. Motion Hearing set for 8/7/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor before Judge William H. Orrick. Responses due by 7/16/2019. Replies due by 7/23/2019. (Estavillo, Jason) (Filed on 7/2/2019)
July 1, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE by Quality Loan Service Corp. re #10 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Amended Notice of Hearing (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Learned, Matthew) (Filed on 7/1/2019)
July 1, 2019 Filing 25 Certificate of Interested Entities by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. for JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Freed, John) (Filed on 7/1/2019)
June 28, 2019 #Electronic filing error. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office.Please re-file in its entirety. Re: #22 Certificate of Interested Entities filed by JPMorgan Cha se Bank, N.A. E-Filer Must Enter Parent Company or Other Affiliates. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2019)
June 28, 2019 Filing 24 CLERK'S NOTICE - Motion Hearing as to #10 MOTION to Dismiss and #20 MOTION to Dismiss reset for 8/21/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor before Judge William H. Orrick. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2019)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER - Case Management Conference set for 9/10/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 9/3/2019. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 6/28/2019. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2019)
June 28, 2019 Filing 22 Corporate Disclosure Statement by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Freed, John) (Filed on 6/28/2019)
June 28, 2019 Filing 21 Certificate of Interested Entities by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Freed, John) (Filed on 6/28/2019)
June 28, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. Motion Hearing set for 7/31/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor before Judge William H. Orrick. Responses due by 7/12/2019. Replies due by 7/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Motion to Dismiss, #2 Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #3 Exhibit A to Request for Judicial Notice, #4 Exhibit B to Request for Judicial Notice, #5 Exhibit C to Request for Judicial Notice, #6 Exhibit D to Request for Judicial Notice, #7 Exhibit E to Request for Judicial Notice, #8 Exhibit F to Request for Judicial Notice, #9 Exhibit G to Request for Judicial Notice, #10 Proposed Order)(Freed, John) (Filed on 6/28/2019)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge William H. Orrick for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 06/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2019)
June 27, 2019 Filing 18 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2019)
June 27, 2019 Filing 17 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by U.S. Bank Trust, N.A... (Magid, James) (Filed on 6/27/2019)
June 27, 2019 Filing 16 Certificate of Interested Entities by U.S. Bank Trust, N.A. (Magid, James) (Filed on 6/27/2019)
June 27, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint; by U.S. Bank Trust, N.A. (Magid, James) (Filed on 6/27/2019) Modified on 6/28/2019 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
June 27, 2019 Filing 14 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A... (Freed, John) (Filed on 6/27/2019)
June 27, 2019 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF, JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. AND U.S. BANK TRUST, N.A. Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs and Defendants JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. and U.S. Bank Trust, N.A. shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 7/5/2019. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2019)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting #9 Defendant U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust's Motion to Substitute Attorney. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2019)
June 26, 2019 Filing 11 Request for Judicial Notice re #10 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed byQuality Loan Service Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Related document(s) #10 ) (Learned, Matthew) (Filed on 6/26/2019)
June 26, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Quality Loan Service Corp.. Motion Hearing set for 8/8/2019 01:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Responses due by 7/10/2019. Replies due by 7/17/2019. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Points and Authorities, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Learned, Matthew) (Filed on 6/26/2019)
June 25, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by James Christopher Magid (Magid, James) (Filed on 6/25/2019) Modified on 6/26/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).
June 24, 2019 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Quality Loan Service Corp... (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Learned, Matthew) (Filed on 6/24/2019)
June 24, 2019 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs and Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 7/8/2019. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2019)
June 21, 2019 Filing 6 CLERKS NOTICE re: Docket No. #5 , pursuant to Civil Local Rule 6-1(a), parties may stipulate to extend the time within which to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint without a court order provided the change will not alter the date of any event or any deadline already fixed by Court order. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2019)
June 20, 2019 Filing 5 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO EXTEND DEFENDANTS DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT filed by Quality Loan Service Corp., Mirek Borutak, Maria Boruta. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Learned, Matthew) (Filed on 6/20/2019) Modified on 6/21/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
June 10, 2019 Filing 4 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., Mirek Boruta and Maria Boruta. (Freed, John) (Filed on 6/10/2019) Modified on 6/11/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).
June 7, 2019 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/28/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/4/2019 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2019)
June 6, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 6/20/2019. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2019)
June 6, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF ACTION from Alameda County Superior Court. Their case number is RG19015789. (No Process)(Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-13415169). Filed byJPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Freed, John) (Filed on 6/6/2019) Modified on 6/7/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boruta et al v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mirek Boruta
Represented By: Jason W. Estavillo
Represented By: Caitlin Marie Phair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Boruta
Represented By: Jason W. Estavillo
Represented By: Caitlin Marie Phair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: John Douglas Freed
Represented By: Joseph Edward Addiego, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quality Loan Service Corp.
Represented By: Matthew Bryan Learned
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust
Represented By: John Douglas Freed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank Trust, N.A.
Represented By: Regina Jill McClendon
Represented By: John Douglas Freed
Represented By: Joseph Edward Addiego, III
Represented By: James Christopher Magid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?